Ariba, Inc. v. Rearden Commerce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ariba, Inc.
Defendant: Ketera Technologies, Inc. and Rearden Commerce, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01619
Filed: April 1, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 48 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
November 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 59 Stipulation to Continue to the CMC filed by Ariba, Inc., Rearden Commerce, Inc., Ketera Technologies, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/21/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2011)
September 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT, DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIMS, AND PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER; filed by Ariba, Inc., Rearden Commerce, Inc., Ketera Technologies, Inc. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 09/19/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte denying 16 Motion to Dismiss; denying 18 Motion to Strike ; denying without prejudice 23 Motion to Bifurcate (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
August 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline, to and including 8/9/2011, for plaintiff to file opposition to motions to stage/bifurcate discovery; No replie to be filed; Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 8/3/2011. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariba, Inc. v. Rearden Commerce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ketera Technologies, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Catherine Ehrlich
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Represented By: Laurie Carr Mims
Represented By: Nikki Khanh Vo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rearden Commerce, Inc.
Represented By: Lisa Catherine Ehrlich
Represented By: Stuart L. Gasner
Represented By: Laurie Carr Mims
Represented By: Nikki Khanh Vo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariba, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Jacobs
Represented By: Peter J. Drobac
Represented By: Yar R. Chaikovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?