Bywater v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Sheri L. Bywater
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Chase Bank USA N.A.
Case Number: 3:2011cv02257
Filed: May 6, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING RESPONSE DEADLINE AND RESETTING CMC re 25 Proposed Order, filed by Chase Bank USA N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 3/1/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/8/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
April 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE PRELIMINARY APPROVAL AND RESETTING CMC re 22 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/23/12. (bpfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2012)
February 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 20 Proposed Order, filed by Chase Bank USA N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Case Management Statement due by 6/15/2012. Case Management Conference set for 6/22/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 17 Proposed Order, filed by Chase Bank USA N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., 16 Stipulation, filed by Chase Bank USA N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Case Management Conference set for 2/24/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/27/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
July 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER AND RESETTING CMC re 12 Stipulation, filed by Chase Bank USA N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/22/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/22/2011)
June 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 9 Stipulation filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/24/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2011)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDERS (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 5 Stipulation filed by Chase Bank USA N.A., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bywater v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheri L. Bywater
Represented By: Jonathan David Selbin
Represented By: David P. Meyer
Represented By: Daniel Hutchinson
Represented By: Matthew Ryan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Molly Rachel Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA N.A.
Represented By: Molly Rachel Newland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?