Bennett et al v. Simplexgrinnell LP
Plaintiff: Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott and Jose D. Valdez
Defendant: Simplexgrinnell LP
Case Number: 3:2011cv01854
Filed: April 18, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jon S Tigar
Referring Judge: Nandor J Vadas
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2015 Filing 279 Declaration of Mark Patton in Support of #277 Motion Hearing, re #278 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment; --Declaration Regarding Certification of Settlement Payments filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #277 , #278 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 11/2/2015)
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ATTORNEYS' FEES, COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #272 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting #275 Motion to Approve Consent Judgment. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2015)
September 3, 2015 Filing 277 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jon S. Tigar: Fairness hearing held. Motion Hearing held on 9/3/2015 re #272 MOTION for Attorney Fees , Costs, and Service Awards filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler; #275 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and final approval of class action settlement filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Dana R. Rendahl, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/3/2015)
July 30, 2015 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #275 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and final approval of class action settlement. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 276 [Proposed] Order Granting re #275 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and for final approval of class action settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 30, 2015 Filing 275 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment and final approval of class action settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Laura Ho, Esq., #2 Declaration of Mark Patton, #3 Exhibit A, class notice, #4 Exhibit B, estimated share form)(Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 7/30/2015)
July 17, 2015 Filing 274 Declaration of Carolyn B. Hall Regarding Notice of Proposed Class Action Settlement Provided Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1715 filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/17/2015)
July 7, 2015 Filing 273 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #272 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Related document(s) #272 ) (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/7/2015)
June 23, 2015 Filing 272 MOTION for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Jon Hotzler, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. Motion Hearing set for 9/3/2015 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 7/7/2015. Replies due by 7/14/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Raymond C. Fay ISO Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Service, #2 Declaration of Laura L. Ho ISO Plaintiffs Motion for Attorneys Fees, Costs, and Service Awards, #3 Declaration of Jason J. Rozger ISO Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards, #4 Declaration of Bruce E. Menken ISO Plaintiffs Motion For Attorneys Fees, Costs, And Service Awards, #5 Declaration of Darren Scott ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards, #6 Declaration of Jon Hotzler ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service, #7 Declaration of Gary Charles Backlund ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service Awards, #8 Declaration of Jose Valdez ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Costs, and Service, #9 Appendix, #10 Exhibit Cases Tab 1 to 7, #11 Exhibit Case Tab 8 to 12)(Kan, James) (Filed on 6/23/2015)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge Jon S. Tigar; granting #264 Motion for Settlement. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2015: #(1) Exhibit 1, #(2) Exhibit A, #(3) Exhibit B) (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2015 Set/Reset Hearing: Fairness Hearing set for 9/3/2015 at 2:00 PM. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2015)
February 9, 2015 Filing 270 Supplemental Brief re #264 MOTION for Settlement; Joint Supplemental Brief ISO Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement; Submission of Amended Settlement Agreement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement)(Related document(s) #264 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
February 6, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez re #264 MOTION for Settlement; -Joint Statement Regarding Submission of Amended Class Action Settlement Agreement (Kan, James) (Filed on 2/6/2015)
January 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #264 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 26, 2015. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2015)
December 30, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #264 MOTION for Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 267 Declaration of James Kan in Support of #264 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #264 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 266 Declaration of Bruce E. Menken in Support of #264 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #264 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 265 Declaration of Raymond C. Fay in Support of #264 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1 (Settlement Agreement), #(2) Exhibit 2 (Letter from Settlement Services))(Related document(s) #264 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 12/30/2014)
December 30, 2014 Filing 264 PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement)(Kan, James) (Filed on 12/30/2014) Modified on 12/31/2014 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 263 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #262 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Dana R. Rendahl, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 15, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2014)
December 12, 2014 Filing 262 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Deadline to File Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Kan, James) (Filed on 12/12/2014)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER CONTINUING LITIGATION DEADLINES re #260 Notice, filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 4, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
November 4, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #252 MOTION to Strike Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Robert Crandall; #251 MOTION to Strike Notice of Motion and Motion to Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert Fountain, PhD; #243 MOTION to Certify Class Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification; #242 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 12/15/2014. Replies due by 12/22/2014. Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2015 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
October 31, 2014 Filing 260 NOTICE by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez; Joint Notice of Class Action Settlement and Request to Continue Litigation Deadlines (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/31/2014)
October 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 259 Discovery Order extending deadlines in previous Order [Doc. 235]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 10/23/2104. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2014)
October 22, 2014 Filing 258 [Proposed] Order Extending Plaintiffs' Deadline to Supplement Interrogatory Response re #257 Discovery Hearing filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/22/2014)
October 22, 2014 Filing 257 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 10/21/2014 before Nandor J. Vadas (Date Filed: 10/22/2014). (Recording #2:00-2:15.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2014)
October 21, 2014 Filing 256 CLERK'S NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/21/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Parties shall dial 888.684.8852 and enter access code 1868782 to make their appearances. This is a text-only docket entry. No document is associated with this notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 255 Declaration of Jacqueline Thompson in Support of #243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification, re #254 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #243 , #254 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying #250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2014)
October 6, 2014 Filing 253 RESPONSE to (re #250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ); Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Theresa Ricketts in Support of Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Local Rule 79-5(e))(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/6/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 252 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Strike Portions of the Rebuttal Expert Report of Robert Crandall filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/16/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bruce Menken, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, Robert Crandall 8/11/14 rebuttalexpert report, #3 Exhibit B, excerpts from 1/16/14 deposition of Robert Crandall, #4 Exhibit C, excerpts from 8/27/14 deposition of Robert Crandall, #5 Exhibit D, Robert Crandall 1/16/14 rebuttal report)(Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 251 MOTION to Strike; Notice of Motion and Motion to Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert Fountain, PhD filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 11/10/2014. Replies due by 11/24/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert Fountain, PhD, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #5 Exhibit 4 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #6 Exhibit 5 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #7 Exhibit 6 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #8 Exhibit 7 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #9 Exhibit 8 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #10 Exhibit 9 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #11 Exhibit 10 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #12 Exhibit 11 (Part 1 of 4) to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #13 Exhibit 11 (Part 2 of 