Coronado et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Haniball Amare, Bonofacio Coronado, Jennifer Coronado, Eduardo Coronado and Barbara Peckler
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation and HTC America, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00706
Filed: February 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER RE 88 TO EXTEND HEARING AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/6/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2012) Modified on 11/6/2012 (cl, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 3/29/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2012)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING GRANT STOCK LEAVE TO WITHDRAW AS CO-COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/27/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/2/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER RE 30 CONTINUING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/24/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coronado et al v. Sprint Nextel Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haniball Amare
Represented By: Thomas Mathew Corea
Represented By: Ann Jamison
Represented By: George A. Otstott
Represented By: George A. Otstott, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Bradley Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonofacio Coronado
Represented By: Grant Bradley Stock
Represented By: George A. Otstott, Jr.
Represented By: George A. Otstott
Represented By: Ann Jamison
Represented By: Thomas Mathew Corea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Coronado
Represented By: Thomas Mathew Corea
Represented By: Ann Jamison
Represented By: George A. Otstott
Represented By: George A. Otstott, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Bradley Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Coronado
Represented By: Thomas Mathew Corea
Represented By: Ann Jamison
Represented By: George A. Otstott
Represented By: George A. Otstott, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Bradley Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Peckler
Represented By: Thomas Mathew Corea
Represented By: Ann Jamison
Represented By: George A. Otstott
Represented By: George A. Otstott, Jr.
Represented By: Grant Bradley Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sprint Nextel Corporation
Represented By: Joseph A. Boyle
Represented By: Allen Brooks Gresham, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Rosemarie Theresa Ring, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?