Sonoma Tires, Inc. v. Big O Tires, LLC
Plaintiff: Sonoma Tires, Inc.
Defendant: Big O Tires, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00818
Filed: February 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 109 OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/17/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LITIGATION DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/29/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
November 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE LITIGATION DEADLINES. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/7/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 10:00 AM; Pretrial Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 5/12/2014 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 5/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/29/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
October 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 58 REGARDING LITIGATION DEADLINES. Pretrial Conference set for 4/4/2013 10:00 AM; Jury Selection set for 4/22/2013 09:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 4/22/2013 09:00 AM; Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/1/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2012)
September 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding hearing date and briefing schedule for pending motions. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/20/2012. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2012)
July 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 38 LITIGATION DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/13/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2012)
May 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 30 LITIGATION DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/14/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2012)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 23 FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH COUNTERCLAIMS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/5/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 16 TO CONTINUE INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sonoma Tires, Inc. v. Big O Tires, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoma Tires, Inc.
Represented By: Robert S Boulter
Represented By: Peter C Lagarias
Represented By: Peter Clark Lagarias, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big O Tires, LLC
Represented By: Michael J. Burns, Esq.
Represented By: Joseph J. Orzano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?