Crosthwaite et al v. BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc.
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite, Russell E. Burns, Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers, Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Fund, Operating Engineers & Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice & Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund, Heavy & Highway Committee and Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Defendant: BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01440
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc., in the amount of $87,344.32. Re 40 Declaration (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2015)
February 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order by Hon. Samuel Conti granting 34 Stipulation re: Third Amended Judgment.(sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 33 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc., in the amount of $59,268.03 re 30 Declaration (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 WRIT of Execution issued as to Judgment Debtor BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc. aka BCJ Sand & Rock Corp. In the amount of $101,490.95 (aaa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012) Re 26 Declaration/Request
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crosthwaite et al v. BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. G. Crosthwaite
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell E. Burns
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pension Trust Fund For Operating Engineers
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pensioned Operating Engineers' Health & Welfare Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers & Participating Employers Pre-Apprenticeship, Apprentice & Journeymen Affirmative Action Training Fund
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heavy & Highway Committee
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Operating Engineers Local Union No. 3 of the International Union of Operating Engineers, AFL-CIO
Represented By: Muriel B. Kaplan
Represented By: Michele R. Stafford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCJ Sand & Rock, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?