Genentech, Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc.
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc. and Roche Palo Alto, LLC
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Interested Party: Apotex Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01925
Filed: April 20, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Laurel Beeler
Referring Judge: Jeffrey S White
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER GRANTING #175 STIPULATION to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/8/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2014)
January 7, 2014 Filing 175 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/7/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER VACATING CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/3/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2014)
December 30, 2013 Filing 172 NOTICE by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC re #171 Notice (Other), Plaintiffs' Response to Apotex, Inc.'s Notice That It is Not A Party to the Stipulation to Vacate Claim Construction Order (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 12/30/2013)
December 27, 2013 Filing 171 NOTICE by Apotex Inc. re #170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to File Stipulation to Vacate Claim Construction Order Under Seal Apotex's Notice that It Is not a Party to the Proposed Stipulation To Vacate the Claim Construction Order (Miller, Andy) (Filed on 12/27/2013)
December 24, 2013 Filing 170 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Motion to File Stipulation to Vacate Claim Construction Order Under Seal filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hunt ISO Sandoz, Inc.'s Administrative Motion, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion, #3 Redacted Stipulation To Vacate Claim, #4 Unredacted Stipulation to Vacate Claim, #5 Proposed Order Vacating Claim)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 12/24/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 169 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Aaron S. Lukas (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 168 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Richard T. Ruzich (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 167 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Barry Golob (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 166 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Kerry B. McTigue (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 165 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Donald McPhail (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 164 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of W. Blake Coblentz (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting (161) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:11-cv-01925-JSW (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
October 25, 2013 Filing 161 Joint Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Stipulation and Order to Continue Hearing on Summary Judgment Motion filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eric Hunt, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File Stip and Order to Continue Hearing on Summary Judgment Motion, #3 Redacted Stipulation, #4 Unredacted Stipulation)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 10/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #151 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Brief (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
September 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2013)
July 9, 2013 Filing 156 RESPONSE (re #154 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 Permitting Plaintiffs to Supplement the Summary Judgment Record ) filed bySandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 Permitting Plaintiffs to Supplement the Summary Judgment Record)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 7/9/2013)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER CONTINUING DATES. Jury Selection set for 3/12/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 3/17/2014 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Hearing on Motions for Summary Judgment set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/8/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
July 5, 2013 Filing 154 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Administrative Relief Pursuant to Local Rule 7-11 Permitting Plaintiffs to Supplement the Summary Judgment Record filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rabinowitz Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 31-37 (Under Seal), #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 5, 2013 Filing 153 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Rabinowitz Declaration, #2 Errata Exhibits 31-37 (Under Seal), #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/5/2013)
July 2, 2013 Filing 152 RESPONSE (re #142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ) PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SANDOZ INC.'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (Public Redacted Version) filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Stephen S. Rabinowitz (Public Redacted Version))(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/2/2013)
June 27, 2013 Filing 151 First Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Reply Brief filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Reply Brief, #4 ISO Reply Brief(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 6/27/2013) Modified on 7/2/2013 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2013 Filing 150 ERRATA re #143 Declaration in Opposition, FILING CORRECTED EXHIBIT 18 UNDER SEAL by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/18/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 149 EXHIBITS re #143 Declaration in Opposition, filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29-2, #2 Exhibit 29-3, #3 Exhibit 29-4, #4 Exhibit 30-1, #5 Exhibit 30-2, #6 Proposed Order Denying Sandoz Inc.'s Motion for SJ, #7 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 148 EXHIBITS re #143 Declaration in Opposition, filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28-14, #2 Exhibit 28-15, #3 Exhibit 28-16, #4 Exhibit 28-17, #5 Exhibit 28-18, #6 Exhibit 28-19, #7 Exhibit 28-20)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 147 EXHIBITS re #143 Declaration in Opposition, filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 28-6, #2 Exhibit 28-7, #3 Exhibit 28-8, #4 Exhibit 28-9, #5 Exhibit 28-10, #6 Exhibit 28-11, #7 Exhibit 28-12)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 146 EXHIBITS re #143 Declaration in Opposition, filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 25, #2 Exhibit 26 UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 27, #4 Exhibit 28-1, #5 Exhibit 28-2, #6 Exhibit 28-3, #7 Exhibit 28-4)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 145 EXHIBITS re #143 Declaration in Opposition, filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24-1, #2 Exhibit 24-2, #3 Exhibit 24-3, #4 Exhibit 24-4, #5 Exhibit 24-5, #6 Exhibit 24-6, #7 Exhibit 24-7)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 144 EXHIBITS re #143 Declaration in Opposition, filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 21-2, #2 Exhibit 21-3, #3 Exhibit 21-4, #4 Exhibit 21-5, #5 Exhibit 22-1, #6 Exhibit 22-2, #7 Exhibit 22-3)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 17, 2013 Filing 143 DECLARATION of STEPHEN S. RABINOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF PLAINITFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT SANDOZ INC.