Xoom Corporation v. Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC et al Featured Case

Xoom Corp., a 10-year-old global money transfer company, sued Motorola for trademark infringement over the tech giant's new Android tablet.

Plaintiff: Xoom Corporation
Defendant: Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility, Inc. and Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00848
Filed: February 23, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2011 Filing 44 ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing David J. Meadows as Mediator. (cmf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 12/27/11. (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 22, 2011 Filing 42 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Xoom Corporation (Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 41 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 12/16/2011 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 12/16/2011). Dispositive Motions due by 10/29/2012. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/16/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Smith, Cathay) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 13, 2011 Filing 39 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 9, 2011 Filing 38 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Xoom Corporation. (Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
November 18, 2011 Filing 37 ANSWER to Complaint byMotorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC. (Smith, Cathay) (Filed on 11/18/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 33 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (C Y N Smith) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (K J Achterhof) (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 30 Ex Parte Application (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 33 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Cathay Y.N. Smith ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611066761.) filed by Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Receipt)(mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 9, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Kristin J. Achterhof ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611066761.) filed by Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Receipt)(mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 31 Certificate of Interested Entities by Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC (Garcia, Richard) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 30 Ex Parte Application for a Continuance of Case Management Conference Date and Related Deadlines and [Proposed] Order filed by Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC. (Garcia, Richard) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Gustavo Garcia and Dennis Bruce Kass (Garcia, Richard) (Filed on 11/8/2011) Modified on 11/9/2011 (mjj2, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2011 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xoom Corporation. Motorola Mobility, Inc. served on 10/28/2011, answer due 11/18/2011. --- PROOF OF SERVICE (Summons, Complaint, etc.) on MOTOROLA MOBILITY, INC. --- (Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xoom Corporation. Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc. served on 10/28/2011, answer due 11/18/2011. --- PROOF OF SERVICE (Summons, Complaint, etc.) on MOTOROLA MOBILITY HOLDINGS, INC. --- (Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Xoom Corporation. Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC served on 10/28/2011, answer due 11/18/2011. --- PROOF OF SERVICE (Summons, Complaint, etc.) on MOTOROLA TRADEMARK HOLDINGS, LLC --- (Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER for extension of time re 24 Stipulation, filed by Xoom Corporation Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/2/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
September 1, 2011 Filing 24 STIPULATION re 21 Order, 23 Order, Set Hearings,, -- FOURTH Consented Motion for Extension of Service Deadline, Case Management Conference Date, and Related Deadlines and [PROPOSED] Order -- by Xoom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER for extension of CMC and related deadlines re 22 Stipulation, filed by Xoom Corporation Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/5/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 4, 2011 Filing 22 STIPULATION re 21 Order -- CONSENTED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES --- by Xoom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER that the deadline for serving summons & complaint is extended until 9/5/2011 re 20 Stipulation, filed by Xoom Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/3/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
August 2, 2011 Filing 20 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, 17 Order --- THIRD CONSENTED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF SERVICE DEADLINE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER --- by Xoom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for extension of CMC and related deadlines re 18 Stipulation, filed by Xoom Corporation Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/19/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/18/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 18 STIPULATION re 17 Order --- CONSENTED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES --- by Xoom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for an extension of service deadline re 16 Stipulation, filed by Xoom Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/2/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 16 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, 15 Order ---- SECOND CONSENTED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF SERVICE DEADLINE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER ---- by Xoom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for an extension of service deadline - extended until 7/13/2011 re 14 Stipulation filed by Xoom Corporation. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/23/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 22, 2011 Filing 14 STIPULATION re 1 Complaint, -- CONSENTED MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF SERVICE DEADLINE AND [PROPOSED] ORDER --- by Xoom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 PROOF OF SERVICE)(Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 13 CLERKS NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference reset for 7/22/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 11 Ex Parte Application for an extension of CMC and related deadlines (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 11 Ex Parte Application re 10 Clerks Notice -- EX PARTE MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE DATE AND RELATED DEADLINES AND [PROPOSED] ORDER --- filed by Xoom Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order - PROPOSED Order -)(Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Filing 10 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2011 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order) (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/22/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Xoom Corporation. (Alpert, Rochelle) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 7, 2011 Filing 6 CLERKS NOTICE To Plaintiff re: Consent or Declination to Proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Form due by 4/22/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Xoom Corporation (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Trademark and Trade Name Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc., Motorola Mobility, Inc., Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC (Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 34611056673). Filed by Xoom Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xoom Corporation v. Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xoom Corporation
Represented By: Rochelle D. Alpert
Represented By: Leigha Elizabeth Weinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Trademark Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motorola Mobility Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?