January 24, 2013 |
Filing
297
ORDER RE FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Hon. William Alsup granting 287 Motion for Settlement.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
|
January 17, 2013 |
Filing
288
ORDER RE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS SETTLEMENT (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2013)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing
276
ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO ALTER JUDGMENT by Hon. William Alsup denying 268 Motion to Alter Judgment.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
|
October 5, 2012 |
Filing
225
ORDER FOR JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish refreshments for members of the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/5/12. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
|
October 3, 2012 |
Filing
223
ORDER re 221 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Rinko Donahue, Hieu Nguyen, 222 Brief, filed by Benihana National Corp. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
|
October 2, 2012 |
Filing
219
ORDER ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE AND DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF RE ORDER OF PROOF AT TRIAL by Judge Alsup (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
|
September 7, 2012 |
Filing
183
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 171 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2012)
|
June 15, 2012 |
Filing
164
ORDER RE REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT AND FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF EXPERT CLASS DAMAGES REPORT by Hon. William Alsup granting 162 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2012)
|
June 5, 2012 |
Filing
161
ORDER RE NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT OF VACATION PAY CLASS CLAIMS by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 160 Stipulation.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
|
May 10, 2012 |
Filing
154
ORDER CERTIFYING CLASSES, APPOINTING CLASS COUNSEL AND APPOINTING CLASS REPRESENTATIVE by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 147 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
|
March 30, 2012 |
Filing
142
ORDER CONDITIONALLY GRANTING IN PART MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Certify Class.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
|
March 26, 2012 |
Filing
140
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S DAUBERT MOTION TO STRIKE DR. JOHANSON'S REPLY EXPERT DECLARATION by Hon. William Alsup granting 122 Motion to Strike.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2012)
|
March 20, 2012 |
Filing
135
ORDER REQUESTING CORRECTED CITATIONS FROM PLAINTIFFS re 84 Amended MOTION to Certify Class per Docket No. 76 filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 20, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2012)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
133
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SANCTIONS DUE TO SPOLIATION OF EVIDENCE AND SELF-HELP DISCOVERY by Judge William Alsup [denying 88 Motion for Sanctions]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
|
March 7, 2012 |
Filing
127
ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING [re 88 MOTION for Sanctions Due to Spoliation of Evidence and Self-Help Discovery by Plaintiff Hieu Nguyen, and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Benihana National Corp]. Please respond by noon on March 13, 2012. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/7/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
|
February 22, 2012 |
Filing
114
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 110 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen]. Response due by noon on 2/27/2012. Meet-and-confer set for 3/1/2012 from 10:30 a.m. and continuing to 2:00 p.m . Discovery Hearing set for 3/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Hearing on motion to certify class set for 3/1/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/22/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
|
February 21, 2012 |
Filing
112
ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting 106 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
|
January 17, 2012 |
Filing
76
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO SEAL by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 61 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
|
January 10, 2012 |
Filing
73
ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY LETTERS re 70 Letter filed by Benihana National Corp., 69 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen. Signed by Judge Alsup on January10, 2012. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
|
December 30, 2011 |
Filing
59
ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO ENLARGE BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND TO ALLOW 35-PAGE BRIEFS by Hon. William Alsup denying 57 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2011)
|
December 19, 2011 |
Filing
56
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO PRECLUDE DEFENDANT FROM FILING A MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion preclude defendant from filing motion to deny class certification.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
|
November 9, 2011 |
Filing
53
ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Hon. William Alsup granting 44 Motion to Dismiss.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
|
October 24, 2011 |
Filing
49
ORDER ON MOTION TO ENLARGE TIME FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION by Hon. William Alsup granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion for Extension of Time to File.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
|
October 13, 2011 |
Filing
47
ORDER REGARDING PROPOSED CLASS LETTER re 46 Order, 42 Letter filed by Benihana National Corp., 41 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2011)
|
September 28, 2011 |
Filing
36
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 35 Letter filed by Tetsuo Akaosugi, Hieu Nguyen]. Defendant's response due by noon on 9/30/2011. Meet-and-confer starting from 10:00 a.m. through 2:00 p.m. on 10/3/2011 in Court's jury room. Discovery Hearing set for 10/3/2011 at 2:00 p.m. before Hon. William Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/28/2011. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
|
August 29, 2011 |
Filing
31
ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
|
June 24, 2011 |
Filing
24
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 24, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
|
May 9, 2011 |
Filing
16
NOTICE REGARDING FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
|
April 25, 2011 |
Filing
15
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
|