Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Apple, Inc. Featured Case
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02079
Filed: April 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RELATING CASE. This case is related to 11-CV-1846. Signed by Judge Lucy H. Koh on 5/20/11. (mpb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2011) (Entered: 05/23/2011)
May 17, 2011 Filing 12 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to Answer Complaint filed by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC, Apple, Inc.. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 5/17/2011) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
May 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting re 9 Application for Admission of Attorney William F. Lee Pro Hac Vice representing Apple Inc. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2011) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
May 11, 2011 Filing 10 Certification of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Apple, Inc.. (Selwyn, Mark) (Filed on 5/11/2011) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
May 3, 2011 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS IN A CIVIL CASE filed by by Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC of re 3 ADR Scheduling Order, re 5 Patent/Trademark Copy, re 2 Summons Issued, re 1 Complaint, re 6 Notice & re 4 Certificate of Interested Entities - ON DEFENDANT APPLE INC. (Maroulis, Victoria) (Filed on 5/3/2011) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
April 27, 2011 Filing 6 ATTACHMENT to re 5 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark infringement filed by Samsung Electronics Co.,Ltd. & Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2011) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Edward J. DeFranco
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Michael Thomas Zeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samsung Telecommunications America, LLC
Represented By: Edward J. DeFranco
Represented By: Kevin P.B. Johnson
Represented By: Victoria F. Maroulis
Represented By: Charles Kramer Verhoeven
Represented By: Michael Thomas Zeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Daniel Selwyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?