IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Gausi
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund, IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund, Electrical Contractors Trust, Contract Administration Fund, Labor Management Cooperation Fund, Electrical Industry Service Corporation, Victor Uno, Don Campbell, IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund and IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund
Defendant: Farzad Gausi
Case Number: 3:2011cv00943
Filed: March 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO VACATE 4/12/13 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 79 Notice (Other), filed by IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund, Electrical Contractors Trust, IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund, Victor Uno, IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund, Electrical Industry Service Corporation, Labor Management Cooperation Fund, IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund, IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund, Contract Administration Fund, Don Campbell. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/8/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
October 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER for Plaintiffs to Submit Additional Evidence Supporting Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on October 30, 2012. (jcslc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 7/27/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for *8/3/2012 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/21/12. * Date requested by counsel in the stip and proposed order falls on a Saturday.(klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
October 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE OF MEDIATION DEADLINE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/26/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 6/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 6/7/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund et al v. Gausi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Apprentice & Training Fund
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Contractors Trust
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Contract Administration Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Labor Management Cooperation Fund
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Industry Service Corporation
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Uno
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Campbell
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Health & Welfare Trust Fund
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IBEW Local 595 Money Purchase Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Phil A. Thomas
Represented By: Christine S. Hwang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farzad Gausi
Represented By: Harold Mitchell Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?