Oracle Corporation et al v. Druglogic, Inc.
Plaintiff: Oracle Corporation and Oracle International Corporation
Defendant: Druglogic, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00910
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Paul Singh Grewal
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 306 REDACTED ORDER re 235 MOTION TO EXCLUDE THE EXPERT REPORT AND TESTIMONY OF BRIAN K. PERRY filed by Druglogic, Inc., 278 MOTION for Summary Judgment PUBLIC VERSION - ORACLE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF (1) COMPL AINT, (DECLARATORY JUDGMENT OF NON-INFRINGEMENT OF 091 PATENT) - LIMITED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER DATED 5-13-13 [D-257] filed by Oracle America, Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Corporation. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/16/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER re Requested Redactions. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on November 15, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER TO FILE DOCKET No. 290 UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 16, 2013. (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER GRANTING re 207 Stipulation To Shorten Time for the Court to Consider Druglogic's, 204 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Druglogic, Inc.'s Motion to Extend Discovery Period for Limited Purpose. Responses due by 4/10/2013. Replies due by 4/12/2013. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/8/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
March 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER, signed, as modified on, 3/12/13, re 179 Letter filed by Druglogic, Inc., For Steve Tiller to appear by phone on 3/15/13 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/12/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2013)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER GRANTING re 157 Letter filed by Druglogic, Inc., for Steven Tiller to appear by phone for the Motion to Amend/Correct on 12/7/12 at 9:30 AM. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/26/12. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2012)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING re 143 Letter filed by Druglogic, Inc., for Steve Tiller to appear by phone on 9/21/12 at 1:30 PM for the case management conference.. Signed, as modified, by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/14/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
June 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting in part and denying in part 108 Motion to Disqualify Expert Witness Dr. Robert Nelson (jcslc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO AMEND INVALIDITY AND INFRINGEMENT CONTENTIONS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/31/12. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING ORACLE LEAVE TO AMEND ITS ANSWER AND DEFENSES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/12/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING CERTAIN CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER DEADLINES.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/5/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING re 85 Letter filed by Druglogic, Inc. for Martin Fineman to appear by phone on 11/4/11 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/4/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re 69 Stipulation, filed by Druglogic, Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Phase Forward, Inc., Oracle Corporation. Settlement Conference reset for 11/3/2011 09:30 AM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 9/1/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 68 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR DATE FOR DRUGLOGIC TO FILE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS - to be filed on or before 9/2/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C.Spero on 8/29/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/3/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Joint cmc statement due by 5/27/11. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/11/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oracle Corporation et al v. Druglogic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle Corporation
Represented By: Karen G. Johnson-McKewan
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Peggy E. Bruggman
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Kothe
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Michael C. Spillner
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oracle International Corporation
Represented By: Peggy E. Bruggman
Represented By: Indra Neel Chatterjee
Represented By: Karen G. Johnson-McKewan
Represented By: Lesley Elizabeth Kothe
Represented By: Deborah Kay Miller
Represented By: Michael C. Spillner
Represented By: Christina Marie Von Der Ahe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Druglogic, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory P. Casimer
Represented By: Peter J Davis
Represented By: Martin L. Fineman
Represented By: Joseph N. Hosteny
Represented By: Gabriel I. Opatken
Represented By: Stephen Allan Weitzman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?