Oyster Incorporated et al v. Equilon Enterprises, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amsia Management Corporation, Hassan Eghdami, Joseph Fazio, Hampton's Service, Inc., CBK Inc., Jonts Gasmart, Inc., Premium Auto-Tech Inc., James Lin, Hung Trinh, VTH Resources, Inc., Will Y. Wong, SD Tek Inc., Edwards & Anderson, Inc. and Oyster Incorporated
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises, LLC and Southern Counties Oil Co.
Case Number: 3:2011cv01969
Filed: April 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 39 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED PRE-TRIAL DEADLINES. Discovery due by 3/4/2013. Jury Selection set for 6/26/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Jur y Trial set for 7/1/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/28/13. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2013)
December 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING 37 Stipulation to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 11, 2012. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2012)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING 35 STIPULATION re Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/19/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING 33 STIPULATION RE VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/1/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 31 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date and Related Pre-Trial Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/7/2013. Jury Trial set for 5/6/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion H earing set for 2/22/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/22/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2012)
July 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING 29 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date and Related Pre-Trial Deadlines. Discovery due by 11/5/2012. Jury Trial set for 2/25/2013 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/11/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
March 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING 27 STIPULATION to Continue Trial Date and Related Pre-Trial Deadlines. Discovery due by 7/16/2012. Exhibit List due by 6/15/2012. Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 08:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffr ey S. White. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/23/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING 21 Stipulation re (1) Voluntary Dismissal of Southern Counties Oil and (2) Filing of Answer to First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011)
August 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/2/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oyster Incorporated et al v. Equilon Enterprises, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amsia Management Corporation
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hassan Eghdami
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Fazio
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hampton's Service, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CBK Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonts Gasmart, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premium Auto-Tech Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Lin
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hung Trinh
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VTH Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Will Y. Wong
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SD Tek Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwards & Anderson, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oyster Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas Paul Bleau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equilon Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Robin Assaf Wofford
Represented By: Hubert Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Counties Oil Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?