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed under seal filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-5 UNDER SEAL, #3 Exhibit 6, #4 Exhibit 7-17 UNDER SEAL, *** #5 Exhibit 18 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET #150 . *** , #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Filing 142 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Eisensmith Decl. in Support of Admin Motion to File Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order to file Under Seal)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER RE DISCOVERY: Re #134 Document E-Filed Under Seal filed by Sandoz Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 6/12/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 140 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of M. Anderson ISO Admin Motion, #2 Proposed Order re Motion to Seal, #3 Redacted MSJ, #4 Declaration of E. Hunt and Redacted Exhibits 1-4, #5 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 5 part 1, #6 Exhibit Redacted Ex. 5 part 2 - Ex. 11)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 6/7/2013)
June 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE denying #138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2013)
May 31, 2013 Filing 138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 137 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 5/30/2013 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 5/30/2013). (Recording #FTR: 12:49-12:53 - Under Seal Recording) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2013)
May 29, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE: The court sets a short telephone call to discuss the letter that was filed at ECF No. 134 for May 30, 2013 at 11:45 a.m. Only counsel who signed that letter are to appear unless they agree that someone else should too. If the time is inconvenient, they should confer with the courtroom deputy, Lashanda Scott at 415-522-3140 to arrange a different time. Counsel to make the necessary arrangements through CourtCall. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER GRANTING (135 in 3:11-cv-01925-JSW) AND (83 in 3:11-cv-02410-JSW) STIPULATION TO COMPLETE EXPERT DISCOVERY BEYOND CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY DATE IN AGREED AND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO COMPLETE EXPERT DISCOVERY BEYOND CLOSE OF EXPERT DISCOVERY DATE IN AGREED AND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 134 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #111 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal May 24, 2013 Letter Brief by Sandoz Inc.. (Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
April 22, 2013 Filing 133 NOTICE of Change of Address by Timothy Martin Flaherty for JOSEPH T. JAROS (Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 4/22/2013)
April 15, 2013 Filing 132 Mail sent to Joseph T. Jaros returned as undeliverable re 127 Order. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/15/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #130 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Michael A. Kleinman (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 10, 2013 Filing 130 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Michael A. Kleinman with Certificate of Good Standing ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7617391.) filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Kleinman, Michael) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RELEASING SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF APRIL 4, 2013 HEARING TO DEFENDANT SANDOZ, INC.: Re #126 Notice (Other) filed by Sandoz Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/9/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER RELEASING SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF APRIL APRIL 4, 2013 HEARING TO PLAINTIFFS GENENTECH, INC. AND ROCHE PALO ALTO LLC: Re #125 Notice (Other), filed by Roche Palo Alto, LLC, Genentech, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/9/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/9/2013)
April 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER RE Discovery. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/5/2013. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 126 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. re Discovery Hearing Application for and Order Releasing Sealed Transcript of April 4, 2013 Hearing to Defendants Sandoz, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 125 NOTICE by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC re #124 Discovery Hearing Application for an Order Releasing Sealed Transcript of April 4, 2013 Hearing to Plaintiffs Genentech, Inc. and Roche Palo Alto LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Releasing Sealed Transcript of April 4, 2013 Hearing to Plaintiffs Genentech, Inc. and Roche Palo Alto LLC)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
April 4, 2013 Filing 124 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 4/4/2013 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 4/4/2013). (Court Reporter Margo Gurule (Transcript Under Seal)) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/4/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER re #110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Roche Palo Alto, LLC, Genentech, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/3/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 3, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE: The court sets a short telephonic hearing in the Sandoz case only, C11-1925 JSW, and not the Apotex case, for 4/4/2013 at 9:00 A.M. Counsel in that case should circulate a call-in phone number (and cc the court at lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov) because the case is under seal.) Discovery Hearing set for 4/4/2013 at 9:00 a.m. with Sandoz Deft Case Only before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (This is a docket text entry only. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
April 1, 2013 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
