Stein v. Woods et al
Plaintiff: Dale R. Stein
Defendant: G. Woods, N. Warren, Arthur F. Major, R. Norton, Stanlare K. Ye and G. Ellis
Case Number: 3:2011cv01243
Filed: March 14, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/4/2012 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 11/28/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
October 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of Plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/16/2012. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER PROVIDING PLAINTIFF NOTICE AND WARNING; SCHEDULING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSIONS OF TIME. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
October 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/18/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/19/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying Motion fro Protective Order; Setting Discovery Limits. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/15/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur F. Major
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanlare K. Ye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale R. Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?