4) to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #14 Exhibit 11 (Part 3 of 4) to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #15 Exhibit 11 (Part 4 of 4) to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #16 Exhibit 12 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 250 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Kan, #2 Declaration of Jacqueline Thompson- redacted, #3 Declaration of Jacqueline Thompson-unredacted, #4 Proposed Order)(Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 249 [Proposed] Order Granting re #243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 248 Appendix of Authorities in Support of re #243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #243 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 247 Declaration of Gary Backlund in Support of re #243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #243 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 246 Declaration of Raymond Fay in Support of re #243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #243 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 245 Declaration of Bruce E. Menken in Support of re #243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #243 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 244 Declaration of James Kan in Support of re #243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; MPA ISO Class Certification filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Related document(s) #243 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 243 MOTION to Certify Class; Plaintiffs Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/16/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 2, 2014 Filing 242 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 10/16/2014. Replies due by 10/23/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carolyn B. Hall in Support of Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/2/2014)
October 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part #235 Discovery Letter Brief. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
October 1, 2014 Filing 240 [Proposed] Order re #235 Joint Discovery Letter Brief; -[Proposed] Order Compelling Plaintiffs To Supplement Their Discovery Responses filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Roginson, Robert) (Filed on 10/1/2014)
September 23, 2014 Filing 239 Minute Entry: Hearing regarding Document No. 235 held. (Date Filed: 9/23/2014). (Recording #1:07-1:13.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2014)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #237 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 236 Clerk's Notice, #235 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jose D. Valdez, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson Status Conference set for 9/23/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. September 16, 2014 Status Conference VACATED. Signed by Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 9/16/14. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2014)
September 15, 2014 Filing 237 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Continuing Telephonic Status Conference on re #235 Joint Discovery Letter Brief re 236 Clerk's Notice filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Kan, James) (Filed on 9/15/2014)
September 10, 2014 Filing 236 CLERK'S NOTICE: A telephonic Status Conference regarding the Joint Discovery Letter Brief (Docket No. 235) is set for 9/16/2014 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Parties shall dial 888-684-8852 and enter Access Code 1868782 to make their appearances. This is a text-only docket entry. No document is associated with this Notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 9, 2014 Filing 235 Joint Discovery Letter Brief filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
August 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 234 ORDER DENYING CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Jon S. Tigar denying #227 Motion for Certificate of Appealability. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #227 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on August 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2014)
July 10, 2014 Filing 232 REPLY (re #227 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability; -Defendant SimplexGrinnell LPs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Certification Of An Order For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28. U.S.C. Section 1292(b); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof); -Reply in Support of Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Motion for Certification of an Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/10/2014)
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 231 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #229 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Expert Discovery, Fact Discovery, Motion Schedules, and Mediation filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motions due by 10/2/2014. Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 3, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Filing 230 RESPONSE to (re #227 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability; Defendant SimplexGrinnell LPs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Certification Of An Order For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28. U.S.C. Section 1292(b); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof); -Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Motion for an Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1292 filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Denying Defendants Motion for an Order for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 USC 1292)(Kan, James) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
July 3, 2014 Filing 229 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Regarding Expert Discovery, Fact Discovery, Motion Schedules, and Mediation filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/3/2014)
June 24, 2014 Filing 228 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #227 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability Defendant SimplexGrinnell LPs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Certification Of An Order For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28. U.S.C. Section 1292(b). This Motion has been noticed for hearing on a date when the Court is unavailable. The Motion Hearing is CONTINUED to 8/28/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. All other deadlines remain the same. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2014)
June 19, 2014 Filing 227 MOTION for Certificate of Appealability; -Defendant SimplexGrinnell LPs Notice Of Motion And Motion For Certification Of An Order For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28. U.S.C. Section 1292(b); Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order Granting Defendant SimplexGrinnell LPs Motion For Certification Of Order For Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. Section 1292(b))(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/19/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 226 CLERK'S NOTICE Pursuant to the request of the parties, the motion hearing set for June 10, 2014 is VACATED. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 225 Letter Brief re #219 MOTION to Compel Telephone deposition of Robert Crandall conditionally withdrawing motion filed byGary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Related document(s) #219 ) (Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION TO ENFORCE A COURT ORDER by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part #204 Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2014)
May 28, 2014 Filing 223 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to re #219 MOTION to Compel Telephone deposition of Robert Crandall. Motion Hearing set for 6/10/2014 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Parties may appear by phone by dialing 888.684.8852 and entering access code 1868782. This is a text-only docket entry. No document is associated with this Notice. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014)
May 27, 2014 Filing 222 REPLY (re #219 MOTION to Compel Telephone deposition of Robert Crandall ) filed byGary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Rozger, #2 Exhibit G, excerpts from Dr. Robert Fountain deposition)(Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 20, 2014 Filing 221 RESPONSE to (re #219 MOTION to Compel Telephone deposition of Robert Crandall); -Defendant SimplexGrinnell LPs Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Robert Crandall filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Carolyn B. Hall in Support of Defendant SimplexGrinnell's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Robert Crandall, #(2) Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel the Deposition of Robert Crandall)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/20/2014)
May 14, 2014 Filing 220 Answer to Amended Complaint #218 Amended Complaint; -Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Answer to Fourth Amended Complaint- filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/14/2014)
May 6, 2014 Filing 219 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Compel Telephone deposition of Robert Crandall filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Jose D. Valdez. Motion Hearing set for 6/3/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 205, 2nd Floor, Eureka before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Responses due by 5/20/2014. Replies due by 5/27/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jason Rozger, Esq., #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A, Defendant's Revised Expert Report, #4 Exhibit B, emails between counsel, #5 Exhibit C., emails between counsel, #6 Exhibit D, emails between counsel, #7 Exhibit E, emails between counsel, #8 Exhibit F, emails between counsel)(Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 5/6/2014)
May 2, 2014 Filing 218 AMENDED COMPLAINT; Fourth Amended Complaint for Violation of Prevailing Wage Law, Wage and Hour Laws, and Unfair Competition Law against Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott, Gary Charles Backlund, Jose D. Valdez. Filed by Gary Charles Backlund, Jose D. Valdez. (Kan, James) (Filed on 5/2/2014)
