Kralovetz v. Grounds
Plaintiff: Rodney T. Kralovetz
Respondent: Grounds
Case Number: 3:2011cv01552
Filed: March 30, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING 18 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Rodney T. Kralovetz. Traverse due by 1/31/2013.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/17/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2013)
December 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS; DIRECTING PETITIONER TO CHOOSE DISMISSAL, AMENDMENT OR STAY OF THE PETITION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 12/12/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; GRANTING 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/3/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kralovetz v. Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney T. Kralovetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Grounds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?