Velo et al v. Cambrian Properties, LLC
Plaintiff: Tanya Velo, B. V., P. V. and Project Sentinel
Defendant: Cambrian Properties, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01443
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Barbara
Presiding Judge: Nathanael M. Cousins
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Housing/Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 60 Stipulation.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
April 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION AND GRANTING MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT AND DENYING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/2/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
February 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE: 38 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 2/9/12. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER REFERRING 38 MOTION to Set Aside Default to MAGISTRATE JUDGE COUSINS FOR REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whitr on 2/8/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velo et al v. Cambrian Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tanya Velo
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: B. V.
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P. V.
Represented By: Christopher Brancart
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Sentinel
Represented By: Liza Cristol-Deman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cambrian Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?