Ravan et al v. American Mortgage Express Corp et al

Plaintiff: Mehdi Ravan and Ali Ravan
Defendant: American Mortgage Express Corp, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, L.P. and Bank of America Corporation
Case Number: 3:2011cv02371
Filed: May 13, 2011
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 50 Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on March 16, 2013. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2013)
December 21, 2012 46 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 45 TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE DEADLINE TO DISMISS CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Mehdi Ravan, Ali Ravan Case Management Statement due by 2/28/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/7/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2012)
October 19, 2012 43 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 42 TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE DEADLINE TO DISMISS CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Mehdi Ravan, Ali Ravan Case Management Statement due by 12/27/2012. Case Management Conference set for 1/3/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/19/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2012)
August 31, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 39 TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE DEADLINE TO DISMISS CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Mehdi Ravan, Ali Ravan Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2012. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/31/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
April 26, 2012 34 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 33 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE DEADLINE TO DISMISS CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Mehdi Ravan, Ali Ravan Case Management Statement due by 6/29/2012. Case Management Conference set for 7/6/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/26/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
February 21, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 28 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO CONTINUE THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND THE DEADLINE TO DISMISS CASE IN ITS ENTIRETY filed by Mehdi Ravan, Ali Ravan Case Management Statement due by 4/20/2012. Case Management Conference set for 4/27/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2012)
December 19, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC re 24 Stipulation filed by Mehdi Ravan, Ali Ravan. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/19/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
October 3, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Case Management Statement due by 12/16/2011. Case Management Conference reset for 12/23/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/3/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2011)
September 14, 2011 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 20 Stipulation filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America, N.A., Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, L.P.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/14/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2011)
August 18, 2011 16 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER re 15 Stipulation filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, L.P.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/18/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
June 8, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court STANDING ORDERS (mjj2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 27, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 6 Stipulation filed by Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, L.P.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/27/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2011)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ravan et al v. American Mortgage Express Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehdi Ravan
Represented By: Reuben D Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Ravan
Represented By: Reuben D Nathan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Mortgage Express Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans Servicing, L.P.
Represented By: Deborah Anne Goldfarb
Represented By: Nadia Marie Bishop
Represented By: Robert Alan Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Nadia Marie Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?