Westley et al v. Oclaro, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Curtis Westley and Charlotte Westley
Defendant: Oclaro, Inc., Alain Couder, Jerry Turin and James Haynes
Case Number: 3:2011cv02448
Filed: May 19, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 175 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER re Supplemental Briefing for 175 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on March 25, 2014. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC TO 4/24/14. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER RESETTING CMC Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 10:25 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
October 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 167 STIPULATION Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Oclaro, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
September 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (165 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 10:31 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
August 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 164 STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting Further CMC to 9/26/13. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
July 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 161 Continuing Case Management Conference and Extending Discovery Stay filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Case Management Conference, Extending Discovery Stay and Adjourning Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Motion s terminated: 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Case Management Conference, Extending Discovery Stay and Adjourning Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 130 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 153 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (152 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) TO PARTIALLY STAYING MATTER filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
April 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/11/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
April 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER TO SUBMIT RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/10/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE, Motions terminated: 127 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/03/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTS RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Discovery Hearing set for 4/3/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/28/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER. Docket entry 114 is denied. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/7/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
January 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (51 in 3:11-cv-03176-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 3/21/13 AT 10:30 A.M. filed by Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
October 25, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER 88 EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINE RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Oclaro, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2012. Replies due by 11/16/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (bpf, COURT STAFF).
October 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR LEAD PLAINTIFF TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
September 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 9/28/12 TO 11/9/12 AT 9:00 A.M. re (44 in 3:11-cv-03176-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (41) Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Oclaro, Inc., (78 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (61) Terminate Deadlines, Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Set Motion and RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Alain Couder, Jer ry Turin, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
April 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ***Deadlines terminated. 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Plaintiffs' Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto and Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Alain Couder, Jerry T urin, Charlotte Westley, Curtis Westley, Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Oclaro, Inc.., STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Plaintiffs' Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants& #039; Response Thereto and Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Charlotte Westley, Curtis Westley, Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Oclaro, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Plaintiffs' Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 6/25/2012. Replies due by 7/16/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
March 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 44 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION AND ORDER re BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE (44 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum of Point and Authorities filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Oclaro , Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to (44 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum of Point and Authorities. Responses due by 2/3/2012. Replies due by 3/2/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS re (25 in 3:11-cv-03176-EMC) Stipulation filed by Oclaro, Inc. CMC reset to 3/23/12. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 21 Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
July 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER CONSOLIDATING DERIVATIVE ACTION (for related cases C11-3176 EMC, C11-3214 EMC and C11-3322 EMC). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 Stipulation, filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Charlotte Westley, Curtis Westley, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westley et al v. Oclaro, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Westley
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: David Conrad Walton
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Dyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Westley
Represented By: Shawn A. Williams
Represented By: David Conrad Walton
Represented By: Darren Jay Robbins
Represented By: Michael I. Fistel, Jr.
Represented By: Robert J. Dyer, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oclaro, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Skola
Represented By: Jessica P. Corley
Represented By: Gidon M. Caine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alain Couder
Represented By: Jessica P. Corley
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Skola
Represented By: Gidon M. Caine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Turin
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Skola
Represented By: Jessica P. Corley
Represented By: Gidon M. Caine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Haynes
Represented By: Gidon M. Caine
Represented By: Jessica P. Corley
Represented By: Elizabeth P. Skola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?