April 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #216 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Permitting Plaintiffs to File a Fourth Amended Complaint and Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Motions due by 6/20/2014. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 29, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 25, 2014 Filing 216 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Permitting Plaintiffs to File a Fourth Amended Complaint and Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order)(Kan, James) (Filed on 4/25/2014)
April 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #204 MOTION Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 214 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney; Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP; [Proposed] Order filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Responses due by 4/23/2014. Replies due by 4/30/2014. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 3, 2014 Filing 213 REPLY (re #204 MOTION Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce the Courts January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Carolyn Hall, #(2) Declaration (Reply) of Christopher Haan, PhD)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/3/2014)
March 27, 2014 Filing 212 RESPONSE to (re #204 MOTION Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce the Courts January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support); -Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Enforce/Strike filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of James Kan in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition Brief to Defendants Motion to Enforce/Strike, #3 Exhibit 1 to 6, #4 Exhibit 7 to 18)(Kan, James) (Filed on 3/27/2014)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME #206 . Plaintiffs may depose SimplexGrinnell's expert no later than 4/21/14. The deadline for dispositive and class certification motions is continued to 5/23/14. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only docket entry)(jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 21, 2014 Filing 210 REPLY (re #206 Ex-Parte Application for additional time to depose Defendant's expert Robert Crandall) Reply filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 3/21/2014)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER RE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME #206 . The Court has reviewed SimplexGrinnell's opposition to this motion. No later than 3/24/14 at noon, Plaintiffs may file a reply limited to SimplexGrinnell's request for a continuance of the deadlines to file dispositive motions and motions relating to class certification. Both parties are advised that, in the event that the Court grants Bennett's request for additional time to conduct the deposition of SimplexGrinnell's expert, the Court is likely to continue all relevant deadlines by approximately the amount of time consumed by the current round of briefing. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on 3/20/14. (This is a text-only docket entry)(jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2014)
March 19, 2014 Filing 208 RESPONSE to (re #206 Ex Parte Application for additional time to depose Defendant's expert Robert Crandall); -Defendant SimplexGrinnell LPs Response To Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time To Complete The Deposition Of Defendants Expert Witness filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Of Carolyn B. Hall In Support Of Defendant SimplexGrinnells Opposition To Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time To Complete The Deposition Of Defendants Expert Witness, #(2) Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Time To Complete The Deposition Of Defendants Expert Witness)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/19/2014)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 207 ORDER RE: MOTION TO EXTEND TIME #206 . Defendants may file an opposition to this motion by noon on 3/19/14. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only docket entry) (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 206 Ex Parte Application for additional time to depose Defendant's expert Robert Crandall filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 17, 2014 Filing 205 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to #204 MOTION Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce the Courts January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery. This motion has been noticed for a date closed to further settings. The hearing is therefore CONTINUED to 4/24/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2014)
March 13, 2014 Filing 204 MOTION to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce the Courts January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 3/27/2014. Replies due by 4/3/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Christopher Haan, Ph.D., in Support of Motion to Enforce the Courts January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #2 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Courts January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof, #3 Exhibit 1-6 to the Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #4 Exhibit 7-10 to the Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #5 Exhibit 11-12 to the Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #6 Exhibit 13-14 to the Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #7 Exhibit 15 - Part 1 of 2 - Pages 1 - 27 to the Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #8 Exhibit 15 - Part 2 of 2 - Pages 28 - 54 to the Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #9 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Enforce the Courts January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery)(Roginson, Robert) (Filed on 3/13/2014)
March 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS' REBUTTAL EXPERT, ROBERT CRANDALL by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #198 Ex-Parte Application. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2014)
March 8, 2014 Filing 202 CLERK'S NOTICE TERMINATING MOTION re #201 MOTION for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11. This motion is terminated as it is not an administrative motion. The motion shall be re-filed by the moving party and noticed for hearing per Local Rule 7. This is a text only entry. There is no document associated with this notice. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11; Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Responses due by 3/11/2014. Replies due by 3/18/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Christopher Haan, Ph.D. in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #2 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #3 Exhibit 1-6 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #4 Exhibit 7-10 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #5 Exhibit 11-12 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #6 Exhibit 13-14 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #7 Exhibit 15 Part 1 of 2 Pages 1-27 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #8 Exhibit 15 Part 2 of 2 Pages 28-54 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery, #9 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Enforce the Court's January 21, 2014 Order Relating to Expert Discovery)(Roginson, Robert) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 7, 2014 Filing 200 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Dominick C Capozzola; Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 3/7/2014)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE AS MOOT by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #137 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying as moot #175 Motion to Strike. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2014)
March 4, 2014 Filing 198 Ex Parte Application for an extension of time to complete the deposition of Defendant's rebuttal expert witness filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, Crandall revised report, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Menken, Bruce) (Filed on 3/4/2014)
January 27, 2014 Filing 197 REPLY (re #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) Defendant SimplexGrinnell's Response To Plaintiffs' Statement Of Recent Decision Re: Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 1/27/2014)
January 24, 2014 Filing 196 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Statement of Recent Decision Re: Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed byDon C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Related document(s) #137 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 1/24/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 195 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Robert Fountain (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 23, 2014 Filing 194 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Deny Class Certification (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/23/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 193 [Proposed] Order re #171 Opposition/Response to Motion; [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 192 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #191 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Corrected Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Discovery, Motion Schedules, and Mediation filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 21, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Filing 191 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Corrected Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Discovery, Motion Schedules, and Mediation filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 21, 2014 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motions due by 3/27/2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 190 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulation And [Proposed] Order Regarding Expert Discovery, Motion Schedules, And Mediation filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 17, 2014 Filing 189 REPLY (re #175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau); Defendants Reply In Support Of Motion To Strike Plaintiffs Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau And Expert Report Of Douglas Nareau filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Roginson, Robert) (Filed on 1/17/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson; #175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 14, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 187 DECLARATION of James Kan in Support of re #186 Opposition/Response to Motion to Strike filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1-3)(Related document(s) #186 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 9, 2014 Filing 186 RESPONSE to (re #175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau) filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Denying Defendants Motion to Strike the Expert Report of Douglas Nareau)(Kan, James) (Filed on 1/9/2014)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 185 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #184 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on January 8, 2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 184 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Kan, James) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #180 Ex Parte Application. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Filing 182 RESPONSE to (re #180 Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Briefing Schedule); Defendant SimplexGrinnell's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Extension of Briefing Schedule filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Extension of Briefing Schedule, #(2) Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application for Extension of Briefing Schedule)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to Motion for Class Certification. Motion due by 1/30/2014. Responses due by 3/3/2014. Replies due by 3/17/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #175 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau. Responses due by 1/9/2014. Replies due by 1/18/2014. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #176 MOTION to Certify Class MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION. Replies due by 1/30/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
January 2, 2014 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #177 MOTION to Strike The Expert Report of Dr. Robert Fountain and Preclude His Testimony. Responses due by 1/30/2014. Replies due by 3/3/2014. Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2014)
December 30, 2013 Filing 181 Declaration of James Kan in Support of re #180 Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Briefing Schedule filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit 1-4)(Related document(s) #180 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 30, 2013 Filing 180 Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Briefing Schedule filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs Ex Parte Application For Extension Of Briefing Schedule)(Kan, James) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 179 [Proposed] Order Granting re #177 MOTION to Preclude The Expert Report of Dr. Robert Fountain and Preclude His Testimony; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Preclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Robert Fountain Ph.D. filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 20, 2013 Filing 178 [Proposed] Order Granting re #176 MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION; [Proposed] Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Deny Class Certification filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 12/20/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 177 MOTION to Strike; Notice of Motion & Motion to Preclude the Expert Report of Dr. Robert Fountain and Preclude His Testimony filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/2/2014. Replies due by 1/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #2 Exhibit 1 to Capozzola Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Capozzola Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1) to Capozzola Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2) to Capozzola Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 (Part 3) to Capozzola Declaration, #7 Exhibit 3 (Part 4) to Capozzola Declaration, #8 Exhibit 3 (Part 5) to Capozzola Declaration, #9 Exhibit 4 (Part 1) to Capozzola Declaration, #10 Exhibit 4 (Part 2) to Capozzola Declaration, #11 Exhibit 5 to Capozzola Declaration, #12 Declaration of Christopher Haan, #13 Declaration of Daniel Simkewicz, #14 Exhibit 1-5 of Daniel Simkewicz Declaration, #15 Exhibit 6-10 of Daniel Simkwicz Declaration, #16 Exhibit 11-20 to Daniel Simkewicz Declaration)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 176 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Deny Class Certification; MOTION TO DENY CLASS CERTIFICATION filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/2/2014. Replies due by 1/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Motion to Deny Class Certification, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #3 Exhibit 2 (Part 1) to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #4 Exhibit 2 (Part 2) to the Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #5 Exhibit 2 (Part 3) to Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 175 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 1/2/2014. Replies due by 1/9/2014. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert R. Roginson In Support of Defendant SimplexGrinnell's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau, #2 Declaration of Daniel F. Simkewicz In Support of Defendant SimplexGrinnell's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau, #3 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Proposed Expert Witness Douglas Nareau and Expert Report of Douglas Nareau)(Roginson, Robert) (Filed on 12/19/2013)
November 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 174 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #173 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Additional Extension of Plaintiffs Expert Report Deadline and Corresponding Schedule Changes filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 18, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 18, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2014 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2013)
November 17, 2013 Filing 173 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Additional Extension of Plaintiffs Expert Report Deadline and Corresponding Schedule Changes filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 11/17/2013)
November 14, 2013 Filing 172 REPLY (re #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment) In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration of Bruce E. Menken In Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit 19, #3 Exhibit 20-21, #4 Exhibit 22 part 1, #5 Exhibit 22 part 2, #6 Exhibit 23, #7 Exhibit 24, #8 Exhibit 25, #9 Exhibit 26)(Kan, James) (Filed on 11/14/2013)
November 7, 2013 Filing 171 RESPONSE to (re #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ) filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carolyn Hall, #2 Exhibit 1-12 to Hall Declaration, #3 Declaration of Jocelyn Merced, #4 Exhibit 1 to Merced Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2-3 to Merced Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4-5 to Merced Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6-7 to Merced Declaration, #8 Exhibit 8 to Merced Declaration, #9 Exhibit 9-12 to Merced Declaration, #10 Exhibit 13 to Merced Declaration, #11 Exhibit 14 to Merced Declaration, #12 Exhibit 15-17 to Merced Declaration, #13 Exhibit 18-20 to Merced Declaration, #14 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #15 Exhibit 1-7 to Capozzola Declaration, #16 Exhibit 8-21 to Capozzola Declaration, #17 Exhibit to Capozzola Declaration, #18 Exhibit 33-42 to Capozzola Declaration)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 11/7/2013) Modified on 11/8/2013 (tnS, ).
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF PATRICK NICASSIO filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on November 5, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Karla A. Gilbride (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE of Change of Address by Raymond C. Fay (Fay, Raymond) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
November 5, 2013 Filing 167 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS OF PATRICK NICASSIO filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 11/5/2013)
October 31, 2013 Filing 166 Answer to Third Amended Complaint re #125 Third Amended Complaint; Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Answer to Third Amended Complaint filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 10/31/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part re #144 Motion to Compel; terminating re #163 Discovery Letter Brief; terminating re #164 Discovery Letter Brief. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 23, 2013 Filing 164 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 10/23/2013)
October 18, 2013 Filing 163 Supplemental Discovery Letter Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL EXTENSION OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT REPORT DEADLINE AND CORRESPONDING SCHEDULE CHANGES by Judge Jon S. Tigar re #159 Stipulation; finding as moot #151 Motion to Continue. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 18, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Class Certification Motions due by 1/30/2014. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2013)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar, granting #129 Motion to Dismiss. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
October 17, 2013 Filing 160 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/17/2013 before Nandor J Vadas (Date Filed: 10/17/2013). (Recording #10:44-11:08.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/17/2013)
October 16, 2013 Filing 159 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Additional Extension of Plaintiffs Expert Report Deadline and Corresponding Schedule Changes filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #157 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Additional Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2013)
October 15, 2013 Filing 157 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Additional Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Kan, James) (Filed on 10/15/2013)
October 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #155 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on October 1, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 30, 2013 Filing 155 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER re #154 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline; Corrected Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline...CORRECTION TO DOCKET #154 filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Kan, James) (Filed on 9/30/2013)...Modified on 10/1/2013 (tnS).
