Office Depot, Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Office Depot, Inc.
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sharp Electronics Corporation, HannStar Display Corporation, Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., LG Display Co., Ltd., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc. and Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc
Special Master: Martin Quinn
Case Number: 3:2011cv02225
Filed: May 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2015 Filing 344 Conditional REMAND ORDER. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi for the MDL Panel on 3/9/15. (Attachments: #1 Order Suggesting Remand to Transferor Courts )(ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2015)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 343 ORDER SUGGESTING REMAND TO TRANSFEROR COURTS (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/24/2015)
February 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS re #334 , 9214 . (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/23/2015) Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/24/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 20, 2015 Filing 341 JOINT STATUS REPORT for Track 2 Cases by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 2/20/2015) Modified on 2/23/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER RE: REMAINING TRACK 2 AND OREGON CASES. Status statement is due by 2/20/15. (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/9/2015) Modified on 2/10/2015 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #338 , (9290) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI of Dismissal (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2014) Modified on 11/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2014 Filing 338 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 9290) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/5/2014)
October 17, 2014 Filing 337 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10/17/2014, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Rhonda Aquilina, Telephone number (415) 264-0580. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re (9267 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2015. (Aquilina, Rhonda) (Filed on 10/17/2014)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO FILE A MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF SEPTEMBER 4, 2014 ORDER 9214 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/29/2014)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON FLORIDA DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON #301 , 9053 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/18/2014) Modified on 9/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 10, 2014 Filing 334 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Non-Party Co-Conspirators (Master Docket No. 9214) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 9/10/2014)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO CERTAIN ALLEGED NON-PARTY CO-CONSPIRATORS #307 , 9061 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE TESTIMONY OF DAVID P. STOWELL PURSUANT TO FED. R. EVID. 702 #308 , 9070 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DIRECT PURCHASER CLAIMS FOR WHICH THE PANEL WAS FIRST SOLD TO A THIRD PARTY MANUFACTURER #305 , 9056 in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/4/2014) Modified on 9/5/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 Filing 330 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #329 Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9202] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3), #8 Exhibit 6 (Part 1), #9 Exhibit 6 (Part 2), #10 Exhibit 7)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 8/28/2014) Modified on 8/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2014 Filing 329 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc re #308 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of their Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702 [MDL Dkt. No. 9201] (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/28/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 328 Declaration of John H. Chung in Support of #327 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL No. 1827, Docket No. 9199] filed byToshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-23 to Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit 24-27 to Declaration of John H. Chung)(Related document(s) #327 ) (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 327 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #307 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, [MDL No. 1927, Docket No. 9198] (Chung, John) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 326 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #325 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [MDL Dkt. No. 9196] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #325 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 325 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #305 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9195] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014)
August 25, 2014 Filing 324 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Reply In Support of Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Florida Downsteam Pass-On [MDL. Doc. No. 9193] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/25/2014) Modified on 8/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 17, 2014 Filing 323 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. re #308 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell [Master Docket No. 9168] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Johnny W. Carter, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/17/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 322 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #321 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9164] filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) #321 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 321 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. re #301 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Joint Opposition to Defendants' Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Florida Downstream Pass-On [Master Docket No. 9163] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 320 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. re #305 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Third Party Manufacturers [Master Docket No. 9162] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 319 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #318 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, [Master Docket No. 9159] filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-20, #2 Exhibit 21-45, #3 Exhibit 46-65, #4 Exhibit 66-82, #5 Exhibit 83-95)(Related document(s) #318 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 14, 2014 Filing 318 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. re #307 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,,, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [Master Docket No. 9158] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/14/2014)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting in part and denying in part (9141) Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2014)
July 1, 2014 Filing 316 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. re #315 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation and Defendants' Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation [MDL Docket No. 9145] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John H. Chung, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 7/1/2014)
June 30, 2014 Filing 315 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Administrative Motion for Order to Exceed Page Limitation (MDL Dkt. No. 9141) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/30/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS 8915 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 313 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS 8916 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 26, 2014 Filing 312 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #311 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions,, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel Was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. #9135] by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/26/2014)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 311 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #304 , (9059 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Ex Parte Application Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., LG Display America, Inc... Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/24/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2014) Modified on 6/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 10, 2014 Filing 310 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd re #275 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporation's Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds, MDL No. 9089 (Schwing, Austin) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 10, 2014 Filing 309 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc re #277 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, (Defendants' Reply in Support of Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds, MDL Dkt. # 9088) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong, #2 Appendix 1, #3 Appendix 2, #4 Appendix 3)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/10/2014)
June 5, 2014 Filing 308 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc (Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of David P. Stowell Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 702, filed as MDL Dkt. No. 9070) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong with supporting Exs. A-I)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 307 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc, Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,, Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. of Defendants Motion for Partial Summary Judgment As To Certain Alleged Nonparty Co-Conspirators [MDL No. 1827, Docket Nos. 9061 and 9062] (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Declaration of John H. Chung, #3 Exhibit 1-5 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #4 Exhibit 6-10 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #5 Exhibit 11-15 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #6 Exhibit 16-20 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #7 Exhibit 21-25 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #8 Exhibit 26-32 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #9 Exhibit 33-39 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #10 Exhibit 40-44 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #11 Exhibit 45-48 to the Declaration of John H. Chung, #12 Proposed Order)(Chung, John) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 306 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 303*** Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. re #305 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Public Version of Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #303 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Filing 305 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. No. 9056, 9056-1] CORRECTION OF DOCKET #302 wrong e-filing event used (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 304 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. No. 9059, 9059-1, 9059-2] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014)
June 2, 2014 Filing 303 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #302 MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. 9056, 9056-1] [MDL Dkt. No. 9058] filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) #302 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Filing 302 ***ERRONEOUS EVENT WAS USED - PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT NO. 305***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. MOTION for Summary Judgment Redacted-Public Version of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on "Direct Purchaser" Claims for Which the Panel was First Sold to a Third Party Manufacturer [MDL Dkt. 9056, 9056-1] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 2, 2014 Filing 301 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Motion and Track Two Motion For Partial Summary Judgment On Florida Downstream Pass-On; And Supporting Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Lee F. Berger ISO Defendants' Track Two Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Downstream Pass-On, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment On Florida Downstream Pass-On)[MDL No. 9053](Berger, Lee) (Filed on 6/2/2014) Modified on 6/3/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2014 Filing 300 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Response re Motion for Summary Judgment UNREDACTED Response (MDL Dkt. No. 9048) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/29/2014)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #280 , (8920 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal filed by Nexgen Mediatech USA Inc, Chi Mei Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Nexgen Mediatech, Inc. ("Nexgen"), CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: #276 , (8917 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 filed by Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 5/22/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2014) Modified on 5/29/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 27, 2014 Filing 297 Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/23/14, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce, Telephone number 510-910-5888, email: joann_bryce@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction after 90 days. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 6/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/27/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/25/2014. (Bryce, Joann) (Filed on 5/27/2014)
