Carter v. Caleb Brett LLC et al
Petitioner: Rick O. Carter
Respondent: Caleb Brett LLC and Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Case Number: 3:2011cv01472
Filed: March 28, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard Seeborg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER by Judge Richard Seeborg granting 50 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 51 Motion for Attorney Fees. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2015)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER RE POST-REMAND PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/10/14. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2014)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 29 FOR BRIEFING ORDER IN REGARD TO ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 12/19/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AND GRANTING PETITION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 10/20/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATED ORDER CHANGING DATES FOR HEARING ON MOTION TO DISMISS AND CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 6/3/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE 14 CHANGING TIME ON MOTION TO DISMISS. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/5/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Caleb Brett LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rick O. Carter
Represented By: Eric Aaron Dupree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Caleb Brett LLC
Represented By: John R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co
Represented By: John R. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?