September 30, 2013 Filing 154 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER for Extension of Plaintiffs' Expert Report Deadline filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Kan, James) (Filed on 9/30/2013)
September 26, 2013 Filing 153 RESPONSE (re #151 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' Expert Report ) Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Extend Expert Report Deadline filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Opposition to Motion to Continue Expert Report Deadline (Local Rule 6-3))(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 9/26/2013)
September 25, 2013 Filing 152 REPLY (re #144 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel ) filed byDon C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration -- Corrected Declaration of Jason Rozger)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Mediation Hearing set for 11/19/2013 10:00 AM., at Jones Day555 California Street, 26th Floor, San Francisco, CA 94104. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 23, 2013 Filing 151 MOTION to Continue Deadline for Plaintiffs' Expert Report filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karla Gilbride, #2 Proposed Order)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER VACATING HEARING re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 23, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #148 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 20, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 19, 2013 Filing 148 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/19/2013)
September 18, 2013 Filing 147 RESPONSE to (re #144 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christie Hext, #2 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 9/18/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 146 Declaration of James Kan in Support of re #144 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A-E, #(2) Exhibit F-J)(Related document(s) #144 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 145 Declaration of Jason Rozger in Support of re #144 Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Related document(s) #144 ) (Kan, James) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 144 MOTION to Compel; Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2013 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Responses due by 9/18/2013. Replies due by 9/25/2013. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Kan, James) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS PARTIAL MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re #142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/7/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on September 4, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Filing 142 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Plaintiffs' Partial Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive Motions due by 12/17/2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
September 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/7/2013. Replies due by 11/14/2013. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2013)
August 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER DENYING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying re #134 MOTION for Reconsideration SimplexGrinnell's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 140 EXHIBIT A re #134 MOTION for Reconsideration; SimplexGrinnell's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities i Exhibit A to SimplexGrinnell's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Related document(s) #134 ) (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/29/2013).
August 29, 2013 Filing 139 AFFIDAVIT of Karla Gilbride in Support of re #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Declaration of Karla Gilbride filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 18)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 138 AFFIDAVIT of Douglas Nareau in Support of re #137 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit Douglas Nareau Curriculum Vita)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 9/11/2013. Replies due by 9/18/2013. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 28, 2013 Filing 136 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of re #134 SimplexGrinnell's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)(Related document(s) #134 ) (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/28/2013).
August 28, 2013 Filing 135 Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of re #134 SimplexGrinnell's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17 - Part 1 of 6, #18 Exhibit 17 - Part 2 of 6, #19 Exhibit 17 - Part 3 of 6, #20 Exhibit 17 - Part 4 of 6, #21 Exhibit 17 - Part 5 of 6, #22 Exhibit 17 - Part 6 of 6, #23 Exhibit 18, #24 Exhibit 19, #25 Exhibit 20, #26 Exhibit 21, #27 Exhibit 22, #28 Exhibit 23, #29 Exhibit 24, #30 Exhibit 25)(Related document(s) #134 ) (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/28/2013).
August 28, 2013 Filing 134 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points & Authorities in Support Thereof; SimplexGrinnell's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 7, 2012 Order Denying Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A, #(2) Exhibit B)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
August 26, 2013 Filing 133 REPLY (re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/26/2013)
August 24, 2013 Filing 132 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 6, 2012, before Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Court Reporter Raynee H. Mercado, CSR, Telephone number 510-451-7530, cacsr8258@gmail.com, raynee_mercado@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/22/2013. (Related documents(s) #126 ) (rhm, ) (Filed on 8/24/2013)
August 19, 2013 Filing 131 RESPONSE to (re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof ) filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Kan, James) (Filed on 8/19/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 130 Request for Judicial Notice to re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Related document(s) #129 ) (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
August 5, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Dismiss; Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 10/3/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 8/19/2013. Replies due by 8/26/2013. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 STIPULATION AND ORDER re #127 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on July 31, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 31, 2013 Filing 127 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 7/31/2013)
July 26, 2013 Filing 126 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Simplexgrinnell LP for Court Reporter Raynee Mercado. (Roginson, Robert) (Filed on 7/26/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 125 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; CORRECTION OF DOCKET #124 against All Defendants. Filed by Darren Scott, Comerlis Delaney, Don C. Bennett, Gary Robinson, Jon Hotzler. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 17, 2013 Filing 124 AMENDED COMPLAINT; Third Amended Complaint for Violation of Prevailing Wage Law Wage and Hour Laws and Unfair Competition Law against All Defendants. Filed by Darren Scott, Comerlis Delaney, Curt Kirschner, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, David A. Boecking, Jon Hotzler. (Ho, Laura) (Filed on 7/17/2013)
July 10, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Third Amended Complaint due by 7/17/2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2013)
July 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 Order Granting re #121 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint entered by Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Defendants having filed a Notice of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to File a Third Amended Complaint ("TAC"), the motion is granted. Plaintiffs are ordered to file the TAC within seven days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
July 8, 2013 Filing 122 Statement of Non-Opposition to re #121 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Leave to File THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; Defendant's Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Related document(s) #121 ) (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
June 28, 2013 Filing 121 MOTION for Leave to File THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 & 2, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 28, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #121 MOTION for Leave to File THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Responses due by 7/12/2013. Replies due by 7/19/2013. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/28/2013)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO BIFURCATE; GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND CASE DEADLINES by Judge Jon S. Tigar; denying re #112 Motion to Bifurcate; granting re #119 Stipulation. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 27, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fact Discovery due by 8/28/2013. Expert Disclosures due by 8/28/2013. Motion for Partial Summary Judgment due by 8/28/2013. Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 9/30/2013. Defendant's Expert Reports due by 10/21/2013. Mediation due by 10/29/2013. Expert Discovery due by 11/19/2013. Class Certification Motion due by 12/17/2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/27/2013)
June 24, 2013 Filing 119 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER; Stipulation and [Proposed] Order for Extension of Dates and Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/24/2013)