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (9010) Stipulation re: use of expert compensation at trial in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (295) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (262) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (281) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2014)
May 9, 2014 Filing 295 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Use of Expert Compensatiom at Trial filed [MDL No. 9010] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/9/2014) Modified on 5/12/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2014 Filing 294 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Plaintiffs' Joint Opposition to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [Master Docket No. 8985] (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/29/2014)
April 29, 2014 Filing 293 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. to File Under Seal portions of their opposition to Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Opposition Brief, #4 Declaration Stuart H. Singer, #5 Exhibit Redacted Exh A, #6 Exhibit Redacted Exh B, #7 Exhibit Redacted Exh C)[MDL No. 8984](Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 4/29/2014) Modified on 4/30/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8976) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI as to various cases, see order for details. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 24, 2014 Filing 291 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal (MDL Dkt. No. 8976) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/24/2014)
April 23, 2014 Set/Reset Hearing MOTIONS SET PURSUANT TO ORDER 8872 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 8/8/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 9/5/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Motion Hearing set for 11/7/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Filing 290 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 4/23/2014 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 4/23/2014). The Court granted the Administrative Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel #8957. Carl Blumenstein will continue in his role as defense liaison. SB Liquidation Trust indicated that it is in the process of settling their case (10-5458). By May 7, 2014, counsel will submit a proposed pretrial and trial schedule for Acer America (13-3349), Home Depot (13-6001), and Proview (13-3802), and a trial schedule for the Circuit City Case (10-5625). Every other case not specifically scheduled for a trial date will eventually will be remanded back to the originating districts. (Court Reporter Jo Ann Bryce.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/23/2014)
April 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER RE: APRIL 23, 2014 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 8957 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 4/23/2014)
April 16, 2014 Filing 288 CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Joint) (Filed as Dkt. No. 8962 in MDL 1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/16/2014)
April 9, 2014 Filing 287 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc. Stipulation and Proposed Order Allowing Production of Sealed Pleadings in Related Case MDL Dkt 8950 (Attachments: #1 Supplement Illinois Stipulation)(Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 4/9/2014)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER: DAUBERT Motion Hearing set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 4/7/14. (8947 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2014)
April 7, 2014 Filing 285 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Track 2 Expert Depositions and Daubert Motions Schedule (MDL Dkt. No. 8947) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/7/2014)
April 2, 2014 Filing 284 CLERKS NOTICE FOR ALL REMAINING CASES: A further case management Conference has been set for 4/23/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston The Court has determined that the following cases are remain open: 3:09-cv-04997-SI, 3:10-cv-03205-SI, 3:10-cv-04346-SI, 3:10-cv-05458-SI, 3:10-cv-05625-SI, 3:11-cv-00829-SI, 3:11-cv-02225-SI, 3:11-cv-02495-SI, 3:11-cv-03763-SI, 3:11-cv-03856-SI, 3:11-cv-04119-SI, 3:11-cv-05765-SI, 3:11-cv-05781-SI, 3:11-cv-06241-SI, 3:12-cv-00335-SI, 3:12-cv-01426-SI, 3:12-cv-01596-SI, 3:12-cv-02214-SI, 3:12-cv-02495-SI, 3:12-cv-03802-SI, 3:12-cv-05371-SI, 3:12-cv-05460-SI, 3:13-cv-03349-SI, 3:13-cv-06001-SI. Counsel shall inform the clerk immediately if a case has been omitted for this notice. A joint case management conference statement shall be filed on or before April 17, 2014. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 283 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Defendants' Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Lack of Antitrust Injury and Lack of Antitrust Standing filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 282 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporations Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal re Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re Plaintiffs' State Law Claims on Due Process Grounds filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 24, 2014 Filing 281 Declaration of Philip J. Iovieno In Support of Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd. and HannStar Display Corporation's Motion to File Under Seal filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/24/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 280 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co. Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Joint Administrative Motion to File Documents Under Seal [MDL Dkt. 8920] (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 15, #4 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 16, #5 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 17, #6 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 18, #7 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 19, #8 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 20, #9 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 21, #10 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 22, #11 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 24, #12 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 26, #13 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 27, #14 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 28, #15 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 29, #16 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 30, #17 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 31, #18 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 32, #19 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 33, #20 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 34, #21 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 35, #22 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 36, #23 Unredacted Version of Exhibit 37, #24 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 279 Declaration of Weifan Wang in Support of #277 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Certification of Authenticity [MDL Dkt. 8919] filed byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Related document(s) #277 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 278 Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of #277 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Declaration of Emmet P. Ong in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds [MDL Dkt. 8918] filed byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51, #52 Exhibit 52, #53 Exhibit 53, #54 Exhibit 54, #55 Exhibit 55, #56 Exhibit 56, #57 Exhibit 57, #58 Exhibit 58, #59 Exhibit 59, #60 Exhibit 60, #61 Exhibit 61, #62 Exhibit 62, #63 Exhibit 63)(Related document(s) #277 ) (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 277 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc Defendants' Notice of Motion and Joint Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Due Process Grounds and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof [MDL Dkt. 8916] (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
March 18, 2014 Filing 276 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picture Tubes, Ltd., HannStar Display Corporation Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 3-6 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8917), #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3 (Request to Seal), #6 Exhibit 4 (Request to Seal), #7 Exhibit 5 (Request to Seal), #8 Exhibit 6 (Request to Seal), #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8)[MDL NO. 8917] (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014) Modified on 3/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 18, 2014 Filing 275 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd, HannStar Display Corporation DEFENDANTS CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. AND HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON PLAINTIFFS STATE LAW CLAIMS ON DUE PROCESS GROUNDS (MDL NO. 8915) (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JEN TE-HSIANG, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF PO CHIU)(Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 3/18/2014)
February 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #273 , (8879) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues filed by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2014) Modified on 2/26/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2014 Filing 273 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Certain Summary Judgment Motion Issues [MDL No.8879] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 2/18/2014) Modified on 2/19/2014 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 272 ORDER Motion Hearings set for TRACK 2 CASES. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/28/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2014)
January 28, 2014 Filing 271 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Summary Judgment Schedule [MDL Master Dkt. 8870] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 1/28/2014)
January 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 270 ORDER, (8849 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING TRACK 2 DEADLINES filed by Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Tech Data Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 8/1/14 is continued to 9/12/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 1/14/14. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/15/2014) Modified on 1/15/2014 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
January 13, 2014 Filing 269 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Track 2 Deadlines; MDL Dkt. No. 8849 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/13/2014)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8838) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Depositions In Track 2 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/26/2013)
December 19, 2013 Filing 267 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Certain Defendants' Expert Deposition In Track 2 [MDL No.8838] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/19/2013) Modified on 12/20/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8831) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the Parties, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that: 1. The deadline for the Parties to meet and confer regarding the Proposed List of Summary Judgment Motions and Schedule for same is extended from December 11, 2013 to January 9, 2014. 2. The deadline for the Parties to file with the Court a Joint List of Proposed Summary Judgment Motions and Proposed Schedule for Summary Judgment Filings is extendedfrom December 12, 2013 to January 13, 2014. 3. This stipulation does not affect any other Track 2 deadlines as set forth in the Courts September 6, 2013 Order re Track 2 Deadlines. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2013)