April 1, 2013 Filing 121 Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on March 18, 2013, before Judge Beeler. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sarah Goekler, Telephone number (530)941-2621; sgoekler.csr@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (slg, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER RELEASING SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF MARCH 18, 2013 HEARING TO PLAINTIFFS GENENTECH, INC. AND ROCHE PALO ALTO LLC: re #118 Notice (Other), filed by Roche Palo Alto, LLC, Genentech, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/1/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER RELEASING SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON MARCH 18, 2013 TO DEFENDANT SANDOZ, INC: re #116 Transcript Order filed by Sandoz Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler on 4/1/2013. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 118 NOTICE by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER RELEASING SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF MARCH 18, 2013 HEARING TO PLAINTIFFS GENENTECH, INC. AND ROCHE PALO ALTO LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order RELEASING SEALED TRANSCRIPT OF MARCH 18, 2013 HEARING TO PLAINTIFFS GENENTECH, INC. AND ROCHE PALO ALTO LLC)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 29, 2013 Filing 117 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #111 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Lerner follow up letter to Judge Beeler on Sandoz' submission of the Parties' joint letter by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Letter March 26 2013 with Plaintiffs' portion, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/29/2013)
March 28, 2013 Filing 116 TRANSCRIPT ORDER by Sandoz Inc. for Court Reporter Sarah Goekler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 26, 2013 Filing 115 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #111 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-2 and A-B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D-I, #4 Exhibit J)(Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 3/26/2013)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 114 (UNDER SEAL) Order RE Discovery Signed by Judge Laura Beeler on 3/18/2013. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 113 Minute Entry: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 3/18/2013 before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler (Date Filed: 3/18/2013). (Court Reporter Sarah Goelker) (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/18/2013)
March 18, 2013 Filing 112 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #111 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Letter Brief re: Discovery Dispute dated March 5, 2013 to Judge Beeler by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/18/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (kcS, ).
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7-11 TO FILE DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Granting #110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/18/2013)
March 15, 2013 CLERKS NOTICE regarding telephonic hearing. The court would like to schedule a brief telephone conference call with the parties about the pending joint discovery letter brief and has some time on Monday at around 3:30 p.m. 11 a.m. that day is another possibility. The parties are directed to confer and contact courtroom deputy Lashanda Scott either by joint email to the orders box at lbpo@cand.uscourts.gov or by call to 415-522-3140 to confirm a time. (Beeler, Laurel) (Filed on 3/15/2013)
March 6, 2013 Filing 110 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joshua H. Lerner in Support of Administrative Motion to File under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting Administrative Motion to File under Seal)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 3/6/2013)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING #108 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 7, 2013 Filing 108 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Eric Hunt ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7465253.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 2/7/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #103 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Deanne M. Mazzochi (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #102 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for William A. Rakoczy (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
February 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE granting #104 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Yixin H. Tang (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 104 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Yixin H. Tang ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7449939.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 103 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Deanne M. Mazzochi ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7449916.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 31, 2013 Filing 102 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for William A. Rakoczy ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7449803.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 1/31/2013)
January 30, 2013 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Martin Flaherty of Morris Polich & Purdy LLP (Flaherty, Timothy) (Filed on 1/30/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order by Hon. Jeffrey S. White granting #98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew V. Anderson.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order by Hon. Jeffrey S. White granting #97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Joseph T. Jaros.(tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 98 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Matthew V. Anderson ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7418846.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
January 18, 2013 Filing 97 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice of Joseph T. Jaros ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-7418793.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 1/18/2013)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER GRANTING : (78 in 3:11-cv-02410-JSW) AND (94 in 3:11-cv-01925-JSW) JOINT ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR RELIEF PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 TO AMEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL ORDER AS AMENDED. Discovery due by 3/1/2013. Expert Witness List due by 5/24/2013. Jury Selection set for 10/23/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 10/28/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 7/12/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 11/13/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 95 Declaration in Support of #94 Notice (Other), DECLARATION OF STEPHEN S. RABINOWITZ IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO L.R. 7.11 TO AMEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL ORDER filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ONE)(Related document(s) #94 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
November 9, 2012 Filing 94 JOINT NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO L.R. 7.11 TO AMEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order AND STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR ADMINISTRATIVE RELIEF PURSUANT TO L.R. 7-11 TO AMEND THE CASE MANAGEMENT AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL ORDER)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 11/9/2012) Modified on 11/13/2012 (hdjS, COURT STAFF).
