Valerie Shipping Inc. v. Korea Line Singapore PTE, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Valerie Shipping Inc. and Glenn Delarrazabal et al.
Defendant: Korea Line Singapore PTE, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00911
Filed: February 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 09:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER GRANTING 162 Stipulation for Final Distribution of Funds From the Proceeds of Sale of the Vessel MT Blue Jade. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING 155 Stipulation For Partial Distribution of Funds from the Proceeds of Sale of the Vessel M/T BLUE JADE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/22/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED, 123 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 7/8/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/15/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 3, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 117 MOTION FOR APPORTIONMENT OF FUTURE CUSTODIA LEGIS EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 25, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER RE: Joint Motion Re: 1) Disposition of IFO Bunkers Remaining On Board M/V Blue Jade, and 2) Granting $61,135.66 Custodia Legis Expense In Favor of Ultragas International S.A. For MGO Consumed During Attachment/ Arrest. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER GRANTING 103 Joint Motion re Payment of Crew Wages. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 6, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER RE 99 and Clarification re Procedure. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 5, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARINGS ON 49 MOTION to Shift Vessel, 71 MOTION for Order of Sale, 93 Application for Bid, and 52 MOTION to Pay Crew Wages, Repatriate the Crew and Provide for Monthly Submission of Costs and Objections. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 3, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER DISCHARGING 39 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 29, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO MOVE VESSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/28/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING and terminating: 70 Ex Parte Application for Order to Shorten Time. Motion hearing set on 71 Motion for Order of Interlocutory Sale set for set for 5/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 22, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 56 Motion to Shorten Time. Motions terminated: 56 MOTION to Shorten Time to Hear Motions to Shift Vessel and to Pay Wages to the Crew, Repatriate the Crew, and Provide for Monthly Submission of Costs and Expenses. Motion He aring on 49 Motion to Shift Vessel and 52 Motion to Pay Crew Wages, Repatriate the Crew and Provide for Monthly Submission of Costs and Objections set for 5/6/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 20, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FILINGS REGARDING BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDING. Show Cause Response due by 4/15/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/4/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 27 Amended Maritime Attachment And Garnishment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whitr on 3/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 5 Motion Appointing Substitute Custodian. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valerie Shipping Inc. v. Korea Line Singapore PTE, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Shipping Inc.
Represented By: Gregory William Poulos
Represented By: Max L. Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Delarrazabal et al.
Represented By: Edward M. Bull, III
Represented By: Kurt Leonard Micklow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korea Line Singapore PTE, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?