MMR Group Inc et al v. Solar Millennium, LLC
Plaintiff: MMR Group Inc, MMR Power Solutions, LLC and Southwestern Power Group II, LLC
Defendant: Solar Millennium, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv01521
Filed: March 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 139 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulation of Dismissal) filed by Southwestern Power Group II, LLC, MMR Power Solutions, LLC, MMR Group Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2012)
June 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER re 136 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC, STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/5/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
March 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Action filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC Case Management Statement due by 8/24/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/31/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/13/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 132 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 131 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Dev elopment LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 130 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER To Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to Amended Complaint filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar T rust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/6/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND DEFENDANTS' TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, S TA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/23/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 119 Stipulation, filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC, Solar Millenium AG. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/10/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2012)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 117 Stipulation filed by Southwestern Power Group II, LLC, MMR Power Solutions, LLC, MMR Group Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/27/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 115 Stipulation, filed by Southwestern Power Group II, LLC, MMR Power Solutions, LLC, MMR Group Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
December 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 112 Stipulation, filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/2/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2011)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 111 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 110 Stipulation, filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 108 Stipulation, filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2011)
November 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 106 Stipulation, filed by Palo Verde Solar I, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 1, LLC, Solar Trust of America, LLC, STA Development LLC, CA I-10 Solar, LLC, Solar Millenium, Inc., Palo Verde Solar II, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 2, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 3, LLC, Blythe Solar Power Project Unit 4, LLC. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/4/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
September 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting CMC and vacating 10/21/11 motion hearing. Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/28/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2011)
September 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING re 83 MOTION to Convert Motion to Dismiss to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Southwestern Power Group II, LLC, MMR Power Solutions, LLC, MMR Group Inc, 92 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint< /I> filed by MMR Group Inc, 72 MOTION to Dismiss the Petition (Renewed) Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/2/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2011)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING re 83 MOTION to Convert Motion to Dismiss to Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Southwestern Power Group II, LLC, MMR Power Solutions, LLC, MMR Group Inc, 72 MOTION to Dismiss the Petition (Renewed) filed by Solar Millennium, LLC, 88 Stipulation, filed by Southwestern Power Group II, LLC, MMR Power Solutions, LLC, MMR Group Inc Case Management Conference set for 9/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
June 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 80 Stipulation filed by Solar Millennium, LLC Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Hearing #72 set for 7/22/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/23/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 73 Motion for relief from CMC Schedule, etc. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MMR Group Inc et al v. Solar Millennium, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMR Group Inc
Represented By: Dawn Theresa Trabeau-Mire
Represented By: Rodi F. Rispone
Represented By: Patrick A. Bruno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MMR Power Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Bruno
Represented By: Rodi F. Rispone
Represented By: Dawn Theresa Trabeau-Mire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Power Group II, LLC
Represented By: Patrick A. Bruno
Represented By: Rodi F. Rispone
Represented By: Dawn Theresa Trabeau-Mire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solar Millennium, LLC
Represented By: Sherman Gene Fendler
Represented By: David Gelfand
Represented By: Caitlin Hawks
Represented By: Jerry L. Marks
Represented By: Rachel Penski
Represented By: Aaron Renenger
Represented By: Brett D. Wise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?