November 7, 2012 Filing 93 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING TO CORRECT DATE: Dispositive Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012) Modified on 11/7/2012 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #90 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Barry Paul Golob (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2012)
August 24, 2012 Filing 91 Proposed Order re #90 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611077889.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/24/2012 by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 24, 2012 Filing 90 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Barry Paul Golob ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611077889.) Filing fee previously paid on 8/24/2012 filed by Sandoz Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2012)
August 7, 2012 Filing 89 NOTICE OF REFERRAL AND ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(lblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler for Discovery (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CASE MANAGEMENT AND MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL ORDER: Jury Selection set for 8/14/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jury Trial set for 8/19/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/7/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2012)
August 3, 2012 Filing 87 STATUS REPORT Joint Case Management Status Report by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 8/3/2012. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 7/10/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2012)
June 14, 2012 Filing 85 Transcript of Proceedings held on 5/30/12, before Judge Jeffrey S. White. Court Reporter/Transcriber Sahar Bartlett, CSR, RPR, Telephone number (415) 626-6060/sahar_bartlett@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/12/2012. (Bartlett, Sahar) (Filed on 6/14/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 84 Minute Entry: Claims Construction Hearing held on 5/30/2012 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 5/30/2012). (Court Reporter Sahar Bartlett.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/30/2012)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting (82) Stipulation TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING ON MAY 30, 2012 in case 3:11-cv-01925-JSW; granting (65) Stipulation TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING ON MAY 30, 2012 in case 3:11-cv-02410-JSW (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 30, 2012 Filing 82 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #78 Order, JOINT SUPPLEMENTAL ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO COURTROOM FOR CLAIM CONSTRUCTION HEARING ON MAY 30, 2012, AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Rosloff, Genevieve) (Filed on 5/30/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 81 AMENDED NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS (WITH CORRECT HEARING DATE). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 29, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 80 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 29, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 29, 2012 Filing 79 STATEMENT OF RECENT DECISION pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-3.d filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #58 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED (60 in 3:11-cv-02410-JSW) AND (77 in 3:11-cv-01925-JSW) Joint Administrative Request To Bring Equipment Into Courtroom For Claim Construction Tutorial On May 23, 2012, Claim Construction Hearing On May 30, 2012. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 Filing 77 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #64 Clerks Notice, Joint Administrative Request To Bring Equipment Into Courtroom For Claim Construction Tutorial On May 23, 2012, Claim Construction Hearing On May 30, 2012, And [Proposed] Order filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Rosloff, Genevieve) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 8, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. of Withdrawal of Appearance of Vicki Norton, PhD (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 5/8/2012)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #69 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Aaron S. Lukas (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #67 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for W. Blake Coblentz ( (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #71 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Donald McPhail (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 72 Proposed Order re #71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073673.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/3/2012 by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 71 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Donald McPhail ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073673.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/3/2012 filed by Sandoz Inc. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 70 Proposed Order re #69 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073674.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/3/2012 by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Aaron S. Lukas ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073674.) Filing fee previously paid on 5/3/2012 filed by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 68 Proposed Order re #67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073675.) by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 3, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-W. Blake Coblentz ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 34611073675.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
April 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #65 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Erik L. Jackson and Motion for Withdrawal of Jessica LaLonde As Counsel. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHIT on 4/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 24, 2012 Filing 65 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Erik L. Jackson and Motion for Withdrawal of Jessica LaLonde As Counsel; [Proposed] Order (Jackson, Erik) (Filed on 4/24/2012)