June 14, 2013 Filing 118 REPLY MEMORANDUM in Support of (re #112 MOTION to Bifurcate Under FRCP 42 and Extend Discovery Cutoff as to Damages) filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 117 RESPONSE to (re #112 MOTION to Bifurcate Under FRCP 42 and Extend Discovery Cutoff as to Damages); Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Bifurcate Under FRCP 42 and Extend Discovery Cutoff as to Damages filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #(1) [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Bifurcate Under FRCP 42 and Extend Discovery Cutoff as to Damages)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 4, 2013 Filing 116 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/4/2013 before Nandor J Vadas (Date Filed: 6/4/2013). (Recording #10:04-10:19.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/4/2013)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting in part and denying in part re #109 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part re #113 Discovery Letter Brief; granting in part and denying in part re #114 Discovery Letter Brief. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013)
June 3, 2013 Filing 114 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 6/3/2013)
May 31, 2013 Filing 113 Discovery Letter Brief filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 29, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Bifurcate Under FRCP 42 and Extend Discovery Cutoff as to Damages filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 6/7/2013. Replies due by 6/14/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO BIFURCATE UNDER FRCP 42 AND EXTEND DISCOVERY CUTOFF AS TO DAMAGES)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Discovery Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on May 28, 2013. (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing re #111 Discovery Order Discovery Hearing set for 6/4/2013 before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Instructions provided in #111 . (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER BRIEF re #109 . The letter brief will be resolved by Judge Vadas per re #84 . Signed by District Judge Jon S. Tigar. (This is a text-only docket entry) (jstlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2013)
May 22, 2013 Filing 109 Discovery Letter Brief; Joint Letter Brief filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/22/2013)
May 8, 2013 Filing 108 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 5/8/2013 before Judge Jon S. Tigar (Date Filed: 5/8/2013). (Court Reporter: Not reported.) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/8/2013)
May 1, 2013 Filing 107 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DATES, MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER, AND RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY MOTION re #105 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #100 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Data filed by Comerlis Delaney, David A. Boecking, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson. Discovery due by 6/28/2013. Expert Witness List due by 6/28/2013. Motions due by 10/17/2013. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on April 12, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 12, 2013 Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, the May 7, 2013 hearing is vacated. Set/Reset Hearing (njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2013)
April 11, 2013 Filing 105 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER for Extension of Dates, Modification of Scheduling Order, and Resolution of Discovery Motion, re #100 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Data filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 3, 2013 Filing 104 CLERK'S NOTICE Re-setting Hearing on re #100 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel for 5/7/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 1, 2013 Filing 103 STIPULATION WITH [PROPOSED] ORDER, Stipulation and Joint Notice to Continue Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Pursuant to Local Rule 7-7(a); [Proposed] Order Thereon filed by Simplexgrinnell LP, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott & Jon Hotzler. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order by Hon. Jon S. Tigar granting re #98 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Laura L. Ho. Attorneys Andrew Lah; Jeffrey Lewis; Nina Rachel Wasow; Catha Alison Worthman; Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman and Todd Jackson terminated. This is a text-only entry. There is no document associated with this Order. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 4/8/2013 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
March 20, 2013 Filing 101 CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing as to re #100 MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Data. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2013 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2013)
March 19, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE OF MOTION & MOTION to Compel Complete Production of Data, Electronically Stored Inspection Reports & Electronically Stored Timesheets filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. Motion Hearing set for 4/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 205, 2nd Floor, Eureka before Hon. Jon S. Tigar. Responses due by 4/2/2013. Replies due by 4/9/2013. (Attachments: #(1) Declaration Declaration of Karla Gilbride, #(2) Exhibit Exhibits to Gilbride Declaration, #(3) Declaration Declaration and Exhibits Jon Hotzler, #(4) [Proposed] Order)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 3/19/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 99 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 5/1/2013. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/8/2013 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District) (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION to Substitute Attorney filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 27, 2013 Filing 97 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT Pursuant to Order Reassigning Case to Jon S. Tigar filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton no longer assigned to the case. Signed by the Executive Committee on 2/11/13. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
January 30, 2013 ADR Remark: The deadline to complete the mediation has been extended to April 11, 2013 #95 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF DATES AND MODIFICATION OF SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #94 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 94 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Dates and Modification of Scheduling Order filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
October 16, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman (Hasselman, Margaret) (Filed on 10/16/2012)
October 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #91 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2012)
October 10, 2012 Filing 91 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Don C. Bennett, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 10/10/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 90 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2012 before Nandor J. Vadas (Date Filed: 9/25/2012). (Recording #11:04-11:17.) (glm, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/25/2012)
September 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas granting #83 Motion to Compel and Denying Request for Sanctions.(njvlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 12, 2012 Filing 88 REPLY (re #83 MOTION to Compel Complete Project and Payroll Data Without Employee Name Redactions ) filed byDon C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 9/12/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 87 RESPONSE (re #83 MOTION to Compel Complete Project and Payroll Data Without Employee Name Redactions ) filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Carolyn B. Hall In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Complete Project and Payroll Data Without Employee Names Redacted, #2 Exhibit A - D to the Declaration of Carolyn B. Hall In Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Complete Project and Payroll Data Without Employee Names Redacted, #3 Proposed Order)(Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 22, 2012 Filing 86 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to #83 MOTION to Compel Complete Project and Payroll Data Without Employee Name Redactions. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2012 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. Appearance information included in Clerk's Notice (glm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2012)
August 21, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #82 Stipulation.(nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge for Discovery purposes. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/12. (nahS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2012)
August 17, 2012 Filing 83 MOTION to Compel Complete Project and Payroll Data Without Employee Name Redactions filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 8/31/2012. Replies due by 9/7/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Karla Gilbride, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to Gilbride Declaration, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Orer)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 8/17/2012)
August 14, 2012 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Jon Hotzler, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 8/14/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 81 Answer to Amended Complaint #80 Amended Complaint Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Answer to Second Amended Complaint bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 26, 2012 Filing 80 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants. Filed byDarren Scott, Comerlis Delaney, Don C. Bennett, Gary Robinson. (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying #70 Request for Judicial Notice.. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 06/14/2012. (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
