Ally Bank et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Ally Bank, Wesley W. Halihan and Gina L. Halihan
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00896
Filed: February 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 WRIT of Execution issued in the amount of $7,836,789.39 as to James C. Castle aka J. Christopher Castle, CCTT Group, and CJT Financial Group re 1017 ***(note: original mailed to submitting party). (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2018) Modified on 5/3/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). (see dkt. # 976 , paragraph 12 for judgment amount)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 965 Discovery Order Requesting Further Briefing. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/18/2016. (mejlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2016)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 874 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SCHEDULING ORDER re 853 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Todd Smith, 857 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. Plaintiffs shall filed proposed findings & conclusions of law by 10/15/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/14/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 869 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH SCHEDULING ORDER re 836 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Lara Karakasevic, 848 Order Setting Hearing on Motion. Plaintiffs shall filed proposed findings & conclusions of law by 10/8/2015. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/7/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
September 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 859 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL OF CROSS-CLAIMS OF PEARSON PROPERTIES INC. DBA PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY. Show Cause Response due by 10/13/2015. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/23/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2015)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 833 ORDER GRANTING 830 Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Jolee Lange, filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Brian Phuong, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Gina L. Halihan, Crichton Friedly, Alison Massa, Julian Massa, Janet N Friedly, Ally Bank, Wesley W. Halihan, Dawn R Carifi, Jolee Lange terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 9/14/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2015)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 819 ORDER RE: CASE MANAGEMENT AND STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/27/2015. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 807 ORDER FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW BY JUNE 24, 2015 re 794 MOTION for Default Judgment, 795 MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/23/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 800 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CROSS-DEFENDANTS BEACH VIEW ENTERPRISES AND JOHN WILLIAMSON WITH PREJUDICE re 799 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Prudential California Realty. BEACH VIEW ENTERPRISES, INC. and John Williamson terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez on 6/11/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2015)
May 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 790 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF SOME CROSS-DEFENDANTS without Prejudice re 789 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Cross-Claimant Prudential California Realty: George Larsen, Gary Silverman, William Lavelle, EVAN TIMMEL, Tisha L Trites, TERESA WEDDLE, SCOTT DION and GJZ Group terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/5/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2015)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 788 ORDER GRANTING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PEARSON PROPERTIES, INC. dba PRUDENTIAL CALIFORNIA REALTY WITH PREJUDICE re 787 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Brian Phuong, Fidelity National Titl e Insurance Company, Gina L. Halihan, Crichton Friedly, Credit One LLC, Alison Massa, Julian Massa, Janet N Friedly, Ally Bank, Wesley W. Halihan, Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Dawn R Carifi, Prudential California Realty terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/10/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 783 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE CO. TO SUBMIT PROPOSED FINDINGS & CONCLUSIONS OF LAW re 773 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Fahed Eweis and Nadia Eweis filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/17/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 775 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION OF PLAINTIFF CREDIT ONE, LLC TO REVISE OCTOBER 31, 2014 JUDGMENT re 770 MOTION to Amend/Correct 731 Default Judgment, filed by Credit One LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/23/15. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF CREDIT ONE LLC's MOTION TO REVISE OCTOBER 31, 2014 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
January 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 765 ORDER RE: PROPOSED FINDINGS FOR 759 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants DANIEL YOUNG and KELLY YOUNG filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/6/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2015)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 764 ORDER REQUESTING FURTHER INFORMATION RE: DAMAGES re 759 MOTION for Default Judgment by the Court as to Defendants DANIEL YOUNG and KELLY YOUNG filed by Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/5/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2015)
December 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 750 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; Vacating Status Conference and Order to Show Cause. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 744 ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON STATUS OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/26/2014. (ygrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 741 ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT RANDALL CRAWFORD with prejudice re 740 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company, Brian Phuong, Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, Gina L. Halihan, Crichton Friedly, Credit One LLC, Alison Massa, Julian Massa, Janet N Friedly, Ally Bank, Wesley W. Halihan, Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company, Dawn R Carifi, Randall C Crawford terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/21/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2014)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER SETTING STATUS HEARING RE: WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL OR SUBSTITUTION FOR DEFENDANT JAMES C. CASTLE. Status Conference regarding withdrawal or substitution of counsel for Defendant James C. Castle is set for Friday 12/19/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Status Report filed by 12/12/14. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/12/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2014)
June 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTION TO COMPEL. The hearing set for June 17, 2014 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/11/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2014)
