Larkin v. Yelp! Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff alleged that Defendant Yelp! Inc. failed to pay overtime wages to Plaintiff and other similarly-situated "Account Executive" employees for the substantial overtime hours they have worked.

Plaintiff: Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino and Ahmad Deanes
Defendant: Yelp! Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01503
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2012 Filing 57 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 48 Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
December 10, 2012 Filing 55 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-30-12, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2013. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2012)
December 3, 2012 Filing 54 Proposed Order re 53 Motion Hearing,, PROPOSED JUDGMENT by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER DETERMINING GOOD FAITH AND GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT)(Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 12/3/2012)
November 30, 2012 Filing 53 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/30/2012 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 11/30/2012) re 48 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER (1) GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) APPROVING AWARD OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE PAYMENTS; (3) APPROVING AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. filed by Anthony Tijerino, Justin Larkin, Ahmad Deanes. Plaintiffs motion for final approval of settlement and for award of attorneys fees s granted. Plaintiff to submit proposed order and proposed judgment to the Court. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2012)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER approving appearance by phone re 51 Notice, filed by Anthony Tijerino, Justin Larkin, Ahmad Deanes. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2012)
November 28, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT FINAL APPROVAL HEARING ON NOVEMBER 30, 2012 AT 2:30 P.M. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT FINAL APPROVAL HEARING)(Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 50 Statement of Non-Opposition re 48 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER (1) GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) APPROVING AWARD OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE PAYMENTS; (3) APPROVING AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. Defendant's Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Final Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement filed byYelp! Inc.. (Related document(s) 48 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 2, 2012 Filing 49 STATUS REPORT Re: Objections and Claims by Justin Larkin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Claims Report November 2, 2012)(Vigil-Gallenberg, Rosa) (Filed on 11/2/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION for Settlement PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER (1) GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS AND COLLECTIVE ACTION SETTLEMENT; (2) APPROVING AWARD OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE PAYMENTS; (3) APPROVING AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS. filed by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. Motion Hearing set for 11/30/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 11/2/2012. Replies due by 11/9/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Peter Rukin in support of Final Approval, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Rosa Gallenberg in support of Final Approval, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Thomas Urmy in support of Final Approval, # 4 Declaration Declaration of Krista Tittle in support of Final Approval)(Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 46 Continue Deadline to File Motion for Final Approval and Attorney Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/4/12. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2012)
October 3, 2012 Filing 46 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continue Deadline to File Motion for Final Approval and Attorney Fees and Costs filed by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Continue Deadline to File Motion for Final Approval and Attorney Fees and Costs)(Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Re Final Approval Hearing Date. Hearing on Motion for Final Approval re-set for 11/30/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/24/2012. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
September 21, 2012 Filing 44 Letter from Malcolm A. Heinicke regarding entry of notice changing the date of the hearing on the motion for final approval of class action settlement. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
September 17, 2012 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL HEARING FROM 11/16/12 TO 11/15/12 AT 2:30 P.M. Motion Hearing set for 11/15/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY; THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE.(bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
July 12, 2012 ***Motions terminated: 32 MOTION Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Anthony Tijerino, Justin Larkin, Ahmad Deanes., ***Deadlines terminated., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 32 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. Motion for Final approval of settlement due 10/5/12. Responses due by 10/22/2012. Replies due by 11/2/2012. Motion Hearing set for 11/16/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 37 Preliminary Approval of Settlement (with modifications) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 12, 2012 Filing 41 Proposed Order re 32 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 7/12/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 40 NOTICE by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino Notice of Filing (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit California Notice, # 2 Exhibit National Notice)(Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 39 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 4, 2012, before Judge Edward M. Chen. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 7/26/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/3/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 38 NOTICE by Yelp! Inc. of Service of Materials Required by Class Action Fairness Act of 2005 (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
July 2, 2012 Filing 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Amending Stipulation Re: Settlement of Class And Collective Actions filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval and Settlement Hearing)(Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
June 4, 2012 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/4/2012 before Edward M. Chen (Date Filed: 6/4/2012) re 32 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Anthony Tijerino, Justin Larkin, Ahmad Deanes. Parties to meet and confer and to submit to the Court a revised proposed order approving the motion for preliminary approval of settlement. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2012)
May 21, 2012 Filing 35 Statement of Non-Opposition re 32 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class and Collective Action Settlement filed byYelp! Inc.. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 5/21/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 34 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING MOTION #32 AND CMC FROM 6/1/12 TO 6/4/12 AT 1:30 P.M. 32 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval. Case Management Conference reset for 6/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing reset for 6/4/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 1, 2012 Filing 33 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Statement due by 5/25/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/1/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (bpf, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2012 Filing 32 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval filed by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. Motion Hearing set for 6/1/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen. Responses due by 5/11/2012. Replies due by 5/18/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Peter Rukin, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Rosa Vigil-Gallenberg, # 3 Declaration Declaration of Tom Urmy, # 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 5/18/12 Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/4/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 30 NOTICE by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino Joint Notice of Settlement (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Yelp! Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/30/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 19, 2012 Filing 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 3/19/2012)
March 1, 2012 Filing 27 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference reset for 3/23/2012 11:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. This is a text only docket entry, there is no document associated with this notice. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Anthony Tijerino, Justin Larkin, Ahmad Deanes Case Management Statement due by 3/16/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/27/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2012)
February 24, 2012 Filing 25 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 2/24/2012)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Yelp! Inc. Case Management Statement due by 2/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/7/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2012)
February 3, 2012 Filing 23 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Yelp! Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 2/3/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC Case Management Statement due by 2/3/2012. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 21 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Continue CMC filed by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RESETTING Case Management Statement due by 1/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 29, 2011 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 8, 2011 Filing 18 CLERKS NOTICE Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 31, 2011 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 7, 2011 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
September 21, 2011 Filing 15 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
July 21, 2011 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rosa I. Vigil-Gallenberg (Vigil-Gallenberg, Rosa) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 8, 2011 Filing 13 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 25, 2011 Filing 12 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino.. (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO STASY CASE AND RESETTING CMC re 8 Stipulation filed by Yelp! Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M Chen on 5/24/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 19, 2011 Filing 10 CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Yelp! Inc... (Zabrycki, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/19/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 9 CLERKS NOTICE re consent or declination to proceed before magistrate judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 8 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO STAY CASE PENDING MEDIATION by Yelp! Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ahmad Deanes, Justin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino Proof of Service for First Amended Complaint (Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 5 STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER THE COMPLAINT by Yelp! Inc.. (Heinicke, Malcolm) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
April 19, 2011 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Yelp! Inc.. Filed byJustin Larkin, Anthony Tijerino, Ahmad Deanes. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Deanes Consent to Join, # 2 Exhibit Tijerino Consent to Join)(Rukin, Peter) (Filed on 4/19/2011)
March 30, 2011 Filing 3 NOTICE of Consent Filing by Justin Larkin. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2011)
March 29, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/13/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)
March 29, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Yelp! Inc. (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611058031). Filed by Justin Larkin. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larkin v. Yelp! Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Larkin
Represented By: Peter Scott Rukin
Represented By: Rosa I. Vigil-Gallenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Tijerino
Represented By: Peter Scott Rukin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahmad Deanes
Represented By: Peter Scott Rukin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yelp! Inc.
Represented By: Malcolm A. Heinicke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?