Reagan et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Plaintiff: James O. Reagan, Jr. and Deborah Reagan
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00704
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 6, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS OR TO STRIKE AND FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT, Motions terminated: 13 Amended MOTION for Hearing re 6 Request for Judicial Notice, And Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For A More Definite StatementAmended MOTION for Hearing re 6 Request for Judicial Notice, And Motion To Dismiss, Or In The Alternative, For A More Definite Statement filed by American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 31, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2011 02:00 PM immediately following hearing on defendant's motion to dismiss in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/19/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reagan et al v. American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O. Reagan, Jr.
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Reagan
Represented By: Mark F. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Servicing, Inc.
Represented By: Nina Huerta
Represented By: Conrad V. Sison
Represented By: Daniel Anthony Solitro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?