December 11, 2013 Filing 265 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc. 8831 Stipulation and Proposed Order Setting Revised Deadlines in Track 2 Re: Summary Judgment Motion Lists (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 12/11/2013)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 8804 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED by the undersigned counsel on behalf of the Stipulating Parties that all case schedules and deadlines in the above-captioned actions shall be held in abeyance as to the Stipulating Defendants only, and shall be revised as specified above in the event that the above-captioned cases are not dismissed as to the Stipulating Defendants. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 27, 2013 Filing 263 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 8804 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/27/2013)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8789) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI ; ORDER OF DISMISSAL of Hitachi defendants filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 261 NOTICE by Office Depot, Inc. Certain Direct Action Plaintiffs' Description of Issues/Subjects of Summary Judgment Motions (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 22, 2013 Filing 260 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation with Proposed Order of Dismissal; MDL Dkt. No. 8789 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/22/2013)
November 13, 2013 Filing 259 NOTICE by HannStar Display Corporation Notice of Withdrawal (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 11/13/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 258 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Derr Schmidt on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Schmidt, Melissa) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 256 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 255 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 28, 2013 Filing 254 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman on behalf of HannStar Display Corporation (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 10/28/2013)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8655) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. NOW THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED between counsel for Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants in the Track 2 cases, and subject to the concurrence of the Court, that Defendants opposition expert reports shall be served by October 31, 2013, and the underlying code and data for those reports shall be served by November 6, 2013. No other dates from the Courts Track 2 Scheduling Order shall be altered by this stipulation. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2013)
October 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 252 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (8646) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI 1. The actions filed by Plaintiffs Electrograph Systems, Inc. and Electrograph Technologies Corporation; MetroPCS Wireless, Inc.; Office Depot, Inc.; Interbond Corporation of America; Schultze Agency Services, LLC; P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation; MARTA Cooperative of America, Inc.; ABC Appliance, Inc.; Tech Data Corporation and Tech Data Product Management, Inc.; The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust; CompuCom Systems, Inc.; and NECO Alliance LLC are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) as against the following Defendants only: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation and Epson Electronics America, Inc.; Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.; NEC Corporation, NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC Corporation of America, and NEC Display Solutions of America, Inc.; and Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd. 2. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys fees. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/4/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 251 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation of Dismissal and [Proposed] Order of Dismissal [Master Docket No. 8646] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 250 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner in Support of #249 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case, Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #249 ) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
October 1, 2013 Filing 249 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Direct Action Plaintiffs' Reply in Further Support of Their Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply with Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); DKT No. 8636 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 10/1/2013)
September 20, 2013 Filing 248 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation re #245 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case,, Opposition to Motion to Compel Sharp 30(b)(6) Deposition (MDL Dkt. 8615) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay Lutz, #2 Exhibit A - F)(Lutz, Lindsay) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER re: Certain Expert Depositions in Track 2. re #243 , 8498 . Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
September 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS) re #242 , 8497 . Motion Hearing set for 8/1/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/30/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2013) Modified on 9/11/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 30, 2013 Filing 245 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Sharp Corporation to Comply With Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6); MDL Dkt. No. 8553 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Scott N. Wagner, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2013)
August 29, 2013 Filing 244 NOTICE by Office Depot, Inc. Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/29/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 243 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING CERTAIN EXPERT DEPOSITIONS IN TRACK 2 [MDL DKT NO. 8498] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 23, 2013 Filing 242 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES [MDL DKT NO. 8497] (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 8/23/2013)
August 13, 2013 Filing 241 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 8/13/2013)
July 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting #239 , (8350) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records" (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2013) Modified on 7/30/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
July 24, 2013 Filing 239 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Discovery as to the Authenticity of Documents and their Status as "Business Records"; MDL Dkt. No. 8350 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/24/2013)
June 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #234 , (8169) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel filed by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation. AS AMENDED (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2013) Modified on 6/27/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 237 ORDER RE DEADLINE TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL IN TRACK 2 CASES (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 6/25/2013)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 236 ORDER FURTHER EXTENDING TIME TO MEET AND CONFER AND/OR TO FILE MOTIONS TO COMPEL re #232 , 8159 in 7-1827 Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/25/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #232 , (8159) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2013) Modified on 6/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2013 Filing 234 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation [MDL Dkt. 8169] Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or to File Motions to Compel (Sorensen, Jacob) (Filed on 6/21/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 233 NOTICE of Appearance by Emmet P Ong (Ong, Emmet) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 20, 2013 Filing 232 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8159 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/20/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #227 . (8076) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER re #220 . 8060 Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/13/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #199 . (7973) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel filed by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013) Modified on 6/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER re #220 . (8060) Stipulation and proposed order re Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 6/10/13. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2013) Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/14/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 12, 2013 Filing 227 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES (FILED AS DKT #8076 IN MDL 1827) (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 6/12/2013) Modified on 6/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 11, 2013 Filing 226 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley R. Hansen (Hansen, Bradley) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 225 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 224 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra West Neukom (West Neukom, Sandra) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 11, 2013 Filing 223 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/11/2013)
June 7, 2013 Filing 222 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel [MDL No.8065] (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 6/7/2013) Modified on 6/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #211 . (8035) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2013 Filing 220 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8060 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2013)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #203 . (7987) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI: Stipulation with proposed order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel (AMENDED DOCUMENT of 7984 by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2013) Modified on 6/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #204 . (8001) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #209 . (7999) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #208 . (8000) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #207 . (7989) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #206 . (7988) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel filed by Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #202 . (7985) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Stipulation with Proposed Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2013) Modified on 6/5/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2013 Filing 212 NOTICE by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 31, 2013 Filing 211 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8035 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/31/2013)
May 30, 2013 Filing 210 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 209 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7999 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 208 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8000 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 207 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7989 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Filing 206 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motion to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7988 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #200 . (7983) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel Filed in MDL Master Case by Best Buy Co., Inc., Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, Jaco Electronics, Inc., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Rockwell Automation Inc., Schultze Agency Services, LLC, Sony Computer Entertainment America, LLC, Sony Electronics, Inc., Tech Data Corporation, Tech Data Product Management, Inc., The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust, Viewsonic Corporation (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2013) Modified on 5/29/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 28, 2013 Filing 204 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Deadline to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 8001 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/28/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 203 Notice of Motion/Stipulation - AMENDED DOCUMENT by Office Depot, Inc.. Amendment to #201 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7987. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 202 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7985 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 24, 2013 Filing 201 ***PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT #203***Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7984 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013) Modified on 5/28/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 24, 2013 Filing 200 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Discovery Cutoff; Time to Meet and Confer and/or File Motions to Compel; MDL Dkt. No. 7983 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/24/2013)
