Sohal et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Roberta Sohal and Michael W. Wright
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation, LSI Title Company and Does 1 through 10
Case Number: 3:2011cv01941
Filed: April 21, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER GRANTING 154 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline To File Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/13/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2013)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER FOLLOWING Pretial Conference, DENYING Motions in Limine as Moot, Denying Leave to Amend, Reconsidering and Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on Wrongful Foreclosure and UCL Claim. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 6, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2013)
January 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 COURT'S INTENDED VOIR DIRE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/25/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2013)
January 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER Granting as Unopposed 119 Motion in Limine No. 1; DENYING 122 Motion in Limine No. 4; GRANTING IN PART 123 Motion in Limine No. 5; and issuing tentative ruling and questions on remaining motions in limine. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 24, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES OF DISPUTED EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/23/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2013)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 105 Stipulation to advance settlement conference. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FURTHER ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 12/5/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 8, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2012)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 82 Discovery Letter Brief.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2012)
July 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 7/30/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2012)
January 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 71 Stipulation To Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 4/6/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/13/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/30/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
September 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 60 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 2/11/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 1/28/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 29 , 33 Motions to Dismiss. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF TENTATIVE RULING AND QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 25, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 6 Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2011)
April 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON 6 Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 29, 2011. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sohal et al v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Sohal
Represented By: Phillip Gabor Vermont
Represented By: Patrick E. Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W. Wright
Represented By: Phillip Gabor Vermont
Represented By: Patrick E. Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Peter Joseph Salmon
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Ian Joseph Da Cunha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cal-Western Reconveyance Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Nathaniel Abbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSI Title Company
Represented By: William Lindsay Partridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?