Global Community Monitor v. Alameda County Industries Inc
Plaintiff: Global Community Monitor
Defendant: Alameda County Industries Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv00976
Filed: March 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 19 Stipulation and proposed order to amend dismissal order filed by Global Community Monitor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 16 Proposed Order filed by Global Community Monitor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/30/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference to 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/18/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RESETTING CMC re 6 Proposed Order filed by Global Community Monitor. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Judge Edward M. Chen's FINAL STANDING ORDER (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Community Monitor v. Alameda County Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Community Monitor
Represented By: Douglas J. Chermak
Represented By: Richard Toshiyuki Drury
Represented By: Michael Robert Lozeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alameda County Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?