Pena-Flores v. United States Postal Service et al
Plaintiff: Luis Pena-Flores
Defendant: United States Postal Service, Robert Lazo and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2011cv00509
Filed: February 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Federal Employers Liability
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Report due by 8/3/2012. Status Conference set for 8/7/2012 03:45 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 7/20/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
June 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REQUIRING STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 6/28/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO CONTINUE Initial Case Management Conference to 7/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco re 13 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 6/8/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE from 5/17/2011 to 6/7/2011 at 3:00PM re doc 4 filed by Luis Pena-Flores. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 5/3/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena-Flores v. United States Postal Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Pena-Flores
Represented By: Scott Howard Wechsler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?