Blau et al v. AT&T Mobility et al
Plaintiff: Fredrick M. Blau, Jacob R. Stern, Anthony P. Tran and Lenza H. McElrath, III
Defendant: AT&T Inc., and AT&T Mobility
Case Number: 3:2011cv00541
Filed: February 4, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Presiding Judge: Nandor J. Vadas
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/17/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer vacating hearing date and granting 81 Motion to Compel Arbitration (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER re 78 Stipulation to extend deadline to respond to second amended complaint filed by AT&T Inc.,, AT&T Mobility. Respond by 1/12/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/6/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 38 Motion to Compel. (crblc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part 37 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/21/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting re 39 Stipulation To Modify Briefing Schedule on Defendants' Pending Motions To Dismiss and Motion To Compel Arbitration, filed by AT&T Inc.,, AT&T Mobility. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/12/11. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; denying 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blau et al v. AT&T Mobility et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc.,
Represented By: Donald M. Falk
Represented By: Theresa C. Lopez
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Steven Paul Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility
Represented By: Donald M. Falk
Represented By: Theresa C. Lopez
Represented By: John Nadolenco
Represented By: Steven Paul Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick M. Blau
Represented By: Lenza Hamilton McElrath, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob R. Stern
Represented By: Lenza Hamilton McElrath, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony P. Tran
Represented By: Lenza Hamilton McElrath, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenza H. McElrath, III
Represented By: Lenza Hamilton McElrath, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?