E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company v. USA Performance Technology, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Defendant: Performance Group (USA), Inc., Walter Liew, John Liu and USA Performance Technology, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01665
Filed: April 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Extending Stay (The Clerk shall administratively close the case). Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/23/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2014) Modified on 7/23/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER APPROVING 79 Status Report and Granting Stipulation to Extend Stay. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 23, 2014. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER Extending Stay of Action RE 77 Status Report. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING 75 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/25/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014)
December 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re 71 Joint Status Report and ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/3/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 STIPULATION EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
July 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/12/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2013)
May 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING 65 STIPULATION EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION AND PERMITTING PLAINTIFF E. I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN 30 DAYS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/21/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2013)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING the parties' request that the stay be extended until 05/27/2013. Counsel shall submit a joint status report by 05/20/2013. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 03/26/2013. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING 59 Stipulation Extending Stay of Action. Status Report due by 1/18/2013.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/20/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER GRANTING 57 REQUEST EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/21/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
July 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER GRANTING 55 JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/24/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING 53 EXTENSION OF STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/23/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/27/2012. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING 49 STIPULATION EXTENDING STAY OF ACTION. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/31/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING 47 Extension of Stay of Action. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER CONTINUING STAY RE: 44 Status Report. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
July 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 Stipulation selecting Early Neutral Evaluation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/5/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company v. USA Performance Technology, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Performance Group (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Daniel S. Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Liew
Represented By: On Lu
Represented By: Daniel S. Mount
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Performance Technology, Inc.
Represented By: On Lu
Represented By: Daniel S. Mount
Represented By: Kevin Martin Pasquinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
Represented By: Clement L. Glynn
Represented By: Jonathan Andrew Eldredge
Represented By: P. Clarkson Collins, Jr.
Represented By: Jason C. Jowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?