Palomino v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Plaintiff: Julio Palomino
Defendant: Bill Cogbill, California Forensic Medical Group, Taylor Fithian and County of Sonoma
Case Number: 3:2011cv01329
Filed: March 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 53 Stipulation extending deadlines for Expert Disclosures and Expert Discovery. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2012)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/15/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2012)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Maria-Elena James discharging osc; granting 30 Motion for Summary Judgment (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 10/11/2012 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 9/27/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/18/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
April 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/5/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Palomino v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Cogbill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor Fithian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sonoma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julio Palomino
Represented By: Evan Martyndale Livingstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?