National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Payless Shoe Source, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Defendant: Payless Shoe Source, Inc. and Collective Brands, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01892
Filed: April 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER re 84 Stipulated Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/15/2013. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2013)
February 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 2/22/2013. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/15/2013. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2013)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER resetting further CMC to 4/11/13. Case Management Statement due by 4/4/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/11/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/12/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 74 Continunace of Further CMC filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/11/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Denying 40 Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin Defendants from Prosecuting Similar Litigation in Kansas. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 54 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 40 MOTION TO ENJOIN DEFENDANTS FROM PROSECUTING SIMILAR LITIGATION IN KANSAS Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply Brief filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Plaintiff's reply due 7/3/12. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/2/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re 33 Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER Case Management Statement due by 6/22/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/29/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/14/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2012)
October 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 26 Stipulation filed by Collective Brands, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
July 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC TO 10/7/11 re 19 Stipulation filed by Collective Brands, Inc., Payless Shoe Source, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/28/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2011)
July 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/19/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 14 Stipulation filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA v. Payless Shoe Source, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Bruce D. Celebrezze
Represented By: Nicholas Justin Boos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Payless Shoe Source, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collective Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Andrew Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?