Rosenfeld v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Plaintiff: Seth Rosenfeld
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation and United States Department of Justice
Case Number: 3:2011cv02131
Filed: April 29, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 75 Stipulation of Dismissal. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2015)
November 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Further Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Further Settlement Conference set for 1/7/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco.(shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2014)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Further Settlement Conference by Chief Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Further Settlement Conference set for 8/7/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Updated confidential settlement conference statements shall be lodged with the Court by July 28, 2014. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2014)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Filed in error - please disregard.
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER FOR PARTIES TO CONTINUE MEET AND CONFER EFFORTS. Status Report due by 10/10/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2013)
August 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER - Status Report due by 9/19/2013. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/30/2013. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
November 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James granting 46 Stipulation To Extend Date of Meet and Confer. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2012)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/1/2012. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2012)
July 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER RE CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion and Opposition filed by Seth Rosenfeld, 14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendant's Notice of Motion; Motion for Summary Judgment filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bureau of Investigation. Status Report due by 7/13/2012.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/2/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2012)
January 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REQUESTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING; ORDER VACATING 2/9/12 SUMMARY JUDGMENT HEARING. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/23/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2012)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 29 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 20 First MOTION for Summary Judgment Cross-Motion and Opposition. Stipulation to Reset Hearing Date and [Proposed] Order filed by United States Department of Justice, Federal Bu reau of Investigation. Motion Hearing Rescheduled to 2/9/2012 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 1/19/12. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2012)
January 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO RECONSIDER ORDER re 26 Response ( Non Motion ), filed by Seth Rosenfeld. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/3/2012. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re 19 Unopposed Request for Order Extending Time filed by Seth Rosenfeld. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/15/11. (bjtS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
September 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING Motion To Be Excused From the Formal ADR Process. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/6/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
July 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Case Management Statement due by 9/15/2011. Case Management Conference set for 9/22/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/7/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosenfeld v. Federal Bureau of Investigation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Rosenfeld
Represented By: Benjamin Wolf Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Ila Casy Deiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?