June 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton denying #62 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 77 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2012 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 6/6/2012) re #62 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c)); Decla filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #75 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 1, 2012 Filing 75 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
May 22, 2012 ADR Remark: The deadline to complete the Mediation was extended to September 30, 2012 #61 . (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 17, 2012 Filing 74 CLERKS NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on June 6, 2012 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 3 on the 3rd floor of the Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California, the HONORABLE PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON will conduct the hearing on Defendants Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings previously noticed for May 30, 2012, in this matter. Set/Reset Deadlines as to #62 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 6/6/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 STIPULATION AND ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT AND VACATING MAY 17, 2012 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #72 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Filing 72 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Modifying Pretrial Order filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 71 EXHIBITS re #69 Reply to Opposition/Response,,, Exhibit 21 to Supplemental Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Related document(s) #69 ) (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 70 Request for Judicial Notice re #62 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c)); Decla Request for Judicial Notice filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Related document(s) #62 ) (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 Filing 69 REPLY (re #62 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c)); Decla ) Defendant's Reply Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f)) filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19, #6 Exhibit 20 - Part 1 of 6, #7 Exhibit 20 - Part 2 of 6, #8 Exhibit 20 - Part 3 of 6, #9 Exhibit 20 - Part 4 of 6, #10 Exhibit 20 - Part 5 of 6, #11 Exhibit 20 - Part 6 of 6, #12 Exhibit 21)*** SEE CORRECT EXHIBIT AT #71 . *** (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/10/2012) Modified on 5/11/2012 (fff, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Order granting #65 Motion to Continue entered by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. While the court grants the motion to extend the pretrial deadlines, given that no trial date has been set, the parties shall meet and confer and submit a revised pretrial schedule by May 15, 2012. If the parties are unable to reach a stipulation, they shall appear for a further case management conference on May 17, 2012, at 2:00 pm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
May 4, 2012 Filing 67 Proposed Order re #65 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 66 Declaration of Nina Wasow in Support of #65 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines filed byDon C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #65 ) (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 65 MOTION to Continue Pretrial Deadlines filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 4, 2012 Filing 64 Proposed Order re #63 Opposition/Response to Motion, FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 5/4/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 63 RESPONSE (re #62 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c)); Decla ) Opposition filed byDon C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 19, 2012 Filing 62 Defendant's Notice of Motion and Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c)); Declaration of Dominick C. Capozzola in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c)); [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to FRCP 12(c) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 5/3/2012. Replies due by 5/10/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Proposed Order)(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 4/19/2012) Modified on 4/20/2012 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE MEDIATION DEADLINE by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #60 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Continue Mediation Deadline filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
February 22, 2012 Filing 59 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #57 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER ALLOWING DANA R. RENDAHL TO WITHDRAW AS NAMED PLAINTIFF by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #56 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 16, 2012 Filing 57 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 15, 2012 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER ALLOWING DANA R. RENDAHL TO WITHDRAW AS NAMED PLAINTIFF filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Darren Scott. (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 2/15/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER re #54 Stipulation filed by Comerlis Delaney, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/23/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 13, 2012 Filing 54 STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Revised Scheduling Order by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 1/13/2012)
January 11, 2012 Filing 53 ADR Clerks Notice Appointing Curt Kirschner as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER RE ADR. Case referred to mediation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/3/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 22, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by HAH on 12/22/11. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 51 Answer to #35 Amended Complaint by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 12/21/2011) Modified on 12/22/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2011 The ADR Clerk has scheduled a further ADR Phone Conference for 12/15/11 at 11:30 a.m. Pacific time re #49 Minutes. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 424-203-8400 and use access code 865637 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER by Judge Hamilton Denying in Part and Granting in Part #39 Motion to Dismiss; Denying Motion to Strike (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 49 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 12/7/2011) re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/7/2011)
November 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR TEMPORARY STAY OF DISCOVERY AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #45 Motion for Protective Order (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
November 8, 2011 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 11/8/11 has been taken off calendar. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 47 Proposed Order re #45 MOTION for Protective Order and for Temporary Stay of Discovery by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 46 Declaration of Raymond C. Fay in Support of #45 MOTION for Protective Order and for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed byDon C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) #45 ) (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
October 28, 2011 Filing 45 MOTION for Protective Order and for Temporary Stay of Discovery filed by Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 11/14/2011. Replies due by 11/21/2011. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 10/28/2011)
September 29, 2011 Filing 44 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d Re Defendant SimplexGrinnell LP's Motion to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief filed bySimplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #39 ) (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 43 CLERKS NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on December 7, 2011 at 9:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 3 on the 3rd floor of the Federal Building, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California, the HONORABLE PHYLLIS J. HAMILTON will conduct the hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss previously noticed for September 28, 2011, in this matter., Set/Reset Deadlines as to #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)). Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton.(THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 13, 2011 Filing 42 REPLY (re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 9/13/2011) Modified on 9/14/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 8, 2011 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Individual Named Plaintiff David A. Boecking by David A. Boecking (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 6, 2011 Filing 40 RESPONSE (re #39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6))) filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Dismiss)(Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 9/6/2011) Modified on 9/7/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 23, 2011 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, Motion to Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief (Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6)) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 9/28/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/6/2011. Replies due by 9/13/2011. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) and/or Strike Claims for Injunctive Relief Pursuant to FRCP 12(f))(Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 8/23/2011)
