Mendoza v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Terry Mendoza
Defendant: United States of America and Regents of the University of California
Case Number: 3:2011cv02158
Filed: May 2, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Benito
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER re 67 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/2/16. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2016)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER resetting CMC. Case Management Statement due by 2/4/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/11/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/8/16. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/8/2016)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 63 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue December 17, 2015, Case Management Conference Date filed by United States of America Case Management Statement due by 1/7/2016. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/14/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2015)
October 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 12/10/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/17/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/07/2015. (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2015)
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 55 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by United States of America Case Management Statement due by 4/16/2015. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/9/15. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2015)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 49 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference Date filed by United States of America Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2014. Further Case Management Conference reset for 11/20/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/9/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2014)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference and Mediation Completion Date filed by United States of America Case Management Statement due by 12/5/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/5/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 37 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference and Mediation Completion Date filed by United States of America Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 8/8/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/22/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
February 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 27 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Continue the Case Management Conference filed by United States of America Case Management Statement due by 5/11/2012. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/18/2012 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/16/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 6 Stipulation filed by Terry Mendoza. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/8/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER extending time to answer re 3 Stipulation filed by Regents of the University of California. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/13/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Mendoza
Represented By: Gary Wm. Baun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Barry W Ponticello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?