March 22, 2012 Filing 64 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING THE CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL AND HEARING: Claims Construction Hearing set for 5/30/2012 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 5/23/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 63 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. re #31 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Laura A. Vogel (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 62 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. re #37 Order Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Vincent L. Capuano, Ph.D. (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 15, 2012 Filing 61 NOTICE by Sandoz Inc. re #23 Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Pro Hac Vice of Robert M. Gould, Ph.D. (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
February 17, 2012 Filing 60 NOTICE by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC NOTICE OF COMPLETION OF PRIVATE ADR (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/17/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 59 Declaration of Second Declaration of Stephen S. Rabinowitz ISO of Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief in Support of #58 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) #58 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 2, 2012 Filing 58 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Reply Claim Construction Brief by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING #56 STIPULATION TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2012)
January 30, 2012 Filing 56 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND ADR DEADLINE filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 26, 2012 Filing 55 Brief re #53 Brief Defendant's Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed bySandoz Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Vincent Capuano Dec in Support, #2 Exhibits 1 - 5 to Capuano Dec, #3 Exhibits 6 - 7 to Capuano Dec, #4 Exhibit 8 to Capuano Dec, #5 Exhibits 9 - 12 to Capuano Dec, #6 Jessica La Londe Dec Re Capuano's Concurrence in Filing and Retention of Original Signature)(Related document(s) #53 ) (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 1/26/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 54 Declaration of Stephen S. Rabinowitz in Support of #53 Brief Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) #53 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 53 Brief Plaintiffs' Opening Claim Construction Brief filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
November 28, 2011 Filing 52 CLAIM CONSTRUCTION STATEMENT Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4-3 filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 11/28/2011)
October 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING (46 in 3:11-cv-02410-JSW) and (50 in 3:11-cv-01925-JSW) Stipulation to Extend ADR Deadline. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 24, 2011 Filing 50 STIPULATION re #42 Order, Set/Clear Flags Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend ADR Deadline by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
October 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #48 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/17/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
October 17, 2011 Filing 48 Proposed Order [Proposed] Stipulated Protective Order by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 10/17/2011)
August 24, 2011 Filing 47 NOTICE of Change of Address by Jessica E. La Londe Sandoz Inc.'s Notice of Change of Address of Duane Morris LLP's Boston Office (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 5, 2011 Filing 46 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC PARTIES DECLINATION TO REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 8/5/2011)
August 1, 2011 Filing 45 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING THE CLAIMS CONSTRUCTION TUTORIAL AND HEARING: Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/10/2012 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 4/3/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 Filing 44 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/29/2011 before Judge Jeffrey S. White (Date Filed: 8/1/2011). Replies due by 8/22/2011. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/27/2012 01:30 PM. Tutorial Hearing set for 3/20/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2011)
July 29, 2011 Filing 43 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Sandoz Inc. (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 7/29/2011)
July 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER GRANTING #39 Stipulation selecting Private ADR.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 41 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P 26(f) AND CIVIL LOCAL RULE 16-9 filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 40 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Genentech, Inc. and Roche Palo Alto, LLC (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 22, 2011 Filing 39 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC and Sandoz Inc. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE for Vincent L. Capuano. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/20/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 14, 2011 Filing 38 MOTION for attorney Vincent L. Capuano leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611062204.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 5, 2011 Filing 36 Plaintiffs ANSWER to Counterclaim s byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 7/5/2011)
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #32 Motion to Relate Case (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 13, 2011 Filing 34 Sandoz Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC bySandoz Inc.. (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 33 Declaration of JOSHUA H. LERNER in Support of #32 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed byGenentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) #32 ) (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
June 3, 2011 Filing 32 MOTION to Relate Case ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONSIDER WHETHER CASES SHOULD BE RELATED filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order, #2 Proof of Service on Apotex)(Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
