City of Oakland v. SSA Terminals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Oakland
Defendant: SSA Terminals, LLC and SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01446
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TERMINATING ALL PENDING MOTIONS. Motions terminated: 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 134 MOTION in Limine 1 to Exclude Reference to the Fact that SSAT and its Experts Did Not Inspect Bert hs 20 to 26; Declaration of Joseph N. Mirkovich filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 128 MOTION in Limine No. 1 to Preclude Evidence of or Reference to the City of Oakland's Financial Condition or Possible Insolvency and/or the Financial Impact on the Plaintiff of a Verdict in this Case filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 172 MOTION in Limine Nos.: 1 - 11 [Proposed] Order filed by SSA Terminals (Oak land), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 174 MOTION in Limine No. 8 to Exclude the February 25, 2009 RBC Capital Letter filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 200 Supplemental MOTION in Limine 1No. 3 to Exclude Tes timony and Evidence of the Parties Settlement Negotiations filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 134 MOTION in Limine 11 to Exclude Reference to the Fact that SSAT and its Experts Did Not Inspect Berths 20 to 26; Declaration of Joseph N. Mirkovich filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 129 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Testimony and Evidence of the Parties' Settlement Negotiations filed by SSA Terminals (Oakl and), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 175 MOTION in Limine No. 9 to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiffs Expert Paul Sorenson filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 133 MOTION in Limine No. 10 to Exclude any Referenc es to and/or Evidence Pertaining to the Most Favored Nation Clause of the SSAT NEPAA; Declaration of Joseph N. Mirkovich filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 132 MOTION in Limine No. 6 to Exclude Evidence and/or Referral to SSAT's Decision Not to Participate in the RfQ Process in 2008 filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 139 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude Post Hoc Liability Evidence filed by City of Oakland , 131 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence Re: Bond Defeasance; Declaration of Joseph N. Mirkovich filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 130 MOTION in Limine No. 4 to Exclude the Testimony of Gerald Serventi; Declaration of Joseph N. Mirkovich filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 138 MOTION in Limine No. 3 to Exclude Evidence of Damages Associated with Berths 25-26 filed by City of Oakland, 141 MO TION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Testimony and Expert Report by Plaintiff's Expert Scott W. Beckman; Declaration of Joseph N. Mirkovich filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 135 MOTION in Limine No. 1 f iled by City of Oakland, 173 MOTION in Limine No. 7 to Exclude Testimony of And/or Evidence from Nixon Peabody filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC, 140 MOTION in Limine No. 5 to Exclude Evidence of or R eferences to Allegedly Improper Expenditure of Public Funds filed by City of Oakland, 136 MOTION in Limine No. 2 to Exclude Evidence of Damages Allegedly Attributable to Berth 24 filed by City of Oakland, 185 Administrative M otion to File Under Seal Deposition Testimony and Responses to Interrogatories That Are Highly Confidential And/or for Attorneys Eyes Only filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 5/29/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER REGARDING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBITS C AND E TO THE DECLARATION OF RICHARD T. WHITE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION IN LIMINE NOS. 1-5 by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying as M oot 177 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document; For reasons stated at pretrial conference Court Grants the motion to seal Exhibit C as to motion in limine stage of proeedings; the Motion to seal as to Exhibit E is Denied; terminating 179 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 147 Plaintiff's Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
April 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS/COUNTER-CLAIMANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL MOTIONS IN LIMINE 7,8 AND 9 AND THEIR EXHIBITS THERETO. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/19/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2013)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 STIPULATION AND ORDER; Exhibits C and E to the White Declaration remain locked pending the outcome of the related motion to seal. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/17/13. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2013)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 SIXTH STIPULATION AND ORDER FURTHER AMENDING TRIAL-RELATED DATES Discovery cutoff 2/22/2013. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/19/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2012)
December 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER RE: 5th STIPULATION FURTHER AMENDING TRIAL-RELATED DATES: Status Conference set for 12/17/2012 04:00 PM before Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Trial Counsel shall appear in person re 115 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 112 Terminate Hearings, Telephone Conference, Set Hearings,,,,,, 111 Order on Stipulation Fifth Stipulation Further Amending Trial-Related Dates filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, City of Oakland, SSA Terminals, LLC. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 12/14/12. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 114 DISCOVERY ORDER re 113 Letter Brief filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/19/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers Denying 110 Fourth Stipulation (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2012)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER AS MODIFIED re 106 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Further Amending Trial-Related Dates filed by City of Oakland. Close of all Discovery moved from 10/12/2012 to 11/2/2012. Case Management Conference continued to 11/19/2012 at 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/15/12. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2012)
June 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment of the Counterclaim (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 JOINT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/18/2012. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 DISCOVERY ORDER re 62 Letter filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/23/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
April 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER REQUIRING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING REGARDING THE TIDELANDS GRANT. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/18/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING ON 4/17/12. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 4/13/12. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2012)
March 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER re 87 Letter filed by SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC, SSA Terminals, LLC. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/30/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 SECOND ORDER FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/29/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT DOCUMENTS FOR IN CAMERA REVIEW. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 3/28/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DISCOVERY ORDER re 62 Letter filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/21/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 DISCOVERY ORDER re 62 Letter filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/8/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 DISCOVERY ORDER re 62 Letter filed by City of Oakland. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/6/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery, Set/Clear Flags. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/7/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Selection set for 1/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Jury Trial set for 1/14/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 1/3/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg.Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/2/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Oakland v. SSA Terminals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Oakland
Represented By: J. Brittain Habegger
Represented By: Donnell Wong Choy
Represented By: David Larson Alexander
Represented By: Richard Thomas White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Terminals, LLC
Represented By: Anne M. Grignon
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Mirkovich
Represented By: Margaret E. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSA Terminals (Oakland), LLC
Represented By: Anne M. Grignon
Represented By: Joseph Nicholas Mirkovich
Represented By: Margaret E. Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?