Lotes Co, LTD v. Hon Hai Precision Industry Co, Ltd et al

Plaintiff: Lotes Co, LTD
Defendant: Hon Hai Precision Industry Co, Ltd and Foxconn Electronics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01036
Filed: March 7, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 11, 2017 441 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 363 MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF VIJAY GUPTA'S EXPERT REPORTS by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/11/2017)
August 15, 2017 333 Opinion or Order of the Court STAY OF CLAIMS ARISING OUT OF THE PATENT LICENSE AGREEMENT [re 329 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Lotes Co, LTD, 330 Supplemental Brief, filed by Foxconn Electronics, Inc., Hon Hai Precision Industry Co, Ltd.]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/15/2017. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2017)
July 27, 2017 303 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO FILE MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING 300 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2017)
July 26, 2017 296 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFTER DISCOVERY HEARING (re 281 292 293 ) by Judge Alsup. (whalc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2017)
February 6, 2017 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 247 ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2017)
January 23, 2017 245 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CLAIM CONSTRUCTION PURSUANT TO CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on 1/23/2017. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2017)
January 19, 2017 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING 241 STIPULATION TO EXTEND CLAIM CONSTRUCTION DISCOVERY AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Hon. William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2017)
August 19, 2016 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Alsup on 8/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2016)
June 20, 2016 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RESCHEDULING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE, Motions terminated: 215 Further Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 6/20/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2016)
June 13, 2016 214 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE Re: Dkt. No. 211 . Settlement Conference set for 7/18/2016 10:00 AM, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/13/2016. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2016)
May 31, 2016 209 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 6/28/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on 5/31/2016. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2016)
May 19, 2016 203 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Further Case Management Conference set for 5/26/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Alsup on 5/19/16. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2016)
May 17, 2016 201 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND CHANGE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS HON HAI PRECISION INDUSTRY CO., LTD. AND FOXCONN ELECTRONICS, INC. by Hon. William Alsup granting 200 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Andrew J. Gray, IV and Ahren Christian Hsu-Hoffman terminated.(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
April 13, 2016 191 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge William H. Alsup on 3/17/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2016)
August 26, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 172 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 26, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2014)
September 13, 2013 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting 155 Stipulation to Extend Remaining Briefing Schedule, as modified by the Court. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2013)
August 12, 2013 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING, AS MODIFIED, 143 Stipulation re Briefing Schedule on 134 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Opposition due by 8/30/2013.Replies due by 9/13/2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 12, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2013)
May 29, 2013 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 128 STIPULATION For Filing of Amended Pleadings.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/29/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
July 17, 2012 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2012)
May 21, 2012 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING FURTHER BRIEFING AND CONTINUING HEARING. Motion Hearing set for 7/20/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
March 15, 2012 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING COURTROOM MEET AND CONFER RE: 81 Discovery Letter BriefRequest for Telephonic Conference on Discovery Dispute filed by Lotes Co, LTD.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/15/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
March 2, 2012 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 77 Stipulated Request to Modify Discovery and Briefing Schedule, and to Change Hearing Date Related to Early Partial Summary Judgment Motions. Motion Hearing set for 5/25/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/2/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
January 4, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING STIPULATION AND MOTION FOR PARTIAL STAY AND SETTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION. Hearing on Partial Summary Judgment Motion set for 5/11/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2012)
November 9, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 65 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule. Opposition due by 11/11/2011. Replies due by 11/25/2011.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/9/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
October 24, 2011 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 63 Stipulation to Modify Briefing Schedule. Opposition due by 11/7/2011. Replies due by 11/28/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/24/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lotes Co, LTD v. Hon Hai Precision Industry Co, Ltd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lotes Co, LTD
Represented By: Nathaniel Bruno
Represented By: James M. Chadwick
Represented By: Darren Matthew Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hon Hai Precision Industry Co, Ltd
Represented By: Laurie Michelle Charrington
Represented By: Daniel T. Conrad
Represented By: Arthur P. Licygiewicz
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foxconn Electronics, Inc.
Represented By: Laurie Michelle Charrington
Represented By: Daniel T. Conrad
Represented By: Arthur P. Licygiewicz
Represented By: Gregory Louis Lippetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?