May 5, 2014 |
Filing
190
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting 175 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2014)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
179
ORDER re Supplemental Briefing for 175 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on March 25, 2014. (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2014)
|
February 10, 2014 |
Filing
173
ORDER RESETTING FURTHER CMC TO 4/24/14. Case Management Statement due by 4/17/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 4/24/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 2/10/14. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2014)
|
December 4, 2013 |
Filing
171
ORDER RESETTING CMC Case Management Statement due by 2/6/2014. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/13/2014 10:25 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 12/4/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2013)
|
October 29, 2013 |
Filing
168
ORDER granting 167 STIPULATION Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Oclaro, Inc.. Case Management Statement due by 11/28/2013. Further Case Management Conference reset for 12/5/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/28/2013. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2013)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing
166
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (165 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Case Management Conference filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2013 10:31 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/20/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2013)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing
164
STIPULATION AND ORDER resetting Further CMC to 9/26/13. Case Management Statement due by 9/19/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/26/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 8/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2013)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing
162
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 161 Continuing Case Management Conference and Extending Discovery Stay filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund Case Management Statement due by 9/12/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/15/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2013)
|
June 17, 2013 |
Filing
160
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Case Management Conference, Extending Discovery Stay and Adjourning Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Motion s terminated: 159 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Setting Case Management Conference, Extending Discovery Stay and Adjourning Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund. Case Management Statement due by 7/11/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/18/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 6/17/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2013)
|
May 30, 2013 |
Filing
157
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 130 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2013)
|
May 2, 2013 |
Filing
153
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (152 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) TO PARTIALLY STAYING MATTER filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/2/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2013)
|
April 11, 2013 |
Filing
143
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/11/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2013)
|
April 10, 2013 |
Filing
141
ORDER TO SUBMIT RESPONSE TO DISCOVERY LETTER. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/10/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
|
April 3, 2013 |
Filing
138
ORDER RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE, Motions terminated: 127 Joint Discovery Letter Brief. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 04/03/2013. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/3/2013)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing
128
ORDER REQUESTING DOCUMENTS RE: DISCOVERY DISPUTE. Discovery Hearing set for 4/3/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/28/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2013)
|
March 7, 2013 |
Filing
122
ORDER TO MEET AND CONFER. Docket entry 114 is denied. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 3/7/13. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2013)
|
January 10, 2013 |
Filing
107
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2013)
|
January 9, 2013 |
Filing
106
STIPULATION AND ORDER re (51 in 3:11-cv-03176-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO 3/21/13 AT 10:30 A.M. filed by Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 3/14/2013. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/9/13. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2013)
|
November 28, 2012 |
Filing
95
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 94 ON CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/28/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2012)
|
October 25, 2012 |
Filing
89
STIPULATION AND ORDER 88 EXTENDING BRIEFING DEADLINE RE MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Oclaro, Inc. Responses due by 10/30/2012. Replies due by 11/16/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012) (bpf, COURT STAFF).
|
October 17, 2012 |
Filing
85
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 84 EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR LEAD PLAINTIFF TO FILE THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/17/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
|
September 21, 2012 |
Filing
80
STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CMC FROM 9/28/12 TO 11/9/12 AT 9:00 A.M. re (44 in 3:11-cv-03176-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (41) Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Oclaro, Inc., (78 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re (61) Terminate Deadlines, Stipulation and Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, Set Motion and RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE filed by Alain Couder, Jer ry Turin, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/2/2012. Case Management Conference set for 11/9/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 9/21/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2012)
|
April 20, 2012 |
Filing
61
***Deadlines terminated. 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Plaintiffs' Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto and Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Alain Couder, Jerry T urin, Charlotte Westley, Curtis Westley, Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Oclaro, Inc.., STIPULATION AND ORDER re 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Plaintiffs' Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants& #039; Response Thereto and Rescheduling Case Management Conference filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Charlotte Westley, Curtis Westley, Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund, Oclaro, Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to 60 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Plaintiffs' Filing of Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' Response Thereto and Rescheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/21/2012. Case Management Conference set for 9/28/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Responses due by 6/25/2012. Replies due by 7/16/2012. Motion Hearing set for 8/24/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Edward M. Chen.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/20/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
|
March 27, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 44 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2012)
|
January 24, 2012 |
Filing
49
STIPULATION AND ORDER re BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE (44 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum of Point and Authorities filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Oclaro , Inc., Set/Reset Deadlines as to (44 in 3:11-cv-02448-EMC) MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Violation of the Federal Securities Laws and Memorandum of Point and Authorities. Responses due by 2/3/2012. Replies due by 3/2/2012.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 1/24/12. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
|
November 29, 2011 |
Filing
43
STIPULATION AND ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS re (25 in 3:11-cv-03176-EMC) Stipulation filed by Oclaro, Inc. CMC reset to 3/23/12. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/29/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
|
September 12, 2011 |
Filing
37
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen Granting 21 Connecticut Laborers' Pension Fund's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
|
July 20, 2011 |
Filing
27
ORDER CONSOLIDATING DERIVATIVE ACTION (for related cases C11-3176 EMC, C11-3214 EMC and C11-3322 EMC). Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/20/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
|
July 1, 2011 |
Filing
16
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 15 Stipulation, filed by Alain Couder, Jerry Turin, Charlotte Westley, Curtis Westley, James Haynes, Oclaro, Inc. Case Management Statement due by 11/25/2011. Case Management Conference set for 12/2/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 7/1/11. (bpf, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
|