May 23, 2013 Filing 199 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time to Meet and Confer and/or To File Motions to Compel (Davis, Allison)[MDL No. 7973]. (Filed on 5/23/2013) Modified on 5/24/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #197 . (7919) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Interbond Corporation of America, ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., Neco Alliance LLC, Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2013) Modified on 5/17/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2013 Filing 197 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7919 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/16/2013)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #194 . (7880) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REGARDING FURTHER DEPOSITIONS filed by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chimei Innolux Corp (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #193 . (7866) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI RE: EXTENDING CLOSE OF FACT DISCOVERY WITH RESPECT TO MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC. AND MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. DEPOSITIONS (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2013) Modified on 5/16/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 9, 2013 Filing 194 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc RELATES TO MDL NO. 7880 (STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING FURTHER DEPOSITIONS) [MDL NO.7880]. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 5/9/2013) Modified on 5/10/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2013 Filing 193 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Extending Close of Fact Discovery with Respect to Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. and Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. Depositions [MDL No. 7866] (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/8/2013) Modified on 5/9/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7788) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI :ORDER REGARDING TECH DEPOT CLAIMS filed by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., Chimei Innolux Corp.. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2013)
April 26, 2013 Filing 191 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING TECH DEPOT CLAIMS (RELATES TO MDL DOCKET NO. 7788) (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 4/26/2013)
April 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting re #189 . (7770) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING DISCOVERY CUTOFF (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2013) Modified on 4/26/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
April 23, 2013 Filing 189 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Stipulation Extending Discovery Cutoff and [Proposed] Order; MDL Dkt. No. 7770 (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/23/2013)
March 27, 2013 Filing 188 AMENDED MINUTES FROM 3/15/13 HEARING: ADDING THE FOLLOWING LANGUAGE (NO OTHER CHANGES) T-Mobile and Defendants shall submit a stipulation to the 75 day extension, with revised dates. If T-Mobile seeks to reinstate certain indirect purchaser claims pursuant to the Ninth Circuit's AT&T Mobility LLC v. AU Optronics Corp. decision, it must submit a motion. The Court grants T-Mobile leave to submit such motion.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2013)
March 22, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7652) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI REVISED TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER re #185 . (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2013) Modified on 3/25/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 19, 2013 Filing 186 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2013 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 3/19/2013). Track I(b) trial has been continued to 7/22/13 and the pretrial is continued to 7/9/13 (7-1827, 10-4572, 10-4945, 10-5452, and 12-4114)By 3/29/13, counsel shall submit a proposed pretrial scheduling order with repect to the Track I(b) cases.As to Track I(b), there will be no ATM FEE evidentiary hearing. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/19/2013)
March 14, 2013 Filing 185 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER SETTING REVISED TRACK 2 DEADLINES. [MDL No.7652].(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/14/2013) Modified on 3/18/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2013 Filing 184 Joint Case Management Conference Statement by Office Depot, Inc. [MDL Dkt. No. 7640] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/12/2013) Modified on 3/13/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/13 is continued 3/15/2013 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 3/1/13., Motions terminated: (102 in 3:11-cv-06241-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/4/2013)
March 1, 2013 Filing 182 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PRESENTLY SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 7, 2013 (FILED AS DOCKET NO. 7626 IN MDL-1827) filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Blumenstein, Carl) (Filed on 3/1/2013) Modified on 3/4/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RE: DEFENDANTS' DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE re #172 .(Nos. 11-5765, 11-2225 and 11-3763) [MDL No.7593] (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 2/6/2013) Modified on 2/7/2013 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2013 Set/Reset Hearing (SEE TRACK II SCHEDULING ORDER 7139 ) Further Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2013)
January 14, 2013 Filing 180 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. JOINDER OF PLAINTIFFS OFFICE DEPOT, INC. AND INTERBOND CORPORATION OF AMERICA (BRANDSMART) IN TECH DATA'S REPLY IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(c) IN RESPECT OF DEFENDANTS DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (MDL Dkt. No. 7500) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 1/14/2013)
December 17, 2012 Filing 179 Notice of Opposition/Reply Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. re #172 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Defendants' Joint Opposition [MDL 7369] to Tech Data's 12(c) Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings in respect of Defendants' Downstream Pass-on Defenses [MDL 7086] and Joinder by Office Depot, Inc. and Interbond Corp of America [MDL 7108] (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 12/17/2012)
November 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER The August 20, 2013 and September 10, 2013 deadlines for the parties to provide additional and supplemental description[s] of each issue/subject of summary judgment motions are hereby vacated and replaced with the following: August 20, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to serve proposed list of summary judgment motions (copies to be provided to the court). August 21-September 9, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to meet and confer over proposed list of summary judgment motions and schedule for same. September 10, 2013: Plaintiffs and defendants to file with the Court joint list of proposed summary judgment motions and proposed schedule for summary judgment filings. October 30, 2013: Last day to file supplemental list of proposed summary judgment motions based upon new information or issues raised in the reply expert reports.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/20/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 21, 2012 Filing 177 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. Letter from Messrs. Murray and Foran Re Summary Judgment on Track 2 Cases and Proposed Order (MDL 7213) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/21/2012)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (7140) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI (MOTIONS CONTINUED FROM 12/14/12 TO 1/18/13) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 175 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd. re #172 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case, Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Tech Data's Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and Tech Data's Motion to Dismiss LG Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike LG Defendants' Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery (MDL Dkt. No. 7140) (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 174 TRACK 2 SCHEDULING ORDER, Motion Hearing set for 3/14/2014 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston.. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 11/8/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2012)
November 13, 2012 Filing 173 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 11/7/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 11/13/2012). The ATS Claims, Dell and Nokia cases ARE CONTINUED TO 11/30/12 AT 9:00 A.M. FOR FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. (9-1115, 10-1064, 09--5609)Counsel in the Track 2 cases shall select a mediator and inform the court of the name of the person selected. The Court will file an order approving the stipulated revised schedule for Track 2 cases.The Court will issue a separate order addressing Daubert motions in the cases set for trial in January 2013, streamlining summary judgment practice in the Track 2 cases, as well as the issue of consolidating the Best Buy cases. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/13/2012)
November 6, 2012 Filing 172 Notice of Motion/Stipulation Filed in MDL Master Case by Office Depot, Inc. JOINDER OF PLAINTIFFS OFFICE DEPOT, INC. AND INTERBOND CORPORATION OF AMERICA (BRANDSMART) IN TECH DATAS MOTION FOR PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER F.R.C.P. 12(c) IN RESPECT OF DEFENDANTS DOWNSTREAM PASS-ON AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (M. DKT. NO. 7108) (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 11/6/2012)
November 5, 2012 Filing 171 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Harrison J. Frahn, IV NOTICE OF CHANGE IN COUNSEL (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/5/2012)
October 26, 2012 Filing 170 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Ann Gillen NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF ELIZABETH A. GILLEN (Gillen, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 169 CLERKS NOTICE Further Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2012 02:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice.(tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 19, 2012 Filing 168 CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (7007 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION for Leave to File. Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. This is a docket text entry only, there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 167 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 Filing 166 ANSWER to Amended Complaint byMitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER by Judge 10/1/12 granting ( 6854 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (164) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI Re: Response to First Amended Complaint (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2012)
September 27, 2012 Filing 164 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #40 Amended Complaint,,,, Stipulation Regarding Defendants Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc.'s Response to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 9/27/2012)
September 25, 2012 Filing 163 NOTICE of Change of Address by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DISMISS LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC. AND LG DISPLAY CO., LTD'S COUNTERCLAIMS AND STRIKE THEIR DEFENSES RE DUPLICATIVE RECOVERY #149 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 9/22/2012)
September 5, 2012 Filing 161 CLERKS NOTICE : THE FOLLOWING MOTIONS ARE TAKEN OFF THE September 7, 2012 calendar. The motions are deemed submitted without argument. 7-1827, Dkt. No. 6227 , 11-2225, Dkt. No. 149, 11-2495, Dkt. No. 137, 11-2591, Dkt. No. 139, 11-3763, Dkt. No. 124, 11-4119, Dkt. No. 137, This is a docket text entry only and there is no document associated with this notice. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2012)
August 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (159 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (40) Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc., (6588 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (3619) Amended Complaint, Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint (Office Depot) filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited, Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on August 31, 2012. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #40 Amended Complaint,,,, Extension of Time to Answer the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 30, 2012 Filing 158 REPLY (re #149 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/30/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 157 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 156 Amended ANSWER to Complaint byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Filing 155 Amended ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston granting (6440) Stipulation Re: Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint (Office Depot) filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2012)