May 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #28 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Laura A. Vogel (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandoz Inc. re #28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059860.) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 29 Proposed Order re #28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059860.) by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 13, 2011 Filing 28 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Laura A. Vogel ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059860.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 7/29/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Case Management Statement due by 7/22/2011.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/10/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. La Londe Notice of Appearance of Vicki G. Norton, Ph.D. (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Kerry B. McTigue (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #18 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Richard T. Ruzich (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Robert M. Gould (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 4, 2011 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC re #1 Complaint PROOF OF SERVICE-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 5/4/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sandoz Inc. re #20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.), #17 Proposed Order, #21 Proposed Order, #18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.), #19 Proposed Order, #16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.) (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 21 Proposed Order re #20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.) by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 20 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice -Robert M. Gould ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 19 Proposed Order re #18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.) by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 18 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Richard T. Ruzich ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 17 Proposed Order re #16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.) by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice-Kerry B. McTigue ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611059293.) filed by Sandoz Inc.. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead by Sandoz Inc.. (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
May 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting #4 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Randy C. Eisensmith (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Commitee on 4/29/11. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 29, 2011 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 10 Certificate of Interested Entities by Sandoz Inc. (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
April 28, 2011 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica E. La Londe (Attachments: #1 Certification of Interested Parties)*** DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR AS ATTACHMNET. REFER TO DOCUMENT #10 . *** (La Londe, Jessica) (Filed on 4/28/2011) Modified on 4/28/2011 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 Filing 8 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/26/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 22, 2011 Filing 6 COMPLAINT CORRECTED PDF TO INCLUDE PAGE 3 AS FILED ON APRIL 20 against Sandoz Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611058936.). Filed byRoche Palo Alto, LLC, Genentech, Inc.. (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 4/22/2011)
April 21, 2011 Filing 5 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding PATENT INFRINGEMENT (cc: form mailed to register). (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2011)
April 20, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Randy C. Eisensmith leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611058936.) filed by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 7/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 7/28/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/20/11. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Roche Holdings, Ltd., Other Affiliate Roche Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Roche Finance Ltd. for Genentech, Inc., Roche Palo Alto, LLC. re #1 Complaint (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /issued summons against Sandoz Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611058936.). Filed byRoche Palo Alto, LLC, Genentech, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2011) (Main Document 1 replaced on 1/30/2019) (rcsS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genentech, Inc. et al v. Sandoz Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genentech, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Solomon Rabinowitz
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Randy C. Eisensmith
Represented By: Michael Kleinman
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roche Palo Alto, LLC
Represented By: Stephen Solomon Rabinowitz
Represented By: Genevieve Patricia Rosloff
Represented By: Randy C. Eisensmith
Represented By: Michael Kleinman
Represented By: Daralyn J. Durie
Represented By: Joshua H. Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Apotex Inc.
Represented By: Andy Joe Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandoz Inc.
Represented By: Vicki Gee Norton
Represented By: Robert M Gould
Represented By: Barry Paul Golob
Represented By: Laura A. Vogel
Represented By: Vincent L. Capuano
Represented By: Eric R. Hunt
Represented By: Yixin H Tang,
Represented By: William A. Rakoczy
Represented By: Deanne M. Mazzochi
Represented By: W. Blake Coblentz
Represented By: Joseph Thomas Jaros
Represented By: Aaron Scott Lukas
Represented By: Richard T. Ruzich
Represented By: Matthew V. Anderson,
Represented By: Erik L. Jackson
Represented By: Kerry B McTigue
Represented By: Jessica E. La Londe
Represented By: Timothy Martin Flaherty
Represented By: Donald R. McPhail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?