Keung TSE v. eBay, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ho Keung TSE
Defendant: eBay, Inc., Ubid Inc and America Online Inc
Case Number: 3:2011cv01812
Filed: April 13, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 134 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW ATTORNEY by Judge Alsup finding as moot 135 Motion to Withdraw ; denying 138 Motion to Withdraw (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 12, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY re 125 Proposed Order filed by Ho Keung TSE. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 28, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
June 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE by Judge William Alsup [denying 114 Motion to Appear by Telephone]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2011)
June 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DISMISSING ALL DEFENDANTS EXCEPT EBAY, INC. FOR MISJOINDER UNDER FRCP 21 re 102 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Ho Keung TSE, 78 Order. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 2, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/2/2011)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY CLAIMS SHOULD NOT BE SEVERED. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 9, 2011. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keung TSE v. eBay, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ho Keung TSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc.
Represented By: Sean P DeBruine
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Jane H. Bu
Represented By: Marissa R. Ducca
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Deepa Nama
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubid Inc
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America Online Inc
Represented By: Jane H. Bu
Represented By: Roger Brian Craft
Represented By: Sean P DeBruine
Represented By: Marissa R. Ducca
Represented By: Eric Hugh Findlay
Represented By: Deepa Nama
Represented By: Alan Lee Whitehurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?