Scocca et al v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca and The Calguns Foundations, Inc
Defendant: County of Santa Clara and Sheriff Laurie Smith
Case Number: 3:2011cv01318
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edward M Chen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal and Vacate CMC filed by Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc, Tom Scocca. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2016)
September 30, 2016 Filing 104 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Dismissal and Vacate CMC filed by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/30/2016)
August 18, 2016 Filing 103 NOTICE by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc Ninth Circuit Order re: En Banc Denial: Peruta v San Diego (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order re: En Banc Denial)(Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 8/18/2016)
August 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc, Tom Scocca. Case Management Statement due by 11/3/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/10/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/4/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2016)
August 2, 2016 Filing 101 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue CMC filed by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 8/2/2016)
June 15, 2016 Filing 100 NOTICE by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc of Peruta v San Diego Opinion (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 6/15/2016)
April 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 21, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Case Management Statement due by 8/18/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/25/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2016)
April 8, 2016 Filing 98 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 21, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 4/8/2016)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING MARCH 3, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re: #96 : Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2016. Further Case Management Conference reset for 4/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/22/2016. (afmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2016)
February 19, 2016 Filing 96 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MARCH 3, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 2/19/2016)
January 22, 2016 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 2/25/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/3/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING JANUARY 28, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. CMC reset for 3/3/16 at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/22/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2016)
January 15, 2016 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING JANUARY 28, 2016 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 1/15/2016)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DECEMBER 10, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 1/21/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/28/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/2/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2015)
November 30, 2015 Filing 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING DECEMBER 10, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 11/30/2015)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING AUGUST 6, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 12/3/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
August 3, 2015 Filing 90 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING AUGUST 6, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 8/3/2015)
June 16, 2015 Filing 89 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE resetting CMC to 8/6/15 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2015)
June 5, 2015 Filing 88 CLERK'S NOTICE. Further Case Management Conference reset from 6/18/2015 to 7/16/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/9/2015. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2015)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting cmc. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/3/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
June 3, 2015 Filing 86 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING JUNE 18, 2015 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 6/3/2015)
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 84 Stipulation filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 6/11/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/18/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/17/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
March 17, 2015 Filing 84 STIPULATION and Proposed Order Continuing March 26, 2015 Case Management Conference filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 3/17/2015)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 82 Stipulation filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 3/19/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/26/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/5/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
November 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING NOVEMBER 13, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
August 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 81 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 80 STIPULATION CONTINUING SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/13/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward Chen on 8/15/2014. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2014)
August 15, 2014 Filing 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 8/15/2014)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 78 CONTINUING MAY 15, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 8/28/2014. Case Management Conference reset for 9/4/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/6/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 5, 2014 Filing 78 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING MAY 15, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
March 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 76 CONTINUING APRIL 15, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 5/8/2014. Case Management Conference set for 5/15/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 76 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING APRIL 15, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 75 CLERKS NOTICE advancing CMC to 4/15/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 11, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Disposition by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc Ninth Circuit decision in Richards v. Yolo County (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 3/11/2014) Modified on 3/17/2014 (slhS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Filing 73 NOTICE by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc re # 72 Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Dispositin of Peruta v. San Diego County Case No.: 10-56971 (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/18/2014)
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING FEBRUARY 4, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 6/5/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/30/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 71 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING FEBRUARY 4, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 29, 2014 Filing 70 CLERKS NOTICE resetting CMC from 2/6/14 to 2/4/14 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 69 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING THE DECEMBER 5, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 1/30/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/6/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 20, 2013 Filing 68 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING THE DECEMBER 5, 2013 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 11/20/2013)
August 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 67 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 66 Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 11/27/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/27/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2013)
August 22, 2013 Filing 66 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Order Continuing Case Management Conference filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 8/22/2013)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 65 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC. Case Management Statement due by 8/22/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 17, 2013 Filing 64 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
January 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 62 for Stay filed by Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc, Tom Scocca. CMC reset for 4/25/13 at 10:30 a.m. Case Management Statement due by 4/18/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/14/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
January 10, 2013 Filing 62 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Stay filed by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting in Part and Deferring in Part # 47 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