August 16, 2012 Filing 153 RESPONSE (re #149 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims ) LG Display America, Inc.'s and LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Direct Action Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaims and Strike Their Defenses Concerning Duplicative Recovery filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 8/16/2012)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 152 STIPULATION and ORDER by Judge Susan Illston extending time for defendants Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan) Ltd. and Mitsui & Co. (USA) Inc. to respond to the first amended complaint #151 . (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2012)
August 10, 2012 Filing 151 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 9, 2012 Filing 150 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Office Depot, Inc. PROOFS OF SERVICE ON FOREIGN DEFEDANTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 8/9/2012)
July 19, 2012 Filing 149 MOTION to Dismiss LG Counterclaims filed by Office Depot, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/7/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 8/2/2012. Replies due by 8/9/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Rubinstein, #2 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 11, 2012 Filing 148 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 6, 2012, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 8/1/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/9/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 7/11/2012)
July 9, 2012 Set/Reset Hearing Further Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 03:00 PM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motion Cutoff Hearing set for 11/1/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed on 7/6/12 by Judge Illston granting ( 5861 ) Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (89) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05458-SI; granting (109) Motion in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (112) Motion in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (135) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (127) Motion in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (71) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting (111) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (92) Motion in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting (27) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04116-SI; granting (122) Motion in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting (42) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting (56) Motion in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting (45) Motion in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting (15) Motion in case 3:12-cv-00335-SI; granting (14) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI; granting (13) Motion in case 3:12-cv-01599-SI; granting (11) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02214-SI; granting (8) Motion in case 3:12-cv-02495-SI (see order for details) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2012)
July 9, 2012 Filing 146 Minute Entry: Motion for Track Two Scheduling Order held on 7/6/2012 before Susan Illston (Date Filed: 7/9/2012). The Court will issue the scheduling order. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/9/2012)
July 5, 2012 Filing 145 CLERKS NOTICE: ALL PARTIES ARE ADVISED THAT THE MOTION RE: TWO TRACK SCHEDULING WILL BE HELD STARTING AT 9:30 A.M. INSTEAD OF 9:00 A.M. TOMORROW, FRIDAY, JULY 6, 2012. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2012)
June 28, 2012 Filing 144 Request for Judicial Notice re #143 Reply to Opposition/Response NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice re Track Two Plaintiffs' Scheduling Motion filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit B Part 1 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit B Part 2 to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit C-D to NEC Defendants' Request for Judicial Notice)(Related document(s) #143 ) (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/28/2012)
June 27, 2012 Filing 143 REPLY (re #135 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Richard Mooney)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/27/2012)
June 26, 2012 Filing 142 NOTICE by Hannstar Display Corporation of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Bangasser, Hugh) (Filed on 6/26/2012)
June 25, 2012 Filing 141 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Freitas , Jason S. Angell, and Jerry Chen on behalf of HannStar Display Corp. (Freitas, Robert) (Filed on 6/25/2012)
June 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER DISMISSING TATUNG CO. OF AMERICA signed on 6/21/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting ( 5962 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #113 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00829-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #126 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05765-SI; granting ( #58 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( #47 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI; granting ( #18 ) Stipulation in case 3:12-cv-01426-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2012: #1 Order with Judicial Signature) (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/26/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
June 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER signed on 6/19/12 by Judge Illstongranting #137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 5253 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, 5252 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by T-Mobile USA Inc. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/21/2012)
June 19, 2012 Filing 138 RESPONSE (re #135 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting ) Defendants' Joint Opposition Re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases filed byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Defendants' Joint Opposition re: Motion for Pretrial and Trial Schedules in Direct Action Cases with Exhibits A-D, #2 Proposed Order Re: Pretrial and Trial Schedule)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 19, 2012 Filing 137 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/19/2012)
June 18, 2012 Filing 136 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon Cody Martin (Martin, Brandon) (Filed on 6/18/2012)
June 6, 2012 Filing 135 MOTION Entry of a Track Two Scheduling Order and Trial Setting filed by Office Depot, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 6/19/2012. Replies due by 6/26/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER signed on 5/19/12 by Judge Susan Illston ( 5709 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI. GRANTING Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint (Office Depot) filed by Mitsui & Co. ( (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012)
May 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 133 DISREGARD ENTRY, FILED IN ERROR, NO NEW ORDER. (ORDER signed on 5/19/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting (5677) Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (132) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI Answer due 8/10/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2012) Modified on 5/22/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
May 16, 2012 Filing 132 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,. (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 5/16/2012)
May 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER signed on 5/14/12 by Judge Susan Illston STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS filed by Compucom Systems Inc, Electrograph Systems, Inc., Electrograph Technologies, Corp., ABC Appliance, Inc., Marta Cooperative of America, Inc., MetroPCS Wireless Inc., Office Depot, Inc., P.C. Richard & Son Long Island Corporation, Schultze Agency Services, LLC, The AASI Creditor Liquidating Trust. granting ( 5578 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( 67 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03342-SI; granting ( 106 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( 83 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03856-SI; granting ( 117 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI; granting ( 28 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-05781-SI; granting ( 35 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-06241-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 11, 2012 Filing 130 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Opposition to Plaintiffs' Objection to Special Master Quinn's Order Regarding Subpoenas to John Metzler and applEcon LLC by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 5/11/2012) Modified on 5/14/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2012 Filing 129 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION STRIKING CERTAIN ALLEGATIONS FROM COMPLAINTS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS 5548 (see order for details). re #126 . Signed by Judge Illston on 4/30/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 5/2/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
May 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed on 4/30/12 by Judge Susan Illston granting Stipulation re Schedule to Answer or Respond to LG Display's Counterclaims filed by T-Mobile USA Inc(5542) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (242) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-04997-SI; granting (321) Stipulation in case 3:09-cv-05840-SI; granting (166) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-00117-SI; granting (117) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-03517-SI; granting (79) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-04346-SI; granting (102) Stipulation in case 3:10-cv-05625-SI; granting (138) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00058-SI; granting (165) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-00711-SI; granting (126) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (115) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02495-SI; granting (124) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02591-SI; granting (103) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (114) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI. See order for specific details (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2012) Modified on 5/1/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 27, 2012 Filing 126 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SCHEDULE TO ANSWER OR RESPOND TO DEFENDANT LG DISPLAYS COUNTERCLAIMS filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 Filing 125 Special Masters Order RE LG Display's Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoenas to Applecon LLC and John Metzler (Hrg. 4-6-12). (Quinn, Martin) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Susan Illston signed on 4/11/12 granting Stipulation to extend deadline to answer counterclaims ( 5434 ) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #123 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting ( #100 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting ( #111 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
April 10, 2012 Filing 123 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Extending Time for Plaintiffs to Answer or Respond to Defendants LG Display Co. LTD and LG Display America, Inc.s Counterclaims for Declarative Relief filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/10/2012)
April 5, 2012 Filing 122 RESPONSE to re #108 Notice (Other), Direct Action Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Motion Regarding Trial Structure and Duplicative Recovery by Office Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/5/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 121 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #114 MOTION to Compel Supplemental Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Further Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) #114 ) (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Filing 120 REPLY (re #114 MOTION to Compel ) Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Reply Memorandum in Support of the Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler filed byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 4/3/2012)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 4/2/12 granting ( 5346 ) Stipulation to dismiss Samsung in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting ( #117 ) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2012) Modified on 4/3/2012 (tfS, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2012 Filing 118 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J Iovieno NOTICE OF APPEARANCE BY MELISSA FELDER (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 4/2/2012)
March 30, 2012 Filing 117 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL AND [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Iovieno, Philip) (Filed on 3/30/2012)
