Antonick v. Electronic Arts, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Robin Antonick
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.,
Case Number: 3:2011cv01543
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part 560 Motion to Review Clerk's Decision to Tax Costs; adopting 573 Report and Recommendation. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 551 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/22/2014. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2014)
August 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER re attendance fee. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/8/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2013)
August 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting 524 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re: Rule 50 Briefing And Hearing Schedule filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Rule 50(b)Motion due by 8/15/2013. Responses due by 8/29/2013. Reply due by 9/6/2013. Motion Hearing reset for 9/13/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/30/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2013)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 460 ORDER regarding Phase Two of Trial. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER granting 456 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule for Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. Setting Deadlines as to 443 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law that Antonick's Claims are Barred by the Statute of Limitations. Responses due by 7/5/2013. Replies due by 7/11/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/1/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER regarding Proposed Jury Instructions and Special Verdict Form. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/18/2013. (crblc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 428 ORDER re audio visual equipment. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/14/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 360 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 361 Motion for Protective Order (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting in part and denying in part 290 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 300 Motion to Strike. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013)
April 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer re April 22, 2013 Submissions. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
February 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER granting 311 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiff to File Opposition and Defendant to File Reply to Motion to Strike Portions of Expert Report by Garry Kitchen filed by Robin Antonick.Reset Deadlines as to 300 MOTION to Strike Portions of Expert Report by Garry Kitchen. Responses due by 2/26/2013. Replies due by 3/11/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/21/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2013)
February 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER Sealing Ex 180m re 303 Declaration in Support filed by Electronic Arts Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2013)
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER granting 302 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Motion, Pretrial Conference and Trial filed by Robin Antonick. Reset Deadlines as to 290 Third MOTION for Summary Judgment ., Responses due by 2/19/2013. Replies due by 3/4/2013. Motion Hearing set for 3/22/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Jury Selection/Trial set for 4/1/2013 at 9:00 a.m.. Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/12/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 304 Motion to Strike. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 194 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 235 Motion to Strike. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER SEALING EXH NO. 5 re 260 Declaration in Support, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.,. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/16/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER granting 248 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Defendant's Time To File Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Strike The Declaration Of Jennifer L. Murray filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.,, 246 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Extensions of Time filed by Robin Antonick. Replies re mtn to strike due by 1/2/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 249 STIPULATION AND MODIFIED ORDER re 247 STIPULATION Extending Time For Plaintiff To File Opposition And Defendant To File Reply To Motion To Strike Rebuttal Reports By Michael Barr And Garry Kitchen filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. Reset Dea dlines as to 240 MOTION to Strike "Rebuttal" Expert Reports by Michael Barr and Garry Kitchen. Responses due by 1/9/2013. Replies due by 1/16/2013. Motion Hearing set for 1/29/2013 04:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 12/27/2012. (knm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting 216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Summary Judgment Motion filed by Robin Antonick. Reset Deadlines as to 194 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Responses due by 11/21/2012. Replies due by 12/5/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/6/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 201 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER RE SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. Reset Deadlines as to 194 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/2/2012. Replies due by 11/12/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/25/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
September 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 189 SCHEDULING ORDER re 185 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER [PROPOSED] STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.,. SJ Motion due by 10/5/2012. Responses due by 10/24/2012. Replies due by 11/2/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/24/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2012)
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER scheduling CMC re 160 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.,. Case Management Statement due by 8/17/2012. Case Management Conference set for 8/24/2012 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/26/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2012)
July 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 114 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 122 Motion for Discovery. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2012)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER re 133 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Move Summary Judgment Hearing Date filed by Robin Antonick, Reset Hearing as to 122 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Rule 56(d); 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motions Hearing set for 7/20/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/19/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER re 119 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and to File Overlength Memorandum filed by Robin Antonick, Reset Deadlines re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 6/6/2012, not to exceed thirty pages of text. Replies due by 6/15/2012. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/1/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL. Motions terminated: 67 MOTION to Compel Responses to Interrogatory Nos. 1-6 and 8; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 1/17/2012. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2012)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 22 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 32 Stipulation filed by Robin Antonick. Response to EA request for judicial notice due by 7/15/2011. Replydue by 8/15/2011.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/23/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
April 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER extending time re 20 Stipulation, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.,, Set/Reset Deadlines as to 20 Stipulation,. Responses due by 7/15/2011. Replies due by 8/15/2011. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/22/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonick v. Electronic Arts, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Antonick
Represented By: Robert Carey
Represented By: Stuart McKinley Paynter
Represented By: Leonard W Aragon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts, Inc.,
Represented By: Brian L. Ferrall
Represented By: Robert Adam Lauridsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?