Hensley-Maclean et al v. Safeway, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dee Hensley-Maclean and Jennifer Rosen
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01230
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 222 STIPULATION AND ORDER WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/17/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2016)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 220 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Kandis A. Westmore on 05/09/16. (kawlc2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2016)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 209 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 208 Seeking to Reset CMC to March 24, 2016. Case Management Conference previously set for 3/17/2016 Reset to 3/24/2016 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/26/16. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2016)
August 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 200 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING REPLY BRIEFING AND HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Safeway's Reply due by 10/16/2015. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/27/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2015)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 196 RESETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing previously set for 9/3/2015 Continued to 9/10/2015 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/27/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2015)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF NAMED PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF STANDING AND GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/29/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/29/2015)
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 180 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 179 EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/13/15. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 177 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING THE BRIEFING SCHEDULES FOR DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing previously set for 3/19/2015 has been Rescheduled to 4/30/2015 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 2/10/2015. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Discovery Order re: 156 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Requests for Production of Documents filed by Sara Duncan, Dee Hensley-Maclean. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/8/2015. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2015)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Order requesting status report re: Dkt. No. 156 . Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/30/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF THE CLASS CERTIFICATION SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2014)
December 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Discovery Order re: 155 Discovery Letter Brief re Plaintiffs' Interrogatories. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/19/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2014)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Discovery Order re: 152 MOTION to Compel Attendance at Deposition filed by Sara Duncan, Dee Hensley-Maclean. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/16/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2014)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Discovery Order re: 150 MOTION to Compel Appearance at Deposition. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/8/2014. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2014)
November 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER RE STATUS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/26/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER RE MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND MOTION TO STAY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 9/4/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2014)
May 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. Class Certification Hearing set for 1/23/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/15/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2014)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg denying 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as moot 119 Plaintiff's Rule 56(d) Motion. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME AND DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR COURT-ORDERED MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/18/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
August 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Discovery Order re: Dkt. No. 96. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/19/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 75 SCHEDULING ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/22/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND REVISE THE SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/8/13. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2013)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 67 REVISED JOINT SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION (SECOND REVISION). Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 11/21/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 61 RE JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 2/14/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 8/9/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 58 REVISED JOINT SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 12/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/22/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 55 REVISED JOINT SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/20/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 50 BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Motion Hearing set for 7/26/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 7/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER RE 39 GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: 18 ENLARGING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND FILING DEADLINES. Stipulation filed by Safeway, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/4/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 11 ENLARGING TIME TO FILE BRIEFS. Stipulation filed by Safeway, Inc. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/1/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley-Maclean et al v. Safeway, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Hensley-Maclean
Represented By: Craig L. Briskin
Represented By: Stephen Henry Gardner
Represented By: Whitney Huston
Represented By: Daniel Timothy LeBel
Represented By: Seema Rattan
Represented By: Steven A. Skalet
Represented By: James C. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Rosen
Represented By: Craig L. Briskin
Represented By: Stephen Henry Gardner
Represented By: Whitney Huston
Represented By: Daniel Timothy LeBel
Represented By: Seema Rattan
Represented By: Steven A. Skalet
Represented By: James C. Sturdevant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeway, Inc.
Represented By: Belinda S. Lee
Represented By: Stephen Stublarec
Represented By: Betsy Alice Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?