March 28, 2012 Filing 116 REDACTION to #115 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #114 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - D, #2 Exhibit E - F, #3 Exhibit G - H, #4 Exhibit I, #5 Exhibit J - K, #6 Exhibit L, #7 Exhibit M, #8 Exhibit N - Q)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 115 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #112 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Exhibit A to Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of #113 Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 114 REDACTION to #113 Document E-Filed Under Seal, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Filing 113 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re #112 Order Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Terminate Motions - Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Compel Compliance With Document and Deposition Subpoenas to applEcon LLC and John Metzler by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/28/2012) Modified on 3/29/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal, Motions terminated: ( #99 in 3:11-cv-04119-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #146 in 3:10-cv-00117-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #90 in 3:10-cv-05625-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co. Ltd., ( #111 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( 5304 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #68 in 3:11-cv-03856-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #124 in 3:11-cv-00058-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd., ( #88 in 3:11-cv-03763-SI) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd... Signed by Judge Illston on 3/27/12. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 23, 2012 Filing 111 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application for an Order Directing Whether to File Documents Under Seal or in the Public Record filed by LG Display Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lee F. Berger in Support of Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Ex Parte Application, #2 Proposed Order)(Berger, Lee) (Filed on 3/23/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 110 Answer to Amended Complaint #40 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Amended Answer to Office Depot's First Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declarative Relief against Office Depot, Inc. byLG Display America, Inc.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 21, 2012 Filing 109 Answer to Amended Complaint #40 Amended Complaint,,,, Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Amended Answer to Office Depot's First Amended Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM for Declarative Relief against Office Depot, Inc. byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 3/21/2012)
March 13, 2012 Filing 108 NOTICE by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd. Defendants' Notice of Pending Motion and Of Issue and Claim Preclusion (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/13/2012)
March 5, 2012 Filing 107 ASSOCIATION of Counsel by AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 106 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint of Office Depot, Inc. byHitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd.. (Roger, Kent) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 105 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint (FIRST) byAU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.. (Nedeau, Christopher) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 104 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display America, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint byLG Display America, Inc.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 103 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint Defendant LG Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint byLG Display Co., Ltd.. (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 102 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint of Office Depot, Inc. - CORRECTION OF DOCKET #92 byNEC Corporation. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 101 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #40 byHannstar Display Corporation. (Emerson, Ramona) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 100 Answer to Amended Complaint #40 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Electronic Components, Inc.'s Answer to Office Depot, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Electronics Components, Inc.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 99 Answer to Amended Complaint #40 Amended Complaint,,,, of Office Depot, Inc. bySanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 98 Answer to Amended Complaint #40 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.'s Answer to Office Depot, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba America Information Systems, Inc.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 97 Answer to Amended Complaint #40 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.'s Answer to Office Depot, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 96 Answer to Amended Complaint #40 Amended Complaint,,,, / Toshiba Corporation's Answer to Office Depot, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint byToshiba Corporation. (McAhren, Kristen) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 95 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint ANSWER AND ADDITIONAL DEFENSES OF CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION (N/K/A CHIMEI INNOLUX CORPORATION), CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC., AND CMO JAPAN CO., LTD. TO OFFICE DEPOT, INC.'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT byCMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 94 NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.'s ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Office Depot, Inc. byNEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 93 NEC Electronics America, Inc.'s ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint of Office Depot, Inc. byNEC Electronics America, Inc.. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 92 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT #102 . *** NEC Corporation's ANSWER to #40 Complaint of Office Depot byNEC Corporation. (Niespolo, George) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/1/2012 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 91 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #40 of Office Depot bySharp Electronics Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 90 ANSWER to Amended Complaint #40 of Office Depot bySharp Corporation. (Grenfell, John) (Filed on 2/29/2012)
February 29, 2012 Filing 89 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint byTatung Company of America, Inc.. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 88 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint byChunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 29, 2012 Filing 87 ANSWER to #40 Amended Complaint byEpson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation. (Freccero, Stephen) (Filed on 2/29/2012) Modified on 3/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Judge Illston signed on 2/22/12granting (4845) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (85) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2012)
February 21, 2012 Filing 85 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to the First Amended Complaint filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
February 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER by Judge Illston granting (4722) Stipulation in case 3:07-md-01827-SI; granting (83) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-02225-SI; granting (59) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-03763-SI; granting (65) Stipulation in case 3:11-cv-04119-SI (ORDER SIGNED ON 2/1/12 BY JUDGE ILLSTON, THIS IS A TEXT DOCKET ENTRY ONLY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ORDER.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2012)
January 31, 2012 Filing 83 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINTS filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Isaacson, William) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' REQUEST FOR CLARIFICATION re #80 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/31/2012) Modified on 2/1/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 24, 2012 Filing 81 RESPONSE (re #80 MOTION re #79 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7-11 ) filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 20, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION re #79 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7-11 filed by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc. Responses due by 1/24/2012. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF JASON M. BUSSEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7-11, #2 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION FOR CLARIFICATION PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 7-11)(Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 1/20/2012)
January 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING IN PART MOTIONS TO DISMISS COMPLAINT re #46 , #50 (Illston, Susan) (Filed on 1/18/2012) Modified on 1/19/2012 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
January 17, 2012 Filing 78 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing HELD 1/13/12 (Date Filed: 1/17/2012) re (3954 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., (50 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., (46 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Hannstar Display Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc., LG Display America, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., AU Optronics Corporation, Hitachi, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, LG Display Co., Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Toshiba Corporation, Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd., AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., (3949 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Hannstar Display Corporation, Chunghwa Picture Tubes Ltd., Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Hitachi Ltd., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Hitachi Displays, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd., Tatung Company of America, Inc. ("Tatung America"), Sharp Electronics Corporation, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., AU Optronics Corporation, Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Sharp Corporation, LG Display Co., Ltd., Epson Electronics America, Inc., Mitsui & Co. (U.S.A.), Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Chimei Innolux Corp., AU Optronics Corporation America. (Court Reporter K. Sullivan.) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/17/2012)
January 17, 2012 Filing 77 Request for Judicial Notice re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart H. Singer, #2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #46 ) (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 1/17/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 76 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Margaret Derr (Derr, Melissa) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance by Arka Dev Chatterjee (Chatterjee, Arka) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Matthew Bussey (Bussey, Jason) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 12, 2012 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by James Glenn Kreissman (Kreissman, James) (Filed on 1/12/2012)
January 11, 2012 Filing 72 Request for Judicial Notice re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stuart Singer, #2 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) #46 ) (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 1/11/2012)
December 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 70 REPLY (re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) Reply in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s First Amended Complaint filed byLG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 69 REPLY (re #50 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment ) Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 21, 2011 Filing 68 Ex Parte Application NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order Granting NEC Defendants' Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 12/21/2011)
December 16, 2011 Filing 67 Transcript of Proceedings held on 12/9/11, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, RPR, CRR, CSR, Telephone number 415-794-6659/Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 1/6/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/15/2012. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 12/16/2011)
December 13, 2011 Pursuant to previous stipulation and order filed Set/Reset Deadlines as to (3954 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, (3949 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, (50 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, (46 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/13/2012 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/13/2011)