May 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING TO 6/13/2014. Compliance Hearing set for 5/30/2014 is CONTINUED to Friday, 6/13/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/29/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 672 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 622 Motion for Payment of Fees and Expenses; denying without prejudice 622 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ; denying 642 Motion to Lift Preliminary Injunction for Limited Purpose. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2014)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 655 ORDER GRANTING 654 Stipulation, filed by Chicago Title Insurance Company, James C. Castle, STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding Defendant James C. Castle's Amended, Verified Responses to Plaintiff Chicago Title Insurance Company's Request for Production of Documents (Set One). Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/2/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 652 ORDER SETTING COMPLIANCE HEARING RE: AMENDED DISCOVERY RESPONSE. Stipulation filed by 4/1/2014. Compliance Hearing is set for Monday, 4/28/2014 02:01 PM in Courtroom 1, 4th Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Joint Statement filed 4/23/14. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/31/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 632 ORDER VACATING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS SET FOR MARCH 21, 2014 re 619 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/18/14. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JAMES C. CASTLE AND COUNSEL ANN MCFARLAND DRAPER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 3/21/2014 09:01 AM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 3/11/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2014)
March 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 600 Motion for TRO and Order to Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
February 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 597 ORDER by Judge Gonzalez Rogers granting 596 Motion for Extension of Time to File (ygrlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
February 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 593 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY NUNC PRO TUNC AS OF MAY 10, 2013 re 414 Proposed Order filed by Prudential California Realty, Attorney Marc Joseph Cardinal for Prudential California Realty,Marc Joseph Cardinal for Prudential California Realty,Marc Joseph Cardinal for Prudential California Realty added. Attorney Resto Ernest Montanari terminated. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/13/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2014)
February 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 588 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS AGAINST DEFENDANT JAMES C. CASTLE AND COUNSEL ANN MCFARLAND DRAPER. Order to Show Cause Hearing set for Friday, 2/14/2014 09:01 AM. All other parties appearances are waived. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 2/11/2014. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2014)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 548 ORDER VACATING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 546 Status Report filed by Prudential California Realty and vacating the 12/3/2013 Motion Hearing.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 10/31/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
September 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 507 Motion for Service by Publication. The Court VACATES the hearing set for September 17, 2013. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2013)
August 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers granting 510 Defendant Joan Hangarter's Motion to Appear by Telephone for the 8/26/2013 at 2:00pm Case Management Conference.Defendant Joan Hangarter pro se, shall contact CourtCall at (888)-882-6878 to make arrangements for the telephonic appearance. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 467 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/17/2013 is CONTINUED to Monday, 7/1/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 6/12/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING Compliance Hearing set for 1/25/2013 is CONTINUED to Friday, 2/15/2013 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 1/25/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER by Judge GONZALEZ ROGERS denying 323 Motion SERVICE MY EMAIL (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING re 317 Order. Compliance Hearing set for 12/20/2012 is CONTINUED to 1/25/2013 09:01 AM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/20/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING COMPLIANCE HEARING Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 12/7/2012 09:01 AM. Show Cause Response due by 11/30/2012. Compliance Hearing is also set for 12/7/2012 09:01 AM in Courtroom 5, 2nd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/16/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER VACATING AND RESETTING HEARINGS. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 11/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 218 Motion for Leave to Amend Without Prejudice;denying as moot 232 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The July 3, 2012 Hearing date is VACATED. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER VOLUNTARILY DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE DEFENDANT BRENDA HENDERSON, Brenda Henderson terminated.. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/23/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting request for extension (#189) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
January 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER RE: SERVICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
December 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER RE: SERVICE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/23/2011)
December 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER CHANGING HEARING DATE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DISSOLVING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITH RESPECT TO ALL DEFENDANTS EXCEPT CASTLE, CCTT GROUP, CJT FINANCIAL GROUP, OREPLEX LLC, AND JTF CONSULTING LLC; BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING ON OCTOBER 12, 2011 (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs request to file a "new" first amended complaint. re 20 Stipulation, filed by Ally Bank, Wesley W. Halihan, Gina L. Halihan, 21 Exhibits, filed by Ally Bank, Wesley W. Halihan, Gina L. Halihan, 19 Stipulation and Order, 22 Exhibits, filed by Ally Bank, Wesley W. Halihan, Gina L. Halihan. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 8/30/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ally Bank et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ally Bank
Represented By: Stephen Chew Seto
Represented By: Rhonda Darlene Shelton-Kraeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wesley W. Halihan
Represented By: Stephen Chew Seto
Represented By: Rhonda Darlene Shelton-Kraeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina L. Halihan
Represented By: Stephen Chew Seto
Represented By: Rhonda Darlene Shelton-Kraeber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Mark Tyler Flewelling, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?