Blount et al v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jesse Blount, III, Steve Parker and Tiffany Perez
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC and Jim Nielsen
Case Number: 3:2011cv02227
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 10/17/2013. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2013)
September 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER granting 142 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CHANGE DISPOSITIVE MOTION HEARING DATE filed by Jim Nielsen, et al. Reset Hearing as to 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment </i SJ Motion Hearing reset for 10/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/16/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2013)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting 140 Notice withdrawalof counsel filed by Jim Nielsen, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Attorney Jennifer Ann Lockhart and L. Julius M. Turman terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/9/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2013)
July 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 135 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Order to Change Dispositive Motion Hearing Date, Decl of Pl's Counsel filed by Jesse Blount, III. Reset Deadlines as to 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing reset for 8/16/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2013)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 92 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Requesting Order to Change Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Jesse Blount, III., Reset Deadlines as to 82 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., Motions terminated: Responses due by 4/19/2013. Replies due by 5/10/2013. Motion Hearing reset for 6/21/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Charles R. Breyer. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/4/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2013)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 80 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Order re Dispositive Motion Deadline filed by Jim Nielsen, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Dispositive motions due by 3/22/2013. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/3/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2013)
November 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu re 68 , 70 Discovery Letter Briefs.(dmrlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2012)
October 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER re 70 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Jim Nielsen, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, 68 Ex Parte Discovery Letter Briefand Explanation Why No Joint Letter Filed filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Perez Discovery Hearing set for 11/8/2012 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 10/26/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2012)
September 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re 46 Brief filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Perez, 49 Proposed Order filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Perez, 47 Declaration in Support, filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Per ez, 48 Declaration in Support filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Perez, 45 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Perez, Motions terminated: 45 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Perez.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/10/2012. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2012)
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 26 Stipulation filed by Jim Nielsen, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC. Signed by Judge James Ware on 12/15/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2011)
October 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SCHEDULING ORDER - VACATING CMC Preliminary Pretrial Conference Statement due by 9/7/2012. Discovery due by 10/19/2012. Last date for Motion hearings by 10/10/2012. Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2012 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. James Ware. Signed by Judge James Ware on 10/18/11. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2011)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/29/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2011)
August 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING CMC, Motions terminated: 8 MOTION to Continue deadline to file Joint Case Management Statement and Rule 26(f) Report filed by Steve Parker, Jesse Blount, III, Tiffany Perez. Case Management Statement due by 9/29/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/6/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/12/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blount et al v. Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Blount, III
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Represented By: Vylma Lourdes Ortiz
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Parker
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Represented By: Vylma Lourdes Ortiz
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Perez
Represented By: Peter Alex Haberfeld
Represented By: Vylma Lourdes Ortiz
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?