Garcia v. Resurgent Capital Services, LP et al
Plaintiff: Donna Garcia
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP, The Brachfeld Law Group, PC and LVN Funding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01253
Filed: March 15, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part 129 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING ON re 129 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs Stipulation Continuing the Hearing of Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs [Proposed] Order filed by Resurgent Capita l Services, LP, LVN Funding, LLC Responses due by 6/21/2012. Replies due by 6/28/2012. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
May 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 127 Continue Deadline to File Motion for Fees and [Proposed] Order filed by Donna Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/31/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER VACATING TRIAL AND RELATED DATES re 121 Notice of Settlement (Other) filed by Donna Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/8/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER DIRECTING PARTY TO MEET AND CONFER re 115 First Ex Parte Application Motion To Quash filed by The Brachfeld Law Group, PC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
April 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER 100 Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/27/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 107 Regarding Witness Jean Paul Torres To Appear At Trial and [Proposed] Order filed by Donna Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER DISCHARGING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/10/2012. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/13/2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
December 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE TRANSUNION, LLC DEPOSITION re 70 Stipulation filed by Donna Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 SECOND DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/12/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE SKYPE VIDEO DEPOSITIONS re 48 Stipulation filed by Donna Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/7/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER RE DOCUMENTS NEEDED IN ADVANCE OF HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/4/2011. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
October 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 INITIAL DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/27/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER RE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/20/2011. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER RE: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND MOTION TO ALTER OR AMEND JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/2011. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER 33 Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiff's Request for Discovery (Joint Letter of September 23, 2011). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/4/2011. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE COMMENTS RE JOINT LETTER BY 9/21/11. JOINT LETTER DUE 9/23/11 re 31 Errata filed by Donna Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/19/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Judge Edward M. Chen's FINAL STANDING ORDER (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 9 Stipulation filed by Donna Garcia. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/25/11. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Resurgent Capital Services, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Garcia
Represented By: Ronald Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services, LP
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Brachfeld Law Group, PC
Represented By: Erica Lynn Brachfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVN Funding, LLC
Represented By: Renee Choy Ohlendorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?