July 29, 2011 ADR Remark: Further ADR Phone Conference scheduled on 11/8/2011 at 10:30 a.m. Please use call in number 424-203-8400 and access code 865637 to be connected to the conference call. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 38 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 7/28/2011). Discovery due by 3/30/2012. Disclosure of Experts due by 3/30/2012. Plaintiffs' Reports due by 4/20/2012. Defendant's Reports due by 5/11/2012. Expert Discovery due by 5/30/2012. Motion for Class Certification and Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/18/2012. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2011)
July 28, 2011 Filing 37 FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT #38 FOR CORRECT ENTRY.Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/28/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 7/28/2011). Discovery due by 3/30/2012. Disclosure of Experts due by 3/30/2012. Plaintiffs' Reports due by 4/20/2012. Defendant's Reports due by 5/11/2012. Expert Discovery due by 5/30/2012. Motion for Class Certification and Dispositive Motions to be filed by 7/18/2012. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/28/2011) Modified on 7/28/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2011 Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by Karla A Gilbride on behalf of Plaintiffs (Gilbride, Karla) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 27, 2011 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Simplexgrinnell LP. Filed byDarren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Dana R. Rendahl, David A. Boecking. (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 27, 2011 ADR Remark: ADR Phone Conference held by Howard A. Herman, ADR Program Director, on 7/25/2011. (af, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2011)
July 21, 2011 Filing 34 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Simplexgrinnell LP, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Dana R. Rendahl, David A. Boecking. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 7/21/2011) Modified on 7/22/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 20, 2011 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simplexgrinnell LP re #32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of ADR options PROOF OF SERVICE (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 20, 2011 Filing 32 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options ADR CERTIFICATION BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 19, 2011 Filing 31 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 15, 2011 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Nina Rachel Wasow (Wasow, Nina) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 15, 2011 ADR Remark: The ADR Phone Conference scheduled for 7/26/11 has been rescheduled to 7/25/11 at 9:00 a.m. Pacific/12:00 noon Eastern time. Please note that all parties shall call 424-203-8400 and use access code 865637 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
July 13, 2011 Filing 29 ADR Clerks Notice Setting ADR Phone Conference on 7/26/11 at 11:30 a.m. Pacific time. Please take note that at the appointed time, all parties shall call 424-203-8400 and use access code 865637 to join the call. (sgd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2011)
July 8, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Catha Alison Worthman Notice of Appearance for Andrew Lah (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) CORRECTION OF DOCKET #25 (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 26 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
July 7, 2011 Filing 25 See document #27 for Corrected AttachmentNOTICE of need for ADR Phone Conference (ADR L.R. 3-5 d) (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 7/7/2011) Modified on 7/8/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David A. Copus. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jocelyn A. Merced. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 22 MOTION of David A. Copus for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007142.) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 21 MOTION OF Jocelyn A. Merced for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611007142.) filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME re #19 Stipulation, filed by Comerlis Delaney, David A. Boecking, Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
June 6, 2011 Filing 19 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Request to Change Time by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Catha Worthman ISO Stipulated Request to Change Time)(Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 6/6/2011) Modified on 6/7/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2011 Filing 18 Certificate of Interested Entities by Simplexgrinnell LP identifying Corporate Parent Tyco International Ltd., Other Affiliate Simplex Time Recorder Co., Other Affiliate STR Grinnell GP Holding LLC, Other Affiliate Grinnell LP, Other Affiliate Master Protection LP for Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Strike Plaintiffs' Claims for Injunctive Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Simplexgrinnell LP. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 17, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, to Strike Plaintiffs' Claims for Injunctive Relief; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Simplexgrinnell LP. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2011. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 5/16/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Bruce E. Menken. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simplexgrinnell LP re #11 Notice of Appearance of Counsel Dominick C. Capozzola (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Dominick C Capozzola (Capozzola, Dominick) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 12, 2011 Filing 13 MOTION of Bruce E. Menken for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 44611006966.) filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/12/11. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simplexgrinnell LP re #7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, #6 Notice of Appearance of Counsel Carolyn B. Hall (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 11, 2011 ***EMC deadlines terminated. #8 Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 7 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Simplexgrinnell LP and Request For Reassignment to a United States District Judge. (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 10, 2011 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Blecha Hall (Hall, Carolyn) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 5, 2011 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Dana R. Rendahl, David A. Boecking. Simplexgrinnell LP served on 4/26/2011, answer due 5/17/2011. (Worthman, Catha) (Filed on 5/5/2011) Modified on 5/6/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF).
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting #3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Fay) (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
April 25, 2011 Filing 3 MOTION of Raymond C. Fay for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059170) filed by Don C. Bennett, David A. Boecking, Comerlis Delaney, Dana R. Rendahl, Gary Robinson, Darren Scott. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/20/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/27/2011 01:30 PM. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; summons issued against Simplexgrinnell LP (Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44611006829). Filed by Darren Scott, Don C. Bennett, Comerlis Delaney, Gary Robinson, Dana R. Rendahl, David A. Boecking. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)
April 18, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bennett et al v. Simplexgrinnell LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Charles Backlund
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: James Kan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don C. Bennett
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Andrew Lah
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Karla A. Gilbride
Represented By: Margo Elizabeth Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Boecking
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Andrew Lah
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Karla A. Gilbride
Represented By: Margo Elizabeth Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Comerlis Delaney
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Margo Elizabeth Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Andrew Lah
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Karla A. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Hotzler
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Margo Elizabeth Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Karla A. Gilbride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana R. Rendahl
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Andrew Lah
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Karla A. Gilbride
Represented By: Margo Elizabeth Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Robinson
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Andrew Lah
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Karla A. Gilbride
Represented By: Margo Elizabeth Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Scott
Represented By: Margaret Elizabeth Hasselman
Represented By: Laura L. Ho
Represented By: Andrew Lah
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: Catha Alison Worthman
Represented By: James Kan
Represented By: Jason Rozger
Represented By: Jeffrey Lewis
Represented By: Karla A. Gilbride
Represented By: Margo Elizabeth Hasselman Greenough
Represented By: Nina Rachel Wasow
Represented By: Raymond C. Fay
Represented By: Todd F. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose D. Valdez
Represented By: Bruce E. Menken
Represented By: James Kan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simplexgrinnell LP
Represented By: Robert Raymond Roginson, n/a
Represented By: Carolyn Blecha Hall
Represented By: David A. Copus
Represented By: Dominick C Capozzola
Represented By: Jocelyn A. Merced
Represented By: Robert Raymond Roginson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?