The Sierra Club et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Plaintiff: The Sierra Club and Environmental Integrity Project
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Case Number: 3:2011cv00846
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 114 Stipulation re Settlement Agreement and Release. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2015)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 77 Motion for Attorney Fees (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER VACATING HEARING re 77 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/10/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES re 80 Declaration in Support filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, 83 Declaration in Support filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, 77 MOTIO N for Attorney Fees and Costs filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, 81 Declaration in Support filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, 79 Declaration in Support filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, 82 Declaration in Support filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, 78 Declaration in Support, filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/20/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2014)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 75 Motion for Extension of Time to File (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2014)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 71 Stipulation of dismissal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2014)
October 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND RELEASE 69 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/2/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2013)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER RE SEVENTH CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT: SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT TO BE FILED BY 10/8/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/24/2013. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2013) Modified on 9/24/2013 (mejlc2, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER re 65 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/8/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
July 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR ADDITIONAL TIME re 63 Status Report filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/16/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2013)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR 45 DAY EXTENSION re 61 Status Report filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, United States Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/31/2013. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
March 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER - Status Report due by 6/11/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/5/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - Status Report due by 2/21/2013.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/19/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST re 54 Joint Case Management Statement filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/21/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 52 Status Report filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project, United States Environmental Protection Agency Updated Status Report due by 11/21/2012. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/21/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER - Status Report due by 9/20/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/7/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO APPEAR FOR MEET AND CONFER re 26 MOTION for Summary Judgment and for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by United States Environmental Protection Agency, 32 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by The Sierra Club, Environmental Integrity Project. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/15/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Marie-Elena James granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings that; declaration of counsel; proposed order Replies due by 5/4/2012. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 39 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in opposition to motion for judgment on the pleadings that is unopposed; declaration of counsel; proposed order Reply due by 5/1/2012. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AUGMENTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/16/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Motions due by 1/13/2012. Responses due by 2/10/2012. Cross Motions due by 2/10/2012. Replies due by 3/9/2012. Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/21/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Status Report due by 11/17/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/3/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/25/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Sierra Club et al v. United States Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Sierra Club
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Represented By: Kristin A. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Environmental Integrity Project
Represented By: David A. Bahr
Represented By: Kristin A. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Abraham A. Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?