Wilson v. San Francisco Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff: Damon Wilson
Defendant: San Francisco Federal Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2011cv02150
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 17 Stipulation filed by Damon Wilson. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/5/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
August 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER RESETTING CMC to 10/28/11. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/16/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. San Francisco Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damon Wilson
Represented By: David James McGlothlin
Represented By: Joshua B. Swigart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?