Pangilinan et al v. First Federal Bank of California et al
Plaintiff: Danilo Pangilinan and Rosa Solorzano
Defendant: IndyMac Mortgage Servicing, Aztec Foreclosure Corporation, First Federal Bank of California, First Community Mortgage Company and OneWest Bank, FSB
Case Number: 3:2011cv00217
Filed: January 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/30/2011 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/16/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/31/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
March 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting motion to withdraw as counsel; Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/14/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2011)
March 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/8/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
January 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/31/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/21/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pangilinan et al v. First Federal Bank of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Jane K Lee
Represented By: Brian H. Newman
Represented By: James Kevin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Foreclosure Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Bank of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Community Mortgage Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneWest Bank, FSB
Represented By: Brian H. Newman
Represented By: Jane K Lee
Represented By: James Kevin Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danilo Pangilinan
Represented By: Ronald Veridiano Uy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosa Solorzano
Represented By: Ronald Veridiano Uy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?