December 14, 2012 Filing 60 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 59 Brief Supplemental filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 58 Brief re # 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES Defendants' Supplemental Brief filed byCounty of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Related document(s) # 47 ) (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 16, 2012 Filing 57 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/15/2012 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 11/16/2012) re # 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Supplemental briefing due by 1:00 p.m. 11/21/12. Court will then take matter under submission and to issue order. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 56 Brief Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply (see Order Doc #55) filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re Sur-Reply. The sur-reply brief shall be filed no later than 2:00 p.m. on November 14, 2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/13/2012. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 1, 2012 Filing 54 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION FROM 11/15/12 AT 1:30 P.M. TO 9:30 A.M. Set/Reset Deadlines as to # 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES . Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 11/15/12 TO 1/31/13 AT 10:30 AM. Case Management Statement due by 1/24/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/1/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 30, 2012 Filing 52 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 10/30/2012)
October 22, 2012 Filing 51 REPLY (re # 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
October 15, 2012 Filing 50 RESPONSE (re # 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ) filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 10/15/2012)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 48 Adjust Law/Motion Responses, # 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES . Responses due by 10/15/2012. Replies due by 10/22/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/26/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 48 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Adjust Law/Motion Responses filed by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 10/1/2012. Replies due by 10/9/2012. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 46 CLERKS NOTICE RFSETTING CMC FROM 10:30 TO 2:30 PM ON 11/15/12. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
August 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION AND ORDER re # 44 EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 44 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
August 6, 2012 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filed byTom Scocca, Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 8/6/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 7/13/12 TO 11/15/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Re # 41 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara Case Management Statement due by 11/6/2012. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 6, 2012 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT AND STIPULATION AND ORDER filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting # 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 8/24/12 TO 7/13/12. Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/12/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 38 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to lift stay filed by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
February 14, 2012 Set/Reset Hearings: Further Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/14/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2012)
February 5, 2012 Filing 36 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 2/5/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 35 RESPONSE TO # 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 2/3/2012) Modified on 2/6/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2012 Filing 34 RESPONSE TO # 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 1/30/2012) Modified on 1/31/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RESETTING CMC Case Management Statement due by 2/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 25, 2012 Filing 32 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 1/25/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs' Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2012. Defendants' Response due by 2/6/2012. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 19, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE Regarding Updates to California Penal Code by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 1/19/2012) Modified on 1/20/2012 (slh, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2012 Filing 29 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/6/2012 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 1/10/2012) re # 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities filed by Laurie Smith, County of Santa Clara. Court took matter under submission and will issue order. (Court Reporter Margo Gurule.) (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/10/2012)
December 28, 2011 Filing 28 Statement of Recent Decision by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 12/28/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION AND ORDER Motion Hearing reset for 1/6/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
December 1, 2011 Filing 26 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011)
October 18, 2011 Filing 24 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 10/18/2011)
October 11, 2011 Filing 23 Renotice motion hearing re # 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities filed byCounty of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (Related document(s) # 9 ) (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/20/2011.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Edward M. Chen for all further proceedings. Judge Jeremy Fogel no longer assigned to the case.Signed by The Executive Committee on 09/27/2011. (tsh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 19 CLERKS NOTICE The Motion Hearing set for 8/26/2011 is VACATED in light of the impending reassignment of this case to another district judge. (jflc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 10, 2011 Filing 18 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Hoye v City of Oakland filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 8/10/2011)
August 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on August 5, 2011. (jflc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 16 REPLY (re # 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities ) filed byCounty of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 15 STIPULATION re # 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities and Proposed Order by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 14 Request for Judicial Notice re # 13 Opposition/Response to Motion filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Related document(s) # 13 ) (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 13 RESPONSE (re # 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities ) filed byMadison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: SCHEDULING ORDERS AND VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re # 11 . Signed by Judge Jeremy Fogel on 6/21/11. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 20, 2011 Filing 11 STIPULATION re # 8 Clerks Notice Joint Request Re: CMC by Madison Society, Inc, Tom Scocca, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 10 Request for Judicial Notice re # 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities filed byCounty of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) # 9 ) (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 27, 2011 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memo of Points and Authorities filed by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose before Hon. Jeremy Fogel. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 23, 2011 Filing 8 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 7/8/2011 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 5th Floor, San Jose. (dlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011)
May 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jeremy Fogel for all further proceedings and Magistrate Judge Paul Singh Grewal for all discovery matters. Signed by The Executive Committee on 5/19/2011. (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 18, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. # 6 TERMINATING 6/21/2011 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 18, 2011 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge: 6/21/2011 case management conference is hereby vacated. Clerk to reassign case. (ofr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 5 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge and Request for Reassignment to a United States District Judge by County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (Kiniyalocts, Melissa) (Filed on 5/13/2011) Modified on 5/13/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2011 Filing 4 Waiver of the Service of Summons Returned Executed filed by Tom Scocca, Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. Service waived by County of Santa Clara waiver sent on 4/4/2011, answer due 6/3/2011; Laurie Smith waiver sent on 4/4/2001, answer due 6/3/2001. (Kilmer, Donald) (Filed on 4/18/2011) Modified on 4/18/2011 (bw, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 6/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 6/21/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5, 4th Floor, San Jose. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for Civil Practice in Cases Assigned for All Purposes to Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal, # 2 U.S. Magistrate Judge Paul S. Grewal Settlement Conference Procedures, # 3 San Jose Division Judges Standing Orders, # 4 Standing Orders for Judges of the Northern District of California)(bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)
March 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Summons Issued); jury demand; against County of Santa Clara, Laurie Smith ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611009314). Filed by Tom Scocca, Madison Society, Inc, The Calguns Foundations, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scocca et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Society, Inc
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Scocca
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Calguns Foundations, Inc
Represented By: Jason A. Davis
Represented By: Donald E.J. Kilmer, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Santa Clara
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Laurie Smith
Represented By: Melissa R. Kiniyalocts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?