December 7, 2011 Filing 66 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 28, 2011, before Judge Susan Illston. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842, Joan_Columbini@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 12/28/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/6/2012. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting extension of time to respond to amended complaint re #64 . (#4205) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011) Modified on 12/2/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2011 Filing 64 STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD. TO RESPOND TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
November 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #62 . (#4177) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2011) Modified on 11/29/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2011 Filing 62 Ex Parte Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Meredith Schultz in Support of Ex-Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order)(Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 61 RESPONSE (re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) (Redacted) filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Drake Paul)(Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 23, 2011 Filing 60 RESPONSE (re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint ) filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 11/23/2011)
November 4, 2011 Filing 59 NOTICE by CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc (Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel) (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 11/4/2011)
November 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #47 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2011) Modified on 11/4/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 2, 2011 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Harrison J. Frahn, IV (Frahn, Harrison) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting extension to respond re #55 Stipulation. (11-2225) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/3/2011 (ys, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2011 Filing 55 STIPULATION re #50 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Office Depot, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 11/1/2011)
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal re #49 . (3952) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011) Modified on 10/25/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2011 Filing 53 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss without prejudice (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/21/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 52 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion NEC Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion Without Prejudice (Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 20, 2011 Filing 51 NOTICE by LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd. / Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel (Lazerwitz, Michael) (Filed on 10/20/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/2/2011. Replies due by 11/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dylan Dunavan, #2 Proposed Order)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 49 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Stephen H. Sutro, #2 Proposed Order)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 48 Request for Judicial Notice re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s) #46 ) (Arens, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 19, 2011 Filing 47 Ex Parte Application to FILE UNDER SEAL re #46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Arens, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/19/2011) Modified on 10/25/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2011 Filing 46 Joint MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 11/2/2011. Replies due by 11/9/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Arens, Elizabeth) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
October 5, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER (11-2225) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2011)
October 4, 2011 Filing 44 STIPULATION of Extension of Time for Defendant Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Ltd. to Respond to the First Amended Complaint and [Proposed] Order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 10/4/2011)
September 30, 2011 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. McCann (McCann, Kevin) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 23, 2011 Filing 42 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion (Arens, Elizabeth) (Filed on 9/23/2011)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (#3618) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT - REDACTED against AU Optronics Corporation, AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CMO Japan Co., Ltd., Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, Hannstar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, Ltd., Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc., Hitachi, Ltd., LG Display America, Inc., LG Display Co., Ltd., Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD., Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,, NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd., Sharp Corporation, Sharp Electronics Corporation, Tatung Company of America, Inc., Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation, Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.. Filed byOffice Depot, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 19, 2011 Filing 39 Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Philip J. Iovieno, #2 Proposed Order)(Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
September 15, 2011 Filing 38 CLERKS NOTICE: YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED THAT the Court is no longer accepting new motions to be noticed for Friday, November 4, 2011. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2011)
September 8, 2011 Filing 37 November 11, 2011 is a Federal Holiday:CLERKS NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing, Set/Reset Deadlines as to (3334 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (3336 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint, (3343 in 3:07-md-01827-SI) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Office Depot's Complaint, (31 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Office Depot's Complaint, (25 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (26 in 3:11-cv-02225-SI) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/18/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Office Depot's Complaint, #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 11/11/2011 09:00 AM before Hon. Susan Illston. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION TO MOTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2011)
September 7, 2011 Filing 35 STIPULATION re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Office Depot's Complaint, #29 Joinder, #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint, #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Stipulation for Extension of Time by Office Depot, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 9/7/2011)
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal ( filed by SAMSUNG) re #28 Ex parte application. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) Modified on 8/26/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting Motion to File Under Seal (filed by NEC) re #30 Ex parte application. (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2011) Modified on 8/26/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re: extension to time to respond to complaint in 11-3856 (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011)
August 22, 2011 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Office Depot's Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses Due by 9/6/11, Replies due by 9/13/11. (ysS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment; Joinder in Defendants' Joint Motion to Dismiss Office Depot's Complaint filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/6/2011. Replies due by 9/13/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dylan Dunavan in Support of the NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Or, in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting the NEC Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 30 Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal filed by NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Stephen H. Sutro in Support of Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Ex Parte Application to File Documents Under Seal)(Sutro, Stephen) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 29 Joinder re #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint by Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.. (Davis, Allison) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 28 Ex Parte Application to file under seal re #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Proposed Order)(Arens, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/22/2011) Modified on 8/23/2011 (ysS, COURT STAFF).
August 22, 2011 Filing 27 Request for Judicial Notice re #26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Arens, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Office Depot, Inc.'s Complaint filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/6/2011. Replies due by 9/13/2011. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Arens, Elizabeth) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Susan Illston. Responses due by 9/6/2011. Replies due by 9/13/2011. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DECLARATION OF MAKOTO ICHIKAWA, #2 Proposed Order GRANTING DEFENDANT MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.'S MOTION TO DISMISS OFFICE DEPOT'S COMPLAINT)(Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
August 22, 2011 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Murdock-Park , Paul P. Eyre, Ernest E. Vargo, Tracy L. Cole, and Michael E. Mumford (Murdock-Park, Erin) (Filed on 8/22/2011)
July 25, 2011 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha Harper Knox (Knox, Samantha) (Filed on 7/25/2011)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING EXTENSTION TO RESPOND (CHUNGHWA) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2011)
July 11, 2011 Filing 21 STIPULATION STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND [PROPOSED] ORDER by Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd. (Brass, Rachel) (Filed on 7/11/2011)
June 30, 2011 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Micah Galvin Block (Block, Micah) (Filed on 6/30/2011)
June 17, 2011 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D West (West, Sandra) (Filed on 6/17/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal Alan Potischman (Potischman, Neal) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
June 14, 2011 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher B. Hockett (Hockett, Christopher) (Filed on 6/14/2011)
May 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF OFFICE DEPOTS MOTION FOR ORDER TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)
May 26, 2011 Filing 15 Statement of RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE by Office Depot, Inc.. (Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STIPULATION for extension of time to respond to complaint and [proposed] order by Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), Limited. (Mumford, Michael) (Filed on 5/25/2011) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
May 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Pretrial ORDER No.1. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 7/3/7. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re: STIPULATION OF EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT, WAIVER OF SERVICE, AND PROPOSED ORDER by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.. (Metzler, Theodore) (Filed on 5/23/2011) (counsel is reminded to e.file documents in all cases that it applies to) (tf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2011) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
May 24, 2011 Filing 11 MOTION AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD. THROUGH ITS U.S. COUNSEL PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(F)(3) filed by Office Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Stuart Singer, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Singer, Stuart) (Filed on 5/24/2011)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Hon. Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/10/11. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2011)
May 6, 2011 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 8/11/2011. Case Management Conference set for 8/18/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 5/6/11. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2011)
May 6, 2011 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 9:11-cv-80349. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2011: #2 Transmittal Notice) (ga, COURT STAFF).
May 2, 2011 Filing 7 Transmittal Letter with attached Certified CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL # 1827 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Susan Yvonne Illston. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel) (gp)
April 29, 2011 Filing 6 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) transferring case to the Northern District of California re: MDL # 1827 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Susan Yvonne Illston. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the ** awaiting certified copy from the transferee court ** (gp)
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER of Pretrial Procedures. Signed by Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp on 4/18/2011. (lbc)
April 4, 2011 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (jc)
March 31, 2011 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, Au Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, CMO JAPAN CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., HITACHI, LTD., HannStar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD., LG DISPLAY CO., LTD., LG Display America, Inc., MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.;, MITSUI & CO. (USA),, NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, LTD., SHARP CORPORATION;, SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION;, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.;, TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.,, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. (jc)
March 31, 2011 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Kenneth L. Ryskamp (jc)
March 31, 2011 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, Au Optronics Corporation America, Inc., CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD.;, CMO JAPAN CO., LTD, Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation, Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc, Epson Electronics America, Inc., Epson Imaging Devices Corporation, HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., HITACHI, LTD., HannStar Display Corporation, Hitachi Displays, LTD., LG DISPLAY CO., LTD., LG Display America, Inc., MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD.;, MITSUI & CO. (USA),, NEC Corporation, NEC Electronics America, Inc., NEC LCD TECHNOLOGIES, LTD., SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, LTD., SHARP CORPORATION;, SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION;, Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Semiconductor, Inc., TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC.;, TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.,, Toshiba America Electronics Components, Inc., Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc., Toshiba Corporation. Filing fee $ 350.00 receipt number 113C-3639498, filed by OFFICE DEPOT, INC.,. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION, #3 Summon(s) AU OPTRONICS CORPORATION AMERICA, #4 Summon(s) CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS CORPORATION, #5 Summon(s) CHI MEI OPTOELECTRONICS USA, INC, #6 Summon(s) CMO JAPAN CO., LTD, #7 Summon(s) CHUNGHWA PICTURE TUBES, LTD, #8 Summon(s) EPSON ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC, #9 Summon(s) EPSON IMAGING DEVICES CORPORATION, #10 Summon(s) HANNSTAR DISPLAY CORPORATION, #11 Summon(s) HITACHI ELECTRONIC DEVICES (USA), INC., #12 Summon(s) HITACHI, LTD., #13 Summon(s) HITACHI DISPLAYS, LTD, #14 Summon(s) LG DISPLAY CO., LTD., #15 Summon(s) LG DISPLAY AMERICA, INC, #16 Summon(s) MITSUI & CO. (TAIWAN), LTD., #17 Summon(s) MITSUI & CO. (USA), INC, #18 Summon(s) NEC CORPORATION, #19 Summon(s) NEC ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC, #20 Summon(s) NEC LCD TECHNOLOGIES, LTD, #21 Summon(s) SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS AMERICA, INC, #22 Summon(s) SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD, #23 Summon(s) SAMSUNG SEMICONDUCTOR, INC, #24 Summon(s) SANYO CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, LTD, #25 Summon(s) SHARP CORPORATION, #26 Summon(s) SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION, #27 Summon(s) TATUNG COMPANY OF AMERICA, INC, #28 Summon(s) TOSHIBA AMERICA ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS, INC, #29 Summon(s) TOSHIBA AMERICA INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC., #30 Summon(s) TOSHIBA CORPORATION, #31 Summon(s) TOSHIBA MATSUSHITA DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY CO., LTD.)(Singer, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Office Depot, Inc. v. AU Optronics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Special master: Martin Quinn
Represented By: Martin Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Office Depot, Inc.
Represented By: William A. Isaacson
Represented By: Stuart H. Singer
Represented By: Stuart Harold Singer
Represented By: Philip J Iovieno
Represented By: Melissa B Felder,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMO Japan Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Micah Galvin Block
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Brandon Cody Martin
Represented By: Arka Dev Chatterjee
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Micah Galvin Block
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Brandon Cody Martin
Represented By: Arka Dev Chatterjee
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Usa) Inc.,
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Mobile Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chunghwa Picuture Tubes, Ltd
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Represented By: Austin Van Schwing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Electronic Devices (USA), Inc.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Matsushita Display Technology Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi, Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display America, Inc.
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Corporation
Represented By: Lindsay A. Lutz
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba Corporation
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC Corporation
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Arens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Arens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics, Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Electronics Components Inc
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth Catherine Arens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharp Electronics Corporation
Represented By: Jacob R. Sorensen
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HannStar Display Corporation
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Jason Sheffield Angell
Represented By: Robert E. Freitas
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Ramona M. Emerson
Represented By: Jerry Chen
Represented By: Hugh Frederick Bangasser
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Imaging Devices Corporation
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epson Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen P. Freccero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanyo Consumer Electronics Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Allison Ann Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AU Optronics Corporation America, Inc.
Represented By: K.C. Maxwell
Represented By: John D. Cline
Represented By: Carl Lawrence Blumenstein
Represented By: Christopher A. Nedeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitsui & Co. (Taiwan), LTD.
Represented By: Erin Murdock-Park
Represented By: Tracy Lynn Cole
Represented By: Paul P Eyre
Represented By: Ernest E. Vargo, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Edward Mumford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Display Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Holly A. House
Represented By: Kevin C. McCann
Represented By: Sean David Unger
Represented By: Lee F Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEC LCD Technologies, Ltd.
Represented By: George Dominic Niespolo
Represented By: Stephen Holbrook Sutro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toshiba America Information Systems, Inc.,
Represented By: Kristen Jentsch McAhren
Represented By: John H. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Displays, Ltd.
Represented By: Kent Michael Roger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatung Company of America, Inc.
Represented By: Rachel S. Brass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chi Mei Optoelectronics USA, Inc
Represented By: Melissa Derr Schmidt
Represented By: Jason Matthew Bussey
Represented By: Emmet P. Ong
Represented By: Bradley R. Hansen
Represented By: Samantha Harper Knox
Represented By: Elizabeth Ann Gillen
Represented By: Christopher B. Hockett
Represented By: Micah Galvin Block
Represented By: Neal Alan Potischman
Represented By: Sandra West Neukom
Represented By: Brandon Cody Martin
Represented By: Arka Dev Chatterjee
Represented By: James Glenn Kreissman
Represented By: Harrison J. Frahn, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?