Shaterian v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association et al
Plaintiff: Nader Shaterian
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association and Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv00920
Filed: February 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/18/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Cal-Western with prejudice. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 3/13/12. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 79 Motion to Dismiss, continuing status conference to May 4, 2012. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Conference set for 11/29/11 is continued to 2/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/22/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Dismiss; denying 61 Motion to Strike (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shaterian v. Wells Fargo Bank National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nader Shaterian
Represented By: Randall L. Hornibrook
Represented By: Neil Jon Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank National Association
Represented By: Christopher Alan Carr
Represented By: Viddell Lee Heard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Kimberly Neff
Represented By: Robin Prema Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?