Huang v. Avanquest North America Inc et al
Plaintiff: Winnie Huang
Defendant: Avanquest North America Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00753
Filed: February 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. #8 Stipulation and Order. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re #7 Stipulation filed by Winnie Huang. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 28, 2011 Filing 7 STIPULATION (joint) to dismiss entire case by Winnie Huang. (Ripamonti, Roberto) (Filed on 3/28/2011)
March 8, 2011 Filing 6 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Avanquest North America Inc.. (Achtert, Jennifer) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
February 25, 2011 Filing 5 CLERKS NOTICE re consent or declination to proceed before magistrate judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 21, 2011 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Avanquest North America Inc re #2 ADR Scheduling Order, #3 Notice (Other) to Plaintiff of Removal of Civil Action (Achtert, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/21/2011)
February 21, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE by Avanquest North America Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, To Plaintiff of Civil Action (Achtert, Jennifer) (Filed on 2/21/2011)
February 18, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)
February 18, 2011 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (no process) from Alameda County Superior Court. Their case number is RG 10552519. (Filing fee $350; receipt number 34611056508). Filed by Avanquest North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huang v. Avanquest North America Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avanquest North America Inc
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Murphy
Represented By: Jennifer Kristin Achtert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winnie Huang
Represented By: Roberto Giulio Ripamonti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?