Nimbus Data Systems, Inc. v. Nimble Storage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Nimbus Data Systems, Inc.
Defendant: Nimble Storage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01214
Filed: March 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 68 OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/7/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 65 RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND VACATING DEADLINES ESTABLISHED IN REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER IN LIGHT OF TENTATIVE SETTLEMENT. Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/27/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 57 REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/13/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 16 EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND HEARING DATE ON NIMBUS DATA SYSTEMS, INC.'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/15/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nimbus Data Systems, Inc. v. Nimble Storage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nimbus Data Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Lee Taylor
Represented By: William Alexander Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nimble Storage, Inc.
Represented By: Janet L. Cullum
Represented By: Angela Lucille Dunning
Represented By: Aaron Matthew Fennimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?