Morales et al v. Laborers' Union Local 304
Plaintiff: Tara Lee Ruyle, Gloria A. Morales, Elsa Gonzalez, Sandra Carranza and Laura Guzman
Defendant: Laborers' Union Local 304
Movant: D. Austin Hare and Kassra P. Nassiri
Case Number: 3:2011cv02278
Filed: May 9, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: William Alsup
Nature of Suit: Labor/Management Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER RE MOTION TO MODIFY SCHEDULING ORDER by Hon. William Alsup vacating hearing 56 Motion.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER RE SETTLEMENT [re 60 Letter, filed by Elsa Gonzalez, Gloria A. Morales, Tara Lee Ruyle, Laura Guzman, Sandra Carranza]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/2/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2012)
March 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 REMINDER NOTICE OF UPCOMING TRIAL (7/30/2012) AND FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (7/23/2012). Signed by Judge William Alsup on 3/14/2012. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2012)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISREGARD REPLY BRIEF AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 44 Motion for Leave to File; denying 48 Motion disregard plaintiffs' reply brief (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2012)
November 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE MOTION TO AMEND AND PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT re 42 Stipulation, filed by Elsa Gonzalez, Gloria A. Morales, Tara Lee Ruyle, Laura Guzman, Sandra Carranza, Laborers' Union Local 304. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 22, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2011)
November 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND VACATING HEARING by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part (31) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:11-cv-02278-WHA]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2011) Modified on 11/15/2011 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
October 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION AND ORDER RE MEDIATION DEADLINE re 34 Stipulation filed by Elsa Gonzalez, Gloria A. Morales, Tara Lee Ruyle, Laura Guzman, Sandra Carranza, Laborers' Union Local 304 (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2011)
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 21, 2011. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2011)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS by Hon. William Alsup granting 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Demian Austin Hare and Kassra Powell Nassiri terminated.(whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2011)
June 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 14 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 11/20/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2011)
June 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO FILE CONSENT/DECLINATION. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 6/3/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/3/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales et al v. Laborers' Union Local 304
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Lee Ruyle
Represented By: Jarrett Ashley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria A. Morales
Represented By: Jarrett Ashley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elsa Gonzalez
Represented By: Jarrett Ashley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Carranza
Represented By: Jarrett Ashley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Guzman
Represented By: Jarrett Ashley Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laborers' Union Local 304
Represented By: Caren P. Sencer
Represented By: Concepcion E. Lozano-Batista
Represented By: Barry E. Hinkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: D. Austin Hare